This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 06:28:33 (UTC).

Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-15022

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Appellant

STEVEN FRANKLYN HELFAND

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant / Appellees

LG CHEM, LTD.

SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.

PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA

LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.

SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD

HITACHI, LTD.

HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD.

TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.

PANASONIC CORPORATION

SONY CORPORATION

NEC TOKIN CORPORATION

SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.

SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.

MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellee

INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS

Not Classified By Court

In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Steven Franklyn Helfand

900 West Avenue, Apt. 701

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl, LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604

Jeffrey J. Amato

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

James F. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

John Roberti

Attorney at Allen & Overy LLP

1101 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jerry Frank Hogue

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Rachel Susan Brass

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Elizabeth J. Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeff D. Friedman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Nancy L. Fineman

Attorney at San Mateo County Counsel's Office

400 County Center, 6Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94063-1662

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Richard M. Heimann

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Robert Bernard Pringle Esquire

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeanifer E. Parsigian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal

10 #1

Letter to Court

#3

Additional Document

3 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11961624] (RR) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:17 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#3

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15200 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999310] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Scarlett, Shana) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:45 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: JW) Appellants motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [12008390] (WL) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#11) Terminated James F. Lerner for Sanyo North America Corporation, Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Panasonic Corporation of North America and Panasonic Corporation in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138 and 21-15200 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12007998] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RY) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Correspondence: Letter to Court requesting permission to file Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal on behalf of Appellant Steven Franklyn Helfand, per his request.. Date of service: 02/16/2021 [12005502] [21-15022]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 21-15200. 02/17/2021 by SLM] (Zapala, Adam) [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/10/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12000092]. [21-15022] (AD) [Entered: 02/10/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15200 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/10/2021. [11999310] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (Scarlett, Shana) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(#7) Terminated Nancy L. Fineman for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138, and 21-15200 (for failure to register for Appellate ECF) [11995759] [21-15022, 21-15200, 21-15120, 21-15138] (JBS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/10/2021. First cross appeal brief due 05/04/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Second brief on cross appeal due 06/04/2021 for Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Lithium Ion Batteries Antitrust Litigation, Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Michael Frank Bednarz and Christopher Andrews. Third brief on cross appeal due 07/06/2021 for Christopher Andrews, Michael Frank Bednarz and Steven Franklyn Helfand. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11991783] [21-15200, 21-15022, 21-15120, 21-15138] (RT) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) Terminated Robert Bernard Pringle for NEC Corporation in 21-15022 [11985157] (RR) [Entered: 01/28/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Bernard Pringle, Esquire for Appellee NEC Corporation. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/28/2021. [11984682] [21-15022] (Pringle, Robert) [Entered: 01/28/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11974193] (CKP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11961624] (RR) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 02/05/2021. Transcript due 03/04/2021. Appellant Steven Franklyn Helfand opening brief due 04/15/2021. Appellees Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 05/17/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11955971] (RT) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HITACHI LTD. is a litigant