This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 06:07:38 (UTC).

Innovation Sciences, LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Innovation Sciences, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2111

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON FULFILLMENT SERVICES, INC.

HTC CORPORATION

AMAZON DIGITAL SERVICES, INC.

RESIDEO TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON DIGITAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendant / Cross Appellants and Defendant / Appellees

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

INNOVATION SCIENCES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

J. David Hadden Esq.

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

Yar Roman Chaikovsky

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP

1117 S California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Brett Johnston Williamson

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 1700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Todd Richard Gregorian

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Saina S. Shamilov

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Daniel Berquist

Attorney at Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey, LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

Donald Lee Jackson

Attorney at Davidson Berquist Jackson & Gowdey, LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive

Mclean, VA 22102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 07/20/2021 by email. [787326] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/20/2021 12:41 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/27/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [787213] [JCW] [Entered: 07/20/2021 08:27 AM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786904] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:55 PM]

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786903] [21-2111]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:51 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for J. David Hadden; Saina S. Shamilov; Ravi R. Ranganath; Todd R. Gregorian as counsel for Cross-Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786901] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:41 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated and will be considered an appeal and cross-appeal. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. (See order for briefing detais.) Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786865] [21-2111, 21-2132] [NL] [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:58 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786512] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:38 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786511] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:37 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Donald L. Jackson; James D. Berquist as counsel for Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786509] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:35 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#11) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2111 Lead with 21-2132 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [787343] [KMH] [Entered: 07/20/2021 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 07/20/2021 by email. [787326] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/20/2021 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/27/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [787213] [JCW] [Entered: 07/20/2021 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786904] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786903] [21-2111]. This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 9 ] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for J. David Hadden; Saina S. Shamilov; Ravi R. Ranganath; Todd R. Gregorian as counsel for Cross-Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 07/16/2021 by email. [786901] [21-2111] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 07/16/2021 07:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated and will be considered an appeal and cross-appeal. The revised official caption is reflected in this order. (See order for briefing detais.) Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [786865] [21-2111, 21-2132] [NL] [Entered: 07/16/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786512] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786511] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Donald L. Jackson; James D. Berquist as counsel for Appellant Innovation Sciences, LLC. Service: 07/15/2021 by email. [786509] [21-2111] [Donald Jackson] [Entered: 07/15/2021 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/24/2021. [783757] Entry of Appearance due 07/15/2021. Certificate of Interest due 07/15/2021. Docketing Statement due 07/15/2021. Appellant's brief is due 08/30/2021. [KMH] [Entered: 07/01/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Innovation Sciences, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RESIDEO TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HTC CORPORATION is a litigant