Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2020 at 05:01:37 (UTC).

International Union of Oper. v. NLRB

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 International Union of Oper filed an Other lawsuit against NLRB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1051

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18

Respondent

National Labor Relations Board

Intervenor

Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 534

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Timothy R. Fadel

Attorney at Fadel & Beyer, LLC

18500 Lake Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Respondent Attorney

David S. Habenstreit

Attorney at National Labor Relations Board

1015 Half Street, Se

Washington, DC 20570

Intervenor Attorneys

Ryan Keith Hymore

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co., LPA

3805 Edwards Road, Suite 550

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Basil William Mangano

Attorney at Mangano Law Offices Co. LPA

2245 Warrensville Center Road, Suite 213

Cleveland, OH 44118

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #1

Statement Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1830149] filed by Ryan Keith Hymore and Basil William Mangano for Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 534. [20-1051]--[Edited 02/26/2020 by AY] (Hymore, Ryan) [Entered: 02/25/2020 06:40 PM]

Open Document #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #1

Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1830128] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER dispositive motions due 04/10/2020, RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/26/2020, RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/26/2020, RESPONDENT certified index to record due 04/10/2020, and RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 04/10/2020. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:25 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1830126] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1830125-2 ]. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:21 PM]

Open Document #2

NLRB Order

Open Document #1

Petition for Review

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1830176] with Disclosure Listing filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18 [Service Date: 02/24/2020 ] [20-1051] (Fadel, Timothy) [Entered: 02/26/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1830149] filed by Ryan Keith Hymore and Basil William Mangano for Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 534. [20-1051]--[Edited 02/26/2020 by AY] (Hymore, Ryan) [Entered: 02/25/2020 06:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1830147] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Laborers' International Union of North America, Local 534 [Service Date: 02/25/2020 ] [20-1051]--[Edited 02/26/2020 by AY] (Hymore, Ryan) [Entered: 02/25/2020 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1830128] filed directing the parties to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/26/2020, PETITIONER dispositive motions due 04/10/2020, RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/26/2020, RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/26/2020, RESPONDENT certified index to record due 04/10/2020, and RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 04/10/2020. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1830126] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1830125-2 ]. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1830125] of a decision by federal agency filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 18 [Service Date: 02/24/2020] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1051] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laborers' International Union of North America is a litigant

Latest cases where National Labor Relations Board is a litigant

Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy R. Fadel(Designation Retained)