This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 06:33:24 (UTC).

Ingram Barge Company, LLC v. Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Ingram Barge Company, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5513

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

LOUIS DREYFUS COMPANY, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

INGRAM BARGE COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lela Merrell Hollabaugh

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1600 Division Street, Suite 700

Nashville, TN 37203

Patrick D. Pepper

Attorney at McGrath, North, Mullin & Kratz

1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700

Omaha, NE 68102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Wade Brantley Phillips Jr.

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims

150 Third Avenue, S., Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

David Reisman

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5001

Trinity A. Morale

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5001

Raymond Timothy Waid

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5001

Kathryn Zainey Gonski

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5001

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. David Reisman for Ingram Barge Company, LLC Certificate of Service:07/06/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-5513] (DR) [Entered: 07/06/2020 06:43 PM]

#17

(#17) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 06/23/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-5513, 20-5514] (MLB) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:09 AM]

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Patrick D. Pepper for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC Certificate of Service: 06/01/2020. [20-5513] (PDP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 12:48 PM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC by Patrick D. Pepper. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-5513] (PDP) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:23 PM]

#14

(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Raymond Timothy Waid for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Certificate of Service:05/28/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:55 AM]

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Raymond Timothy Waid for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:55 AM]

#12

(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/07/2020; appellee brief due 08/06/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:31 AM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2020. [20-5513] (WBP) [Entered: 05/21/2020 04:48 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC by Lela M. Hollabaugh. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2020. [20-5513] (LMH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:42 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Kathryn Gonski. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (KZG) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:03 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Trinity Morale. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (TAM) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:00 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Raymond T. Waid. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:58 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by David L. Reisman. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (DR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:53 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-5513, 20-5514] (LMR) [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:16 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ingram Barge Company. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:33 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. David Reisman for Ingram Barge Company, LLC Certificate of Service:07/06/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-5513] (DR) [Entered: 07/06/2020 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#18) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 06/23/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-5513, 20-5514] (MLB) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Patrick D. Pepper for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC Certificate of Service: 06/01/2020. [20-5513] (PDP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC by Patrick D. Pepper. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-5513] (PDP) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Raymond Timothy Waid for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Certificate of Service:05/28/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Raymond Timothy Waid for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/07/2020; appellee brief due 08/06/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#11) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Raymond Timothy Waid for Ingram Barge Company, LLC. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/26/2020 06:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2020. [20-5513] (WBP) [Entered: 05/21/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Louis Dreyfus Company, LLC by Lela M. Hollabaugh. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2020. [20-5513] (LMH) [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Kathryn Gonski. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (KZG) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Trinity Morale. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (TAM) [Entered: 05/20/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by Raymond T. Waid. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (RTW) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ingram Barge Company, LLC by David L. Reisman. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-5513] (DR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [20-5513, 20-5514] (LMR) [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 05/19/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ingram Barge Company. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOUIS DREYFUS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Ingram Barge Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Reisman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Zainey Gonski