This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:02:09 (UTC).

Iraq Telecom Limited v. IBL Bank S.A.L.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Iraq Telecom Limited filed an Other lawsuit against IBL Bank S A L. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-832

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABC

Petitioner

Iraq Telecom Limited

Defendant

DEF

Respondent

IBL Bank S.A.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alexander Hale Loomis Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

111 Huntington Avenue

Boston, MA 02199

Kevin S. Reed

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Kristin Tahler Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

William B. Adams

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Derek Shaffer Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

1300 I Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Respondent Attorneys

Gassan A. Baloul Esq.

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

2550 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Mitchell R. Berger Esq.

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L. Brief due date as 07/27/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 07/27/2022, FILED.[3316927] [22-832] [Entered: 05/17/2022 05:21 PM]

#33

(#33) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., informing Court of proposed due date 07/27/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3310005] [22-832] [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:44 PM]

#32

(#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3305760] [22-832] [Entered: 04/28/2022 04:25 PM]

#26

(#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304729] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:58 PM]

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304722] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:51 PM]

#23

(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [20], on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED.[3304707] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:40 PM]

#22

(#22) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304703] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:36 PM]

#21

(#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304702] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:35 PM]

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Iraq Telecom Limited, FILED. Service date 04/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304098] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:34 PM]

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Iraq Telecom Limited, FILED. Service date 04/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304094] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:23 PM]

#10

(#11) ATTORNEY, Alexander Hale Loomis for Iraq Telecom Limited, in case 22-832 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3304091] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:17 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3298990] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:14 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 04/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3298989] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:13 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L. Brief due date as 07/27/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 07/27/2022, FILED.[3316927] [22-832] [Entered: 05/17/2022 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., informing Court of proposed due date 07/27/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/05/2022 by CM/ECF.[3310005] [22-832] [Entered: 05/05/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[3305760] [22-832] [Entered: 04/28/2022 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 23 ], [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED.[3304783] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY, Mitchell R. Berger for IBL Bank S.A.L., in case 22-832 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[3304778] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304729] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304722] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [20], on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED.[3304707] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304703] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. Service date 04/27/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304702] [22-832] [Entered: 04/27/2022 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Iraq Telecom Limited, FILED. Service date 04/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304098] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Iraq Telecom Limited, FILED. Service date 04/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3304094] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Alexander Hale Loomis for Iraq Telecom Limited, in case 22-832 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3304091] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Iraq Telecom Limited, FILED. Service date 04/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3304088] [22-832] [Entered: 04/26/2022 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3298993] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., district court receipt # ANYSDC26018540, FILED.[3298992] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3298990] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 04/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3298989] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3298988] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant IBL Bank S.A.L., FILED. [3298985] [22-832] [Entered: 04/18/2022 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Rand Berger