This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/22/2022 at 06:18:37 (UTC).

Inguran, LLC v. ABS Global, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Inguran, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ABS Global, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1385

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

INGURAN, LLC, dba STGenetics

Defendant / Appellees

ABS GLOBAL, INC.

GENUS PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Pratik A. Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Z.W. Julius Chen

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel Lynn Moffett

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

112 East Pecan Street

San Antonio, TX 78205

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven J. Horowitz

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

Bank One Plaza, 1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Mary T. Hannon

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One S Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Stephanie P. Koh Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

Bank One Plaza, 1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Thomas D. Rein Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

Bank One Plaza, 1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Paul J. Rogerson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1 S Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Pratik A. Shah; Z.W. Julius Chen; and Daniel L. Moffett as counsel for Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828719] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:34 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828720] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:35 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828721] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:36 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Steven J. Horowitz as counsel for Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828908] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:48 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828911] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:53 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828912] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:55 PM]

#8

(#8) MOTION of Appellant Inguran, LLC to extend the time to 05/23/2022 to file brief. Service: 03/03/2022 by email. [834761] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 03/03/2022 06:50 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Inguran, LLC. The opening brief is due 05/23/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [834804] [JCW] [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Inguran, LLC to extend the time to 05/23/2022 to file brief. Service: 03/03/2022 by email. [834761] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 03/03/2022 06:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828912] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828911] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Steven J. Horowitz as counsel for Appellees ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC. Service: 02/03/2022 by email. [828908] [22-1385] [Steven Horowitz] [Entered: 02/03/2022 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828721] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828720] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Pratik A. Shah; Z.W. Julius Chen; and Daniel L. Moffett as counsel for Appellant Inguran, LLC. Service: 02/02/2022 by email. [828719] [22-1385] [Pratik Shah] [Entered: 02/02/2022 05:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/19/2022. [826039] Entry of Appearance is due on 02/04/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/04/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 02/04/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 03/22/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 01/21/2022 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less