This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/24/2022 at 00:07:50 (UTC).

Intl Refugee Assistance v. Donald J. Trump

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 Intl Refugee Assistance filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Donald J Trump. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-1351

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients

HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients

MUHAMMED METEAB

PAUL HARRISON

IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED

JOHN DOES #1 & 3

JANE DOE #2

MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members

Defendant / Appellants

DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

DEPARTMENT OF STATE

OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE

JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security

REX TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State

DANIEL R. COATS, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence

Amicus Curiae

STATE OF TEXAS

STATE OF ALABAMA

STATE OF ARIZONA

STATE OF ARKANSAS

STATE OF FLORIDA

172 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Cole

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

915 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Justin Bryan Cox

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

P. O. Box 1106

Hood River, OR 30317

Nicholas David Espiritu

Attorney at NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER

3450 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Lee P. Gelernt

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hugh Handeyside

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Marielena Hincapie

Attorney at NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER

3450 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Omar C. Jadwat

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Deborah Jeon

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MARYLAND

3600 Clipper Mill Road

Baltimore, MD 21211-0000

Melissa S. Keaney

Attorney at INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT

P. O. Box 2291

Fair Oaks, CA 95628

Sonia Kumar

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MARYLAND

3600 Clipper Mill Road

Baltimore, MD 21211-0000

Daniel Mach

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

915 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Sarah L. Mehta

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

David Robert Rocah

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MARYLAND

3600 Clipper Mill Road

Baltimore, MD 21211-0000

Hina Shamsi

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MARYLAND

3600 Clipper Mill Road

Baltimore, MD 21211-0000

Esther Hsiao-In Sung

Attorney at JUSTICE ACTION CENTER

P. O. Box 27280

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Karen C. Tumlin

Attorney at JUSTICE ACTION CENTER

P. O. Box 27280

Los Angeles, CA 90027

Cecillia D. Wang

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

915 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-0000

308 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#317

(#317) ORDER filed [1000454076] granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 316 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:55 PM]

#316

(#316) MOTION by Muslim Rights, Professional & Public Health Organizations to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 02/07/2019 ecf. [1000454064] [17-1351] Johnathan Smith [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:47 PM]

#315

(#315) ORDER filed [1000276791] granting Motion to withdraw counsel [ # 314 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] TW [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:46 PM]

#314

(#314) MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Interfaith Coalition to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney... Date and method of service: 04/16/2018 ecf. [1000276588] [17-1351] William Zapf [Entered: 04/16/2018 01:11 PM]

#313

(#313) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 312 ] Judgment Order , [ # 311 ] court Order. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 01/09/2018 09:31 AM]

312 #2

312 #1

Judgment order filed

#311

(#311) Corrected COURT ORDER filed [1000194764] dismissing appeal [311] Copies to all parties.. [17-1351]. JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:55 PM]

#310

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Omar Jadwat for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046501] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/21/2017 02:54 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed [1000046140] substituting party (FRAP 43). Daniel R. Coats substituted for Michael Dempsey. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/21/2017 11:19 AM]

#7

(#7) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/20/2017 12:07 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by H. Thomas Byron III for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044774] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:45 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sharon Swingle for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044773] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:44 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044772] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:43 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2017. Response Brief due 05/26/2017. Mailed to Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:43 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:40 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:40 PM]

453 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) ORDER filed [1000454076] granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 316 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) MOTION by Muslim Rights, Professional & Public Health Organizations to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 02/07/2019 ecf. [1000454064] [17-1351] Johnathan Smith [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) ORDER filed [1000276791] granting Motion to withdraw counsel [ # 314 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] TW [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Interfaith Coalition to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney... Date and method of service: 04/16/2018 ecf. [1000276588] [17-1351] William Zapf [Entered: 04/16/2018 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 312 ] Judgment Order , [ # 311 ] court Order. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 01/09/2018 09:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: Order. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 11/17/2017. [1000194769] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [17-1351] JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 06:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) Corrected COURT ORDER filed [1000194764] dismissing appeal [311] Copies to all parties.. [17-1351]. JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) COURT ORDER filed [1000194760] dismissing appeal [310] Copies to all parties.. [17-1351]--[Edited 11/21/2017 by SAC] JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#309) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Members of Congress in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194731] [17-1351]--[Edited 11/20/2017 by JSN] Peter Karanjia [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#308) SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 11/14/2017. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 11/14/2017 11:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
296 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lee Gelernt for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046681] [17-1351] Lee Gelernt [Entered: 03/21/2017 05:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Omar Jadwat for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046501] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/21/2017 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed [1000046140] substituting party (FRAP 43). Daniel R. Coats substituted for Michael Dempsey. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/21/2017 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/20/2017 12:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by H. Thomas Byron III for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044774] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sharon Swingle for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044773] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044772] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2017. Response Brief due 05/26/2017. Mailed to Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: JeffNeal. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less