This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 06:15:02 (UTC).

Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15200

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendants

LG CHEM, LTD.

SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION

MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA

HITACHI, LTD.

PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA

SONY CORPORATION

TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.

NEC CORPORATION

PANASONIC CORPORATION

SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.

SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD

SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.

Appellees

CHRISTOPHER ANDREWS

Livonia, MI 48153-0394

STEVEN FRANKLYN HELFAND

Pembroke Pines, FL 33027

MICHAEL FRANK BEDNARZ

Plaintiff / Appellant

INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS

Not Classified By Court

In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl, LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604

Craig Philip Seebald

Attorney at Vinson & Elkins LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 500 West

Washington, DC 20037-1701

Jeffrey J. Amato

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

James F. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Jerry Frank Hogue

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeanifer E. Parsigian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Andrews

P.O. Box 530394

Livonia, MI 48153-0394

Steven Franklyn Helfand

1400 Sw 137Th Avenue, F112

Pembroke Pines, FL 33027

Theodore H. Frank

Attorney at Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Elizabeth J. Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeff D. Friedman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Richard M. Heimann

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15200, Appellant Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15120 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Clarify April 2 Scheduling Order and Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 21-15200 as Untimely], Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12062749] [21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:22 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 11 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews. First cross appeal brief due 06/07/2021 for Christopher Andrews. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/07/2021 for Michael Frank Bednarz, Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews. The fourth cross appeal brief is due within 21days after service of the third cross appeal brief. [12061812] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200]--[Edited: Updated docket tex to match PDF. 04/02/2021 by SLM] (GS) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:46 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15138, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15200 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061735] [21-15120, 21-15200, 21-15138] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 21-15138 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:20 AM]

10 #6

Additional Document

10 #5

Additional Document

10 #4

Additional Document

10 #3

Additional Document

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [12015649] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (WL) [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:03 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts post-judgment order was entered on the docket on December 10, 2020. Appellants notice of appeal was filed in the district court on January 15, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts post-judgment order. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12015315] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:14 PM]

10 #2

Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal

10 #1

Letter to Court

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15200 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999310] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Scarlett, Shana) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:45 PM]

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15200, Appellant Michael Frank Bednarz in 21-15120 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Clarify April 2 Scheduling Order and Motion to Dismiss Appeal No. 21-15200 as Untimely], Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12062749] [21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 04/02/2021 09:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 11 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews. First cross appeal brief due 06/07/2021 for Christopher Andrews. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/07/2021 for Michael Frank Bednarz, Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews. The fourth cross appeal brief is due within 21days after service of the third cross appeal brief. [12061812] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200]--[Edited: Updated docket tex to match PDF. 04/02/2021 by SLM] (GS) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15138, Appellee Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15200 Motion to extend time to file Opening brief. Date of service: 04/02/2021. [12061735] [21-15120, 21-15200, 21-15138] --[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 21-15138 only.] (TYL) [Entered: 04/02/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Mr. Christopher Andrews in 21-15138 reply to response to Court order dated 02/24/2021. Date of service: 03/04/2021. [12023717] [21-15138, 21-15200] (Andrews, Christopher) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed order MEDIATION (JW): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [12015649] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (WL) [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The district courts post-judgment order was entered on the docket on December 10, 2020. Appellants notice of appeal was filed in the district court on January 15, 2021. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after entry of the district courts post-judgment order. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [12015315] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket(#7) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 21-15138: IFP] ). [12015300] [21-15138, 21-15120, 21-15200] (CO) [Entered: 02/24/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#6) Terminated James F. Lerner for Sanyo North America Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporation in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138 and 21-15200 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12007998] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RY) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Correspondence: Letter to Court requesting permission to file Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal on behalf of Appellant Steven Franklyn Helfand, per his request.. Date of service: 02/16/2021 [12005502] [21-15022]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 21-15200. 02/17/2021 by SLM] (Zapala, Adam) [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12000091]. [21-15200] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15200 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999310] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Scarlett, Shana) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Terminated Nancy L. Fineman for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138, and 21-15200 (for failure to register for Appellate ECF) [11995759] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (JBS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/10/2021. First cross appeal brief due 05/04/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Second brief on cross appeal due 06/04/2021 for Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Michael Frank Bednarz and Christopher Andrews. Third brief on cross appeal due 07/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11991783] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RT) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant