This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2021 at 06:16:42 (UTC).

Indiana Public Retirement, et al v. Pluralsight, et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Indiana Public Retirement filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Pluralsight. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4058

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GARY CRITTENDEN

RYAN HINKLE

BONITA STEWART

ARNE DUNCAN

JAMES BUDGE

SCOTT DORSEY

KARENANN TERRELL

TIMOTHY MAUDLIN

BRAD RENCHER

MORGAN STANLEY & CO

AARON SKONNARD

JP MORGAN SECURITIES

FREDERICK ONION

LEAH JOHNSON

PLURALSIGHT, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellants

PUBLIC SCHOOL TEACHERS' PENSION AND RETIREMENT FUND OF CHICAGO, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

INDIANA PUBLIC RETIREMENT SYSTEM, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jason W. Hardin

Attorney at Fabian & Clendenin dba Fabian VanCott

215 South State Street, Suite 1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2323

Gregory Lewis Watts

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5100

Seattle, WA 98104

Sarah C. Vaughn

Attorney at Fabian & Clendenin dba Fabian VanCott

215 South State Street, Suite 1200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2323

Stephanie L. Jensen

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5100

Seattle, WA 98104

Ignacio Salceda

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Ignacio E. Salceda

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Erik Anthony Christiansen

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

201 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brian D. Weinstein

Attorney at Davis, Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

Alan S. Mouritsen

Attorney at Parsons Behle & Latimer

201 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Alexander Bystryn

Attorney at Davis, Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

Brian S. Weinstein

Attorney at Davis, Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Megan K. Kistler

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll

1100 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500, East Tower

Washington, DC 20005

Steven J. Toll

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll

1100 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 500, East Tower

Washington, DC 20005

Keith M. Woodwell

Attorney at Clyde Snow & Sessions

201 South Main Street, 13Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Carol V. Gilden

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1705

Chicago, IL 60603

Joel P. Laitman

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll

88 Pine Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Joseph D. Watkins

Attorney at Clyde Snow & Sessions

201 South Main Street, 13Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10835572] Entry of appearance filed by Jason W. Hardin for Arne Duncan, Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 06/09/2021 08:54 AM]

Open Document

[10834002] Motion filed by Appellants Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 08/02/2021. Served on: 06/02/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-4058] KMW [Entered: 06/02/2021 01:24 PM]

Open Document

[10831102] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 07/02/2021 for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago [21-4058] [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:28 AM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10830901] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/17/2021 for Alexander Bystryn. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:21 PM]

Open Document

[10830292] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Erik Anthony Christiansen and Mr. Alan S. Mouritsen for Morgan Stanley & Co and JP Morgan Securities. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:40 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10829525] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sarah C. Vaughn for Arne Duncan, Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-4058] [Entered: 05/13/2021 07:26 AM]

Open Document

[10829492] Notice that the necessary transcriptis on file in district court filed by Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Served on: 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058]--[Edited 05/13/2021 by KLP to correct the event code and docket text.] KMW [Entered: 05/12/2021 04:51 PM]

Open Document

[10829454] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Carol V. Gilden, Mr. Joel P. Laitman, Mr. Joseph D. Watkins, Meghan K. Kistler and Mr. Keith M. Woodwell for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/12/2021 04:10 PM]

Open Document

[10829444] Docketing statement filed by Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] KMW [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:55 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10835572] Entry of appearance filed by Jason W. Hardin for Arne Duncan, Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 06/09/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket[10835558] Entry of appearance submitted by Jason W. Hardin for Appellees Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Arne Duncan, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] --[Edited 06/09/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JWH [Entered: 06/09/2021 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket[10834065] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants' motion to extend time to file appellants' brief. Appellants' brief and appenidx are now due on 08/02/2021 for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. No further extensions of time will be granted on the clerk's authority. Served on 06/02/2021. Text only entry - no attachment. [21-4058] [Entered: 06/02/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10834002] Motion filed by Appellants Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 08/02/2021. Served on: 06/02/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-4058] KMW [Entered: 06/02/2021 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket[10832543] Attorney Mr. Alexander Bystryn for Morgan Stanley & Co and JP Morgan Securities admitted to the bar of this court. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10831102] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 07/02/2021 for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago [21-4058] [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10831087] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-4058] [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10830901] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 06/17/2021 for Alexander Bystryn. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10830292] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Erik Anthony Christiansen and Mr. Alan S. Mouritsen for Morgan Stanley & Co and JP Morgan Securities. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docket[10830234] Entry of appearance submitted by Erik A. Christiansen and Alan S. Mouritsen for Appellees JP Morgan Securities and Morgan Stanley & Co for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/14/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058]--[Edited 05/17/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] ASM [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket[10829537] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/20/2021 for D. Mark Jones, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-4058] [Entered: 05/13/2021 07:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829525] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sarah C. Vaughn for Arne Duncan, Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-4058] [Entered: 05/13/2021 07:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket[10829504] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah C. Vaughn for Appellees Pluralsight, Inc., Aaron Skonnard, James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Arne Duncan, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Brad Rencher, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058]--[Edited 05/13/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/13/21.] SCV [Entered: 05/12/2021 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket[10829502] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory L. Watts and Stephanie L. Jensen for Appellees James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Arne Duncan, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Pluralsight, Inc., Brad Rencher, Aaron Skonnard, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/13/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 05/13/21][21-4058] GLW [Entered: 05/12/2021 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket[10829500] Entry of appearance submitted by Ignacio E. Salceda for Appellees James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Arne Duncan, Ryan Hinkle, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Frederick Onion, Pluralsight, Inc., Brad Rencher, Aaron Skonnard, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] --[Edited 05/13/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] IS [Entered: 05/12/2021 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829492] Notice that the necessary transcriptis on file in district court filed by Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Served on: 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058]--[Edited 05/13/2021 by KLP to correct the event code and docket text.] KMW [Entered: 05/12/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829454] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Carol V. Gilden, Mr. Joel P. Laitman, Mr. Joseph D. Watkins, Meghan K. Kistler and Mr. Keith M. Woodwell for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] [Entered: 05/12/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829444] Docketing statement filed by Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058] KMW [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket[10829441] Entry of appearance submitted by Keith M. Woodwell, Joseph D. Watkins, Carol V. Gilden, Joel P. Laitman for Appellants Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-4058]--[Edited 05/12/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] KMW [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826367] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/29/2021 Docketing statement due 05/13/2021 for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Transcript order form due 05/13/2021 for Indiana Public Retirement System and Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2021 for James Budge, Gary Crittenden, Scott Dorsey, Arne Duncan, Ryan Hinkle, Indiana Public Retirement System, JP Morgan Securities, Leah Johnson, Timothy Maudlin, Morgan Stanley & Co, Frederick Onion, Pluralsight, Inc., Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, Brad Rencher, Aaron Skonnard, Bonita Stewart and Karenann Terrell. [21-4058] [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public School Teachers Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago is a litigant

Latest cases where Pluralsight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Stanley Delta Holdings, LLC dba Morgan Stanley Private Bank, National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Securities LLC is a litigant