This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/19/2019 at 06:05:21 (UTC).

Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, et al v. Panasonic Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16855

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LG CHEM, LTD.

HITACHI MAXWELL, LTD.

SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.

PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA

LG CHEM AMERICA, INC.

SANYO ELECTRIC CO, LTD

HITACHI, LTD.

SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION

TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC.

PANASONIC CORPORATION

SONY CORPORATION

NEC TOKIN CORPORATION

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.

SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.

MAXWELL CORPORATION OF AMERICA

NEC CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellee

INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS

Not Classified By Court

In re: LITHIUM ION BATTERIES ANTITRUST LITIGATION

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey J. Amato

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

James F. Lerner

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Gary Halling Esquire

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-4106

Michael W. Scarborough

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-4106

Matthew Michael Brown Esquire

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Jerry Frank Hogue

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

George Arnold Nicoud III

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Robert Bernard Pringle Esquire

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dana Lynn Cook-Milligan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

101 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean D. Meenan

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shana E. Scarlett

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Jeff D. Friedman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Ave.

Berkeley, CA 94710

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Richard M. Heimann

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

Christopher Andres Bandas

Attorney at BANDAS LAW FIRM, P.C.

500 North Shoreline, Suite 1020

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Robert Clore

Attorney at BANDAS LAW FIRM, P.C.

500 North Shoreline, Suite 1020

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Timothy R. Hanigan

Attorney at Lang, Hanigan & Carvalho, LLP

21550 Oxnard Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#3

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • (#12) Attorneys Dylan I. Ballard, Gary Halling, James McGinnis, Nadezhda Nikonova, Michael W. Scarborough substituted by Attorneys John Roberti and Andrew Rhys Davies. [11495723] (RL) [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • (#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Rhys Davies (Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495118] [19-16855] (Davies, Andrew Rhys) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Roberti (Allen & Overy LLP, 1101 New York Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20005) for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Substitution for Dylan I. Ballard for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Gary Halling, Esquire for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., James McGinnis for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Nadezhda Nikonova for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. and Michael W. Scarborough for Appellees Samsung SDI America, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495112] [19-16855] (Roberti, John) [Entered: 11/11/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11472424] (VS) [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/16/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11450989] (VS) [Entered: 10/02/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11442654][19-16855] (AD) [Entered: 09/24/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#6) Added Attorney(s) Robert Clore for party(s) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. [11442244] (RL) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#5) Added Attorney(s) Christopher Andres Bandas for party(s) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. [11442237] (RL) [Entered: 09/24/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christopher Andres Bandas (Bandas Law Firm, 500 North Shoreline Blvd. Suite 1020, Corpus Christi, Texas 78401) for Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. Date of service: 09/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11441947] [19-16855] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 09/24/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Gordon B. Morgan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/24/2019. [11441828] [19-16855] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 09/24/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert William Clore (Bandas Law Firm, P.C., 500 North Shoreline Blvd. Suite 1020, Corpus Christi, Texas 78401) for Appellant Gordon B. Morgan. Date of service: 09/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11441495] [19-16855] (Clore, Robert) [Entered: 09/24/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/27/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/21/2019. Transcript due 11/18/2019. Appellant Gordon B. Morgan opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees Hitachi Maxwell, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem, Ltd., Maxwell Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, NEC Tokin Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., Sanyo Electric Co, Ltd, Sanyo North America Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba Corporation answering brief due 01/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11439601] (RT) [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant