This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 06:07:47 (UTC).

Intl Assn of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Trans, et al v. Iowa Northern Railway Company

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Intl Assn of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Trans filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Iowa Northern Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2608

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers

Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433

Defendant / Appellee

Iowa Northern Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Erika Diehl-Gibbons

Attorney at SMART

Suite 340, 24950 Country Club Boulevard

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Mark Hedberg

Attorney at HEDBERG & BOULTON

Suite 425, 100 Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309

Kevin C. Brodar

Attorney at SMART

Suite 340, 24950 Country Club Boulevard

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons

Attorney at SMART

Suite 340, 24950 Country Club Boulevard

North Olmsted, OH 44070

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James D. Helenhouse

Attorney at FLETCHER & SIPPEL

Suite 920, 29 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2875

Chloe Pedersen

Attorney at FLETCHER & SIPPEL

Suite 920, 29 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2875

James Daniel Helenhouse

Attorney at FLETCHER & SIPPEL

Suite 800, 29 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2875

Chloe G. Pedersen

Attorney at FLETCHER & SIPPEL

Suite 800, 29 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-2875

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kevin C. Brodar for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 09/02/2021 [5072604] [21-2608] (KCB) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:40 PM]

Open Document

Record Deficiency Sent to Attorney Ms. Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. Record Deficiency due on 09/07/2021. [5072451-1] [21-2608] (ALK) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 , w/service 08/31/2021 [5071368] [21-2608] (NDG) [Entered: 08/31/2021 01:22 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 08/31/2021 , Length: 9,292 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 due 09/07/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Iowa Northern Railway Company due on 09/30/2021 [5071367] [21-2608] (NDG) [Entered: 08/31/2021 01:22 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Chloe G. Pedersen for Appellee Iowa Northern Railway Company w/service 08/13/2021 [5065431] [21-2608] (CGP) [Entered: 08/13/2021 01:29 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. w/service 08/04/2021 [5062403] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:47 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/04/2021 [5062402] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:24 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 - w/service 08/04/2021. [5062401] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:22 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. Transcript ordered[5062400] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:15 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. - FOR CAL [5061106] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/02/2021 02:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 08/02/2021 [5061058] [21-2608] (KCB) [Entered: 08/02/2021 01:37 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/30/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 due 08/30/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5057290] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:03 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum, Opinion and Order 7/19/21, docket entries, [5057289] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:03 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [5057286] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:01 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 copies of 1 volume [5073532] [21-2608] (NDG) [Entered: 09/07/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kevin C. Brodar for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 09/02/2021 [5072604] [21-2608] (KCB) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRecord Deficiency Sent to Attorney Ms. Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. Record Deficiency due on 09/07/2021. [5072451-1] [21-2608] (ALK) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 5071367-2 ] filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. [5072448] [21-2608] (ALK) [Entered: 09/02/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 , w/service 08/31/2021 [5071368] [21-2608] (NDG) [Entered: 08/31/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 08/31/2021 , Length: 9,292 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 due 09/07/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Iowa Northern Railway Company due on 09/30/2021 [5071367] [21-2608] (NDG) [Entered: 08/31/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - HEARING TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Comments: Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - District Court document #26 [Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case], Source Location: USDC / NI, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 07/13/2021, No. of Pgs.: 34, Court Reporter: Semmler, Shelly [5071251] [21-2608] (STL) [Entered: 08/31/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/30/2021 [5071092] [21-2608]--[Edited 08/31/2021 by NDG] This document has been locked. Appendices are to be filed in paper copy ONLY. Counsel to send 3 paper copies of appendix to clerk's office with white covers, table of contents, and certificate of service. (EAD) [Entered: 08/30/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5071091] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/30/2021 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5071090] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/30/2021 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Chloe G. Pedersen for Appellee Iowa Northern Railway Company w/service 08/13/2021 [5065431] [21-2608] (CGP) [Entered: 08/13/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. w/service 08/04/2021 [5062403] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 - Joint Appendix - w/service 08/04/2021 [5062402] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 - w/service 08/04/2021. [5062401] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. Transcript ordered[5062400] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/04/2021 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433. - FOR CAL [5061106] [21-2608] (EAD) [Entered: 08/02/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons for Appellants International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 w/service 08/02/2021 [5061058] [21-2608] (KCB) [Entered: 08/02/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/30/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers and Smart- TD General Committee of Adjustment GO-433 due 08/30/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5057290] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Memorandum, Opinion and Order 7/19/21, docket entries, [5057289] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5057286] [21-2608] (AEV) [Entered: 07/21/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers' Local 359 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chloe Georgianna Pedersen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D Helenhouse