This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2022 at 06:01:32 (UTC).

In re: W.R. Grace & Co

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 In re W R Grace Co was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3215

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Debtor / Appellee

In re: WR GRACE & CO

Plaintiff / Appellant

GARY SMOLKER

Encino, CA 91436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Mark M. Billion Esq.

Attorney at Billion Law Firm

1073 South Governors Avenue

Dover, DE 19904

David W. Carickhoff Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1370

Wilmington, DE 19801

Curtis A. Hehn Esq.

1000 North West Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Roger J. Higgins Esq.

516 North Ogden Avenue

Chicago, IL 60642

Daniel K. Hogan Esq.

Attorney at Hogan McDaniel

1311 Delaware Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Laura D. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

919 North Market Street, P.O. Box 8705, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

James E. O'Neill Esq. III

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

919 North Market Street, P.O. Box 8705, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gary Smolker

16055 Ventura Boulevard

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Memorandum Order 11/12/21

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #4

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura Davis Jones, Esquire with Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:04 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. O'Neill, Esquire with Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (JEO) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:07 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roger J. Higgins, Esquire with The Law Offices of Roger Higgins, LLC on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (RJH) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:10 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WR Grace & Co. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:12 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance. Service made on 12/13/2021 by 3rd party, Email. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:35 PM]

#8

(#8) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 12/17/2021 02:59 PM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER (Clerk) The motion for extension of time is granted. Appellant's response must be filed on or before February 2, 2021. This order is without prejudice to renewal in the event Appellant is still incapacitated on or before the filing deadline. Any renewed motion for extension of time must be filed within three (3) days prior to the established deadline. (CJG) [Entered: 01/14/2022 09:36 AM]

#11

(#11) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1). No proceedings in District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:12 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1). No proceedings in District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/18/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (Clerk) The motion for extension of time is granted. Appellant's response must be filed on or before February 2, 2021. This order is without prejudice to renewal in the event Appellant is still incapacitated on or before the filing deadline. Any renewed motion for extension of time must be filed within three (3) days prior to the established deadline. (CJG) [Entered: 01/14/2022 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION filed by Appellant Gary Smolker for Six (6) Week Extension to File Response to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal until February 2, 2022. Response, if any, due on 01/18/2022. [-Document has been restricted as it includes medical documents.] (CJG) [Entered: 01/07/2022 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 12/17/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance. Service made on 12/13/2021 by 3rd party, Email. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee WR Grace & Co. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roger J. Higgins, Esquire with The Law Offices of Roger Higgins, LLC on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (RJH) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. O'Neill, Esquire with Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (JEO) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura Davis Jones, Esquire with Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) W. R. Grace & Co.. [21-3215] (LDJ) [Entered: 12/13/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Gary Smolker in District Court No. 1-21-cv-00987. (CJG) [Entered: 12/01/2021 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less