This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 06:10:52 (UTC).

Innovation Sciences, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Innovation Sciences, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2132

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendants

AMAZON DIGITAL SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON DIGITAL SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.

RESIDEO TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

HTC CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellee

INNOVATION SCIENCES, LLC

Defendant / Appellants

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Donald Lee Jackson

Attorney at Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 500

Mclean, VA 22102

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

J. David Hadden Esq.

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#5

(#2) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated and will be considered an appeal and cross-appeal. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. (See order for briefing detais.) Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786865] [21-2111, 21-2132] [NL] [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:58 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2111 Lead with 21-2132 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [787351] [KMH] [Entered: 07/20/2021 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated and will be considered an appeal and cross-appeal. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. (See order for briefing detais.) Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786865] [21-2111, 21-2132] [NL] [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/06/2021. [785531] Entry of Appearance due 07/26/2021. Certificate of Interest due 07/26/2021. Docketing Statement due 07/26/2021. Appellant's brief is due 09/10/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 07/12/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Innovation Sciences, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RESIDEO TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HTC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant