This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2019 at 06:09:05 (UTC).

Iraida Morales v. Commissioner of Social Sec.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Iraida Morales filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Sec. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11064

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

IRAIDA MORALES

Defendant / Appellee

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Allen Culbertson

Attorney at Culbertson Law Group, PLLC

3200 Corrine Dr Ste E

Orlando, FL 32803-2217

Sarah Fay

Attorney at Culbertson Law Group, PLLC

3200 Corrine Dr Ste E

Orlando, FL 32803-2217

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Vincent Blake

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jerome M. Albanese

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Stephanie Catherine Johnson

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

Nathaniel Heber

Attorney at Social Security Administration

61 Forsyth St Sw Ste 20T45

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed

Open Restricted Document #2

Appellant Appendix II Filed

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

USDC Judgment- Doc #19

Open Restricted Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of deficient Appellant appendix filed by Attorney Richard Allen Culbertson for Appellant Iraida Morales. Deficiency: 2 paper copies have not been filed. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of deficient Appellant brief filed by Attorney Richard Allen Culbertson for Appellant Iraida Morales. Deficiency: 7 paper copies have not been filed. [Entered: 05/13/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [2 VOLUMES] by Appellant Iraida Morales. [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Iraida Morales. [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 04/29/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jerry Albanese [19-11064] (ECF: Jerome Albanese) [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephanie C. Johnson [19-11064] (ECF: Stephanie Johnson) [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Nathaniel Heber for Appellee Commissioner of Social Security. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11064] (ECF: Nathaniel Heber) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nathaniel Heber [19-11064] (ECF: Nathaniel Heber) [Entered: 04/15/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Blake for Commissioner of Social Security [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Blake) [Entered: 04/03/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard Allen Culbertson for Appellant Iraida Morales. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Richard Allen Culbertson for Appellant Iraida Morales. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Richard Allen Culbertson for Appellant Iraida Morales. [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah P. Fay for Iraida Morales [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard Allen Culbertson for Iraida Morales. [19-11064] (ECF: Richard Culbertson) [Entered: 03/27/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order granting IFP as to Appellant Iraida Morales was filed on 03/30/2018. Docket Entry 5. [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Iraida Morales on 03/20/2019. Fee Status: IFP Granted. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/29/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/03/2019 as to Appellant Iraida Morales. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/17/2019 as to Appellee Commissioner of Social Security [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.