This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/14/2022 at 05:58:45 (UTC).

In re: ZTE Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 In re ZTE Corporation was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-148

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: ZTE CORPORATION

Respondent

WSOU INVESTMENTS LLC, dba Brazos Licensing and Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lionel M. Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

1875 Explorer Street

Reston, VA 20190

Respondent Attorneys

Jonathan K. Waldrop Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Marcus Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

John Downing Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Shelley Ivan

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Darcy L. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Heather Kim

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

ThucMinh Nguyen

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#9

(#5) ORDER filed consolidating appeals (22-147, 22-148;, 22-149, and 22-150). The revised official caption is reflected in the order. WSOU Investments is directed to file a single consolidated response to the petitions within seven days from the date of filing of this order. ZTE Corp. may file a single, consolidated reply within three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848319] [22-147, 22-148, 22-149, 22-150] [NL] [Entered: 05/06/2022 05:24 PM]

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 05/05/2022. [848023] Fee/IFP due on 05/20/2022. Entry of Appearance due 05/20/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/20/2022. [KMH] [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:24 AM]

#2

(#2) PETITION of Petitioner ZTE Corporation for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 05/05/2022 by US mail, email. [848024] [KMH] [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:27 AM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Jonathan K. Waldrop; Darcy L. Jones; Marcus A. Barber; John W. Downing; Heather S. Kim; Shelley Ivan; ThucMinh Nguyen as counsel for Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 05/06/2022 by email. [848267] [22-148] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:57 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 05/06/2022 by email. [848268] [22-148] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:58 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filing fee paid. Fee Amount: $500.00. Receipt Number: A13-37501-214. [848514] [22-148] [Lionel Lavenue] [Entered: 05/09/2022 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#6) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-147 Lead with 22-148, 22-149, and 22-150 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [848400] [22-147, 22-148, 22-149, 22-150] [KMH] [Entered: 05/09/2022 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed consolidating appeals (22-147, 22-148;, 22-149, and 22-150). The revised official caption is reflected in the order. WSOU Investments is directed to file a single consolidated response to the petitions within seven days from the date of filing of this order. ZTE Corp. may file a single, consolidated reply within three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [848319] [22-147, 22-148, 22-149, 22-150] [NL] [Entered: 05/06/2022 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 05/06/2022 by email. [848268] [22-148] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Jonathan K. Waldrop; Darcy L. Jones; Marcus A. Barber; John W. Downing; Heather S. Kim; Shelley Ivan; ThucMinh Nguyen as counsel for Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 05/06/2022 by email. [848267] [22-148] [Jonathan Waldrop] [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner ZTE Corporation for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 05/05/2022 by US mail, email. [848024] [KMH] [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 05/05/2022. [848023] Fee/IFP due on 05/20/2022. Entry of Appearance due 05/20/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/20/2022. [KMH] [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Downing Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelley Ivan