This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 07:20:00 (UTC).

Indirect Plaintiff Class, et al v. LG Display Co., Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 Indirect Plaintiff Class filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against LG Display Co , Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-15930

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Appellant

MARIA MARSHALL

Defendant / Appellees

EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION

NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.

TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONICS COMPONENTS, INC.

TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.

KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.

TATUNG COMPANY

SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.

HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.

CMO JAPAN CO., LTD.

CHIMEI INNOLUX CORP.

SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

In re: TFT-LCD, (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation

Amicus Curiae

STATE OF FLORIDA

STATE OF WISCONSIN

SPECTRUM SETTLEMENT RECOVERY

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire

Attorney at Nossaman, LLP

50 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stephen P. Freccero

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jeffrey Michael Davidson Esquire

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Harrison Frahn

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Anne Kaldor Sauro

Attorney at Bingham McCutchen LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-4067

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Eric L. Lewis Esquire

Attorney at Lewis Baach Kaufmann Middlemiss PLLC

1899 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Amy McFarlane

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Jerry Chen Esquire

Attorney at Freitas Tseng & Kaufman LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94065

Peter W. James Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Qianwei Fu

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

44 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Douglas L. Davis

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Building 1, Room E-26

Charleston, WV 25305

Edward Willard Cochran Esquire

Attorney at Edward W. Cochran

20030 Marchmont Rd.

Shaker Heights, OH 44122

M. Elizabeth Lippitt

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

525 W. Ottawa, 670 Law Bldg.

Lansing, MI 48913

Judith Zahid

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

3400 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla

456 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Patrick B. Clayton

Attorney at Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla

456 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

John Bogdanov

Attorney at Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.

357 Tehama Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

Hailyn Jennifer Chen

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Craig C. Corbitt Esquire

Attorney at Corbitt Law Office

1200 California Street, Unit 21D

San Francisco, CA 94109

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MAC) Appellants' motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [9131761] (BJB) [Entered: 06/13/2014 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Filed (ECF) Appellant CBC, Inc. in 13-15920 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/13/2014. [9131048] [13-15920, 13-15916, 12-16780, 12-16782, 12-16788, 13-15917, 13-15930, 13-16216, 14-15916] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 06/13/2014 07:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Filed (ECF) Appellant Margot Bradley in 13-15917 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/13/2014. [9131046] [13-15917, 13-15916, 12-16780, 12-16782, 12-16788, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-16216, 14-15916] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 06/13/2014 07:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Filed (ECF) Appellant Alex Martinez in 13-15916 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/13/2014. [9131045] [13-15916, 12-16780, 12-16782, 12-16788, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-16216, 14-15916] (Crabtree, John) [Entered: 06/13/2014 07:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Filed (ECF) Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell in 13-15930 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/12/2014. [9130782] [13-15930, 13-15916, 12-16780, 12-16782, 12-16788, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-16216, 14-15916] (Pentz, John) [Entered: 06/12/2014 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Filed (ECF) Appellant Julius Dunmore in 13-15915, Appellant Keena Dale in 13-16216 Unopposed Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9126693] [13-15915, 13-16216]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread to all cons cases [13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, and 13-16793], resent notice. 06/10/2014 by ASW] (Bacharach, N. Albert) [Entered: 06/10/2014 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 06/10/2014. [9126198]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to all cons cases, resent notice. 06/10/2014 by ASW] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 06/10/2014 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Docket(#86) Received 7 paper copies of Reply brief [ # 84 ] filed by Ira Conner Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. [9108784] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (SD) [Entered: 05/27/2014 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 84 ] submitted by Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9102233] [13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216, 13-16793] (GV) [Entered: 05/20/2014 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Ira Connor Erwin, Stefan Rest and Luis Mario Santana in 13-16793. Date of service: 05/19/2014. [9100939] [13-16793, 13-15915, 13-15916, 13-15917, 13-15920, 13-15930, 13-15934, 13-16216]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF (TOC correction), resent notice. 05/19/2014 by ASW]--[Edited: Attached corrected brief (cover). Resent NDA. 05/21/2014 by RY] (Bandas, Christopher) [Entered: 05/19/2014 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellees NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. and Renesas Electronics America Motion for miscellaneous relief [NEC Entities' Motion to Amend Caption]. Date of service: 08/28/2013. [8760456] (Sutro, Stephen) [Entered: 08/28/2013 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Terminated Sean David Unger for Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16830, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16839, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15920, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15929, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15930 and Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15934 [8758404] [12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934] (CW) [Entered: 08/27/2013 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Received Attorney Sean David Unger, Esquire for Appellee Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934 letter dated 08/22/2013 re: request to be removed from service. Terminated counsel. Served on 08/22/2013 [8758392] [12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934] (CW) [Entered: 08/27/2013 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Docket(#7) Streamlined request [6] by Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell opening brief due 09/06/2013. Appellees AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Indirect Plaintiff Class, Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. and Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. answering brief due 10/07/2013. The optional reply brief is due 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [8715990] (SB) [Entered: 07/24/2013 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell. New requested due date is 09/06/2013 at 12:00 pm. [8715929] (Pentz, John) [Entered: 07/24/2013 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Docket(#5) Terminated Chet Alan Kronenberg for LG Display Co., Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc. in 13-15930 [8664231] (CW) [Entered: 06/12/2013 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., Ltd. Correspondence: Correspondence to Clerk re: Notice of Settlement in Underlying Case. Date of service: 06/11/2013 [8663945] (Kronenberg, Chet) [Entered: 06/11/2013 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 5/20/13. [8638567] (CW) [Entered: 05/22/2013 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/08/2013. [8620718] (Pentz, John) [Entered: 05/08/2013 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/14/2013. Transcript ordered by 05/29/2013. Transcript due 06/28/2013. Appellants Barbara Cochran, Kevin Luke, Gerri Marshall, Maria Marshall, Wayne Marshall and Geri Maxwell opening brief due 08/07/2013. Appellees AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Indirect Plaintiff Class, Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. and Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. answering brief due 09/06/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8620140] (RT) [Entered: 05/07/2013 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECTRUM SETTLEMENT RECOVERY is a litigant