This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 06:10:35 (UTC).

Interactive Brokers LLC v. Rohit Saroop

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Interactive Brokers LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Rohit Saroop. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1077

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

INTERACTIVE BROKERS LLC

Defendant / Appellants

GEORGE SOFIS

PREYA SAROOP

ROHIT SAROOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William H. Hurd

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS, LLP

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

Stephen Charles Piepgrass

Attorney at TROUTMAN SANDERS, LLP

1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Samuel B. Edwards

Attorney at SHEPHERD SMITH EDWARDS & KANTAS LLP

1010 Lamar Street

Houston, TX 77002

Edward Everett Bagnell Jr.

Attorney at SPOTTS FAIN, PC

411 East Franklin Street

Richmond, VA 23219

David Wayne Miller

Attorney at SHEPHERD SMITH EDWARDS & KANTAS LLP

1010 Lamar Street

Houston, TX 77002

Hugh Fain Esq. III

Attorney at SPOTTS FAIN, PC

411 East Franklin Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Patricia Bugg Turner

Attorney at SPOTTS FAIN, PC

411 East Franklin Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER filed [1000462952] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/12/2019. Response brief due 06/11/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1077] TF [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:54 AM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Samuel Edwards for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000450435] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:59 AM]

#17

(#17) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1077] LP [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:32 PM]

#16

(#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Barnett. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/13/2019. Response Brief due 04/12/2019 [19-1077] TF [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:23 AM]

#15

(#15) Docket correction requested from Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. Re: [ # 4 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Keith Barnett, Samuel Edwards. [19-1077] DL [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:49 PM]

#4

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Interactive Brokers LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000449177] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:16 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen C. Piepgrass for Interactive Brokers LLC. [1000449175] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:14 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William H. Hurd for Interactive Brokers LLC. [1000449171] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:07 PM]

11 #2

Additional Document

11 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by George Sofis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448958] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:21 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edward E. Bagnell, Jr. for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448957] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:21 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hugh M. Fain, III for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448955] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:20 AM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rohit Saroop. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448953] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patricia Bugg Turner for Preya Saroop, George Sofis and Rohit Saroop. [1000448952] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Preya Saroop. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448951] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:18 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David Miller for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448927] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:06 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER filed [1000462952] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/12/2019. Response brief due 06/11/2019 Copies to all parties. [19-1077] TF [Entered: 02/22/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Samuel Edwards for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000450435] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1077] LP [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Barnett. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/13/2019. Response Brief due 04/12/2019 [19-1077] TF [Entered: 02/01/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Docket correction requested from Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. Re: [ # 4 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. Mailed to: Keith Barnett, Samuel Edwards. [19-1077] DL [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Interactive Brokers LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000449177] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Stephen C. Piepgrass for Interactive Brokers LLC. [1000449175] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William H. Hurd for Interactive Brokers LLC. [1000449171] [19-1077] Stephen Piepgrass [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by George Sofis. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448958] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Edward E. Bagnell, Jr. for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448957] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hugh M. Fain, III for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448955] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Rohit Saroop. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448953] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Patricia Bugg Turner for Preya Saroop, George Sofis and Rohit Saroop. [1000448952] [19-1077] Patricia Turner [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Preya Saroop. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000448951] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Samuel Edwards for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448938] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by David Miller for Preya Saroop, Rohit Saroop and George Sofis. [1000448927] [19-1077] David Miller [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00127-REP. Mailed to: Barnett, Edwards,. [19-1077] TF [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00127-REP. Case manager: TFischer. [19-1077] TF [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.