This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/31/2019 at 06:04:03 (UTC).

In Re:Hertz Global Holdings

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 In Re Hertz Global Holdings was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3532

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant

MARK P. FRISSORA

Defendant / Appellees

HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS INC

ELYSE DOUGLAS

JATINDAR S. KAPUR

Plaintiff / Appellants

WESTCHESTER TEAMSTERS PENSION FUND

SHEET METAL WORKERS LOCAL 80 PENSION TRUST FUND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

John D. Tortorella Esq.

Attorney at Marino, Tortorella & Boyle

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928

Kevin H. Marino Esq.

Attorney at Marino, Tortorella & Boyle

437 Southern Boulevard

Chatham, NJ 07928

David A. Kotler Esq.

Attorney at Dechert

502 Carnegie Center, Suite 104

Princeton, NJ 08540

Howard S. Suskin Esq.

Attorney at Jenner & Block

353 North Clark Street, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60654

Adam G. Unikowsky Esq.

Attorney at Jenner & Block

1099 New York Avenue, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Ross B. Bricker Esq.

Attorney at Jenner & Block

353 North Clark Street, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60654

Elliot Greenfield Esq.

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Maeve L. O'Connor Esq.

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Heather E. Murray Esq.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Gregory A. Markel Esq.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Peter S. Pearlman Esq.

Attorney at Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann & Knopf

Park 80 West - Plaza One, 250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

James E. Cecchi Esq.

Attorney at Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Evan J. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Douglas S. Wilens Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Samuel H. Rudman Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document #1

Standing_Order_ Excess_ Pagination_010912

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing_Order_ Excess_ Pagination_010912

Open Document #3

Case_Caption

Open Document #2

District_Court_Order_093019

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund due on or before 01/14/2020. Appendix due on or before 01/14/2020. (DW) [Entered: 12/05/2019 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Hertz Global Holdings Inc. [19-3532] (HSS) [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Jatindar S. Kapur. [19-3532] (HEM) [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Elyse Douglas. [19-3532] (EG) [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund. [19-3532] (DSW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund. [19-3532] (DSW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ross B. Bricker on behalf of Appellee(s) Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. [19-3532] (RBB) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam G. Unikowsky on behalf of Appellee(s) Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. [19-3532] (AGU) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard S. Suskin on behalf of Appellee(s) Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. [19-3532] (HSS) [Entered: 11/22/2019 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOLLOW UP LETTER to Evan J. Kaufman, Esq. for Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund, Douglas S. Wilens, Esq. for Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund, Elliot Greenfield, Esq. for Elyse Douglas, Gregory A. Markel, Esq. for Jatindar S. Kapur and Heather E. Murray, Esq. for Jatindar S. Kapur requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 12/04/2019. (DW) [Entered: 11/20/2019 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund. [19-3532] (DSW) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund. [19-3532] (DSW) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas Wilens on behalf of Appellant(s) Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund. [19-3532] (DSW) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan J. Kaufman on behalf of Appellant(s) Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund. [19-3532] (EJK) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Heather E. Murray on behalf of Appellee(s) Jatindar S. Kapur. [19-3532] (HEM) [Entered: 11/12/2019 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gregory A. Markel on behalf of Appellee(s) Jatindar S. Kapur. [19-3532] (GAM) [Entered: 11/11/2019 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Elliot Greenfield on behalf of Appellee(s) Elyse Douglas. [19-3532] (EG) [Entered: 11/07/2019 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maeve O'Connor on behalf of Appellee(s) Elyse Douglas. [19-3532] (MLO) [Entered: 11/07/2019 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Sheet Metal Workers Local 80 Pension Trust Fund and Westchester Teamsters Pension Fund in District Court Nos. 2-13-cv-07050 and 2-14-cv-00285. (DW) [Entered: 11/01/2019 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sheet Metal Workers Local Union No. 83 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Scott Wilens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan J Kaufman