This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 06:09:06 (UTC).

Intellisoft, Ltd. v. Acer America Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Intellisoft, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Acer America Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1522

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTELLISOFT, LTD., a Delaware corporation

Counter Defendant

BRUCE BIERMAN, an individual

Counter Claimants

ACER INCORPORATED, a Taiwan corporation

ACER AMERICA CORPORATION, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Aaron Martin Panner

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

1615 M Street, Nw, Sumner Square

Washington, DC 20036

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jason Nathaniel Haycock Esq.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Harold H. Davis Jr.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman to extend the time to 04/23/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/29/2019 by email. [596442] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:29 AM]

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588866] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:22 PM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588847] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:22 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated, Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/05/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[588613] [MMA] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:25 AM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588188] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:10 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588184] [19-1522] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 8 ] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:06 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Harold H. Davis, Jr. as principal counsel for Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588182] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:00 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585626] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:48 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585624] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:47 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Aaron M. Panner as principal counsel for Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585622] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:46 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman Appellant's brief is due 04/23/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [596577] [MMA] [Entered: 03/29/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION of Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman to extend the time to 04/23/2019 to file the Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/29/2019 by email. [596442] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588866] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/26/2019 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/26/2019 by email. [588847] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated, Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/05/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[588613] [MMA] [Entered: 02/26/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588188] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588184] [19-1522] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 8 ] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Harold H. Davis, Jr. as principal counsel for Appellees Acer America Corporation and Acer Incorporated. Service: 02/22/2019 by email. [588182] [19-1522] [Harold Davis] [Entered: 02/22/2019 07:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585626] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585624] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Aaron M. Panner as principal counsel for Appellants Intellisoft, Ltd. and Bruce Bierman. Service: 02/13/2019 by email. [585622] [19-1522] [Aaron Panner] [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 02/06/2019. [584558] Entry of Appearance due 02/22/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/22/2019. Docketing Statement due 02/22/2019. Appellant's brief is due 04/09/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.