This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2021 at 05:19:51 (UTC).

Intel Corporation v. PACT XPP Schweiz AG

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Intel Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against PACT XPP Schweiz AG. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1139

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

INTEL CORPORATION

Appellee

PACT XPP SCHWEIZ AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Appellee Attorney

Nima Hefazi

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/08/2021. [811411] Entry of Appearance is due on 11/24/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/24/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 11/24/2021. Certified List is due on 12/20/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 11/10/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACT XPP Schweiz AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nima Hefazi