This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/06/2022 at 06:16:00 (UTC).

Irene Smither v. Circle K Stores Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Irene Smither filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Circle K Stores Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15844

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORE #1302

Plaintiff / Appellant

IRENE SMITHER

Defendant / Appellee

CIRCLE K STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Travis E. Shetler

3202 W Charleston Boulevard

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Todd Stephen Kartchner

Attorney at Fennemore Craig, PC

2394 East Camelback Road, Suite 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12472896] (LW) [Entered: 06/16/2022 11:07 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Irene Smither Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2022. [12478895] [22-15844] (Shetler, Travis) [Entered: 06/23/2022 07:15 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 07/19/2022, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12482268] (VS) [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:10 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/04/2022, 1:30 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12497547] (VS) [Entered: 07/19/2022 02:39 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/18/2022, 2:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12509700] (VS) [Entered: 08/04/2022 01:52 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/18/2022, 2:00 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12509700] (VS) [Entered: 08/04/2022 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/04/2022, 1:30 p.m., Pacific Time. See order for details. [12497547] (VS) [Entered: 07/19/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 07/19/2022, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12482268] (VS) [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/23/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12478911]. [22-15844] (AD) [Entered: 06/24/2022 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Irene Smither Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/23/2022. [12478895] [22-15844] (Shetler, Travis) [Entered: 06/23/2022 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12472896] (LW) [Entered: 06/16/2022 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Irene Smither Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/14/2022. Transcript ordered by 07/06/2022. Transcript due 08/05/2022. Appellant Irene Smither opening brief due 09/14/2022. Appellee Circle K Stores Inc. answering brief due 10/14/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12465339] (RT) [Entered: 06/07/2022 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Stephen Kartchner