This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2020 at 05:22:58 (UTC).

IPA Technologies Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 IPA Technologies Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1440

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

IPA TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Appellee

MICROSOFT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Steven Wayne Hartsell

Attorney at Skiermont Derby LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Appellee Attorney

Joseph A. Micallef

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/10/2020. [744595] Entry of Appearance is due 01/05/2021. Certificate of Interest is due 01/05/2021. Docketing Statement is due 01/05/2021. Certified List is due 02/01/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 12/22/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IPA TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Wayne Hartsell