Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2019 at 06:02:11 (UTC).

International Union of Operati v. Farmland Foods Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 International Union of Operati filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Farmland Foods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3420

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP

FARMLAND FOODS INC

SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP, trading and doing business as FARMLAND FOODS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AFL CIO LOCAL UNION 95-95A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christian C. Antkowiak Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, 41St Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Tyler S. Laughinghouse Esq.

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth

951 East Byrd Street, Riverfront Plaza, East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219

Brian H. Simmons Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, 41St Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kurt G. Larkin Esq.

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth

951 East Byrd Street, Riverfront Plaza, East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard P. Gilardi Esq.

Attorney at Gilardi Cooper & Lomupo

223 Fourth Avenue, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Memorandum Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss

Open Document #1

Concise Summary of the Case

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:44 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 01:43 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard P. Gilardi on behalf of Appellant(s) International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 12:23 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Richard P. Gilardi, Esq. for International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/16/2019. Information Statement on or before 12/16/2019. Concise Summary on or before 12/16/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/16/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:24 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Farmland Foods Inc. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:23 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kurt G. Larkin on behalf of Appellee(s) Farmland Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp. t/d/b/a Farmland Foods, Inc.. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

Appendix Citation Notice sent to Richard P. Gilardi, Esq., Christian C. Antkowiak, Esq., Kurt G. Larkin, Esq., Tyler S. Laughinghouse, Esq., Brian H. Simmons, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 11/04/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

caption

Open Document #2

DC Order 9/23/19

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/13/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard P. Gilardi on behalf of Appellant(s) International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 95-95A. [19-3420] (RPG) [Entered: 12/12/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Richard P. Gilardi, Esq. for International Union of Operating Engineers AFL CIO Local Union 95-95A requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/16/2019. Information Statement on or before 12/16/2019. Concise Summary on or before 12/16/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/16/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tyler S. Laughinghouse on behalf of Appellee(s) Farmland Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp. t/d/b/a Farmland Foods, Inc.. [19-3420] (TSL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Farmland Foods Inc. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kurt G. Larkin on behalf of Appellee(s) Farmland Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp., Smithfield Packaged Meats, Corp. t/d/b/a Farmland Foods, Inc.. [19-3420] (KGL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix Citation Notice sent to Richard P. Gilardi, Esq., Christian C. Antkowiak, Esq., Kurt G. Larkin, Esq., Tyler S. Laughinghouse, Esq., Brian H. Simmons, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 11/04/2019. (TMM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant International Union of Operating Engineers, Local Union 95-95A in District Court No. 2-19-cv-00785. (TMM) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITHFIELD PACKAGED MEATS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant