This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/07/2023 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Realty

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Realty. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1110

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard

Defendant / Appellees

Martin A. Sage, in his capacity as partner or joint venturer of Sage Realty and individually as beneficiary of Sage Realty

Ann M. Sage Passer, in her capacity as partner or joint venturer of Sage Realty and individually as beneficiary of Sage Realty

Sage Realty

Defendant / Appellant

Malcolm H. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates, Individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates, and as the Personal Representative of The Estate of Lillian M. Sage

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew Kratenstein

Sage Realty

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Michael L. Post Esq.

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck

Other Attorneys

Peter A. Devlin Esq.

Daniel Arthur Cohen Esq.

 

Court Documents

#158

(#158) MOTION ORDER, denying motion for appellant to argue on his own behalf for oral argument, [ # 3520730-2 ] filed by Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, FILED. [3522269][158] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2023 02:22 PM]

#185

(#155) INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3519515] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 05/22/2023 03:32 PM]

#151

(#151) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3503426] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 04/21/2023 04:05 PM]

#147

(#147) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3493094] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 03/31/2023 05:10 PM]

#137

(#137) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467980] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/13/2023 10:21 AM]

#136

No Description Available

#134

No Description Available

#154

No Description Available

#129

No Description Available

128 #2

Deferred Joint Appx_vol 18 (2 of 2)

128 #1

Deferred Appendix FILED Deferred Joint Appx_vol 18 (1 of 2)

127 #2

Deferred Joint Appx_vol 17 (2 of 2)

127 #1

Deferred Appendix FILED Deferred Joint Appx_vol 17 (1 of 2)

126 #2

Deferred Joint Appx_vol 16 (2 of 2)

126 #1

Deferred Appendix FILED Deferred Joint Appx_vol 16 (1 of 2)

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Docket(#159) CASE, before ECL, MP, SALM, HEARD.[3523195] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 05/31/2023 10:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) MOTION ORDER, denying motion for appellant to argue on his own behalf for oral argument, [ # 3520730-2 ] filed by Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, FILED. [3522269][158] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2023 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3519515] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 05/22/2023 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) ATTORNEY, Timothy A. Macht for Malcolm Sage, in case 22-1110, [ # 3513650-2 ], ADDED.[3514587] [22-1107, 22-1110]--[Edited 05/24/2023 by EM] [Entered: 05/12/2023 09:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3503426] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 04/21/2023 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3493094] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 03/31/2023 05:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • Docket(#146) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/31/2023, SET.[3492530] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 03/31/2023 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#143) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/30/2023, PROPOSED.[3480874] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 03/09/2023 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • Docket(#138) CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [ # 137 ], on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, 22-1110, FILED.[3470097] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/15/2023 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467980] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/13/2023 10:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322393] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1110 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3322380] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322376] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1110 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3322369] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322363] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3322347] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3319755] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/23/2022 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26176861, FILED.[3319620] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/23/2022 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3319619] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/23/2022 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, FILED. [3319617] [22-1110] [Entered: 05/23/2022 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less