This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/07/2020 at 06:16:30 (UTC).

Invenergy Renewables LLC v. US

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Invenergy Renewables LLC filed an Other lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2130

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

HANWHA Q CELLS USA INC.

AUXIN SOLAR

Defendant / Appellants

ROBERT E. LIGHTHIZER, United States Trade Representative

UNITED STATES

UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRADE REPRESENTATIVE

MARK A. MORGAN, Acting Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Plaintiff / Appellees

EDF RENEWABLES, INC.

CLEARWAY ENERGY GROUP LLC

AES DISTRIBUTED ENERGY, INC.

SOLAR ENERGY INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION

INVENERGY RENEWABLES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Stephen Carl Tosini

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin Michael O'Brien Esq.

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Frances Pierson Hadfield

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

590 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Matthew R. Nicely Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/24/2020. [712844] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/19/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/19/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 09/04/2020. Appellants' brief is due on 10/05/2020. [CAB] [Entered: 08/05/2020 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLAR ENERGY INDUSTRIES ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EDF RENEWABLES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant