Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 06:45:22 (UTC).

Ira Jackson v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Ira Jackson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14547

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Petitioner / Appellant

IRA L. JACKSON

Okeechobee, FL 34972

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Allison Leigh Morris

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

135 W Central Blvd Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801

Bonnie Jean Parrish

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Ira L. Jackson

Attorney at Okeechobee CI - Inmate Legal Mail

3420 Ne 168Th St

Okeechobee, FL 34972

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

HAB-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion on COA & IFP

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Ira L. Jackson. [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-11 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Motion or Document Returned Unfiled

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ira L. Jackson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bonnie Jean Parrish for Appellee. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14547] (ECF: Bonnie Parrish) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bonnie Jean Parrish for Appellee [19-14547] (ECF: Bonnie Parrish) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Ira L. Jackson was filed on 10/17/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:51 PM]

Open Document #4

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #24 Judgment

Open Document #2

DC #23 Order

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA and denying IFP as to Appellant Ira L. Jackson was filed on 12/26/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Ira L. Jackson. [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Ira L. Jackson was filed on 12/13/2019. Docket Entry 27. [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED UNFILED: Motion for Extenson of Time to file for a COA filed by Ira L. Jackson is returned unfiled because this court has NOT requested that a motion for a certficate of appealability is needed. [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ira L. Jackson. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bonnie Jean Parrish for Appellee. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14547] (ECF: Bonnie Parrish) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Bonnie Jean Parrish for Appellee [19-14547] (ECF: Bonnie Parrish) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Ira L. Jackson was filed on 10/17/2019. Docket Entry 23. [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Ira L. Jackson on 11/14/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Corrections is a litigant