This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/20/2021 at 14:08:15 (UTC).

In Re: World Trade Center Lowe

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 In Re World Trade Center Lowe was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2934

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daria Janina Wszolkowska, As Administrator of the Estate of Dariusz Wszolkowski

Monica Arce

Marek Socha

Tina L. Jones, in her capacity as the Administratrix of the Estate of James Jones, Deceased

Malgorzata Kuca, in her capacity as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Franciszek Zugaj, Deceased

Alexandra Burnett, in her capacity as Personal Representative of teh Estate of Juan Zurita, Deceased

Marco Fernandez

Elizabieta Kosousku, in their capacity as the Co-Administratrices of the Estate of Edward Kosowski, Deceased

Marcin Matuszewski, Administrator of the Estate of Marolia Matuszewski

Defendants

The Bank of New York

Ann Taylor Stores Corporation

Weston Solutions, Inc.

Cunningham Duct Cleaning Co., Inc.

Lehman Brothers Inc.

110 Church LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

William Rodriguez

Maria Alvarez

Leonardo Naranjo

Juan Caivinagua

Fabio Morales

492 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Nicholas Rocco Farnolo Esq.

Attorney at Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Christopher R. Lopalo Esq.

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

400 Broadhollow Road

Melville, NY 11747

Paul J. Napoli Esq.

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

360 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

John Martin Flannery Esq.

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

1133 Westchester Avenue

White Plains, NY 10604

Rachel B. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Margaret H. Warner Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

The Mcdermott Building, 500 North Capitol Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah Hogarth Esq.

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

The Mcdermott Building, 500 North Capitol Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Daniel S. Connolly

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#112

(#112) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2954623] [19-2934] [Entered: 10/19/2020 08:10 AM]

#110

(#110) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2939339] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:54 AM]

107 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

107 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

107 #1

Summary Order FILED

#105

RESTRICTED

#104

RESTRICTED

#102

RESTRICTED

#101

RESTRICTED

#100

RESTRICTED

#96

No Description Available

95 #2

Notice_to_the_BAR

95 #1

Cal_Ntc_Oral_Audio_Statement

#91

No Description Available

#89

No Description Available

#88

No Description Available

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2954623] [19-2934] [Entered: 10/19/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2939339] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docket(#109) CAPTION, pursuant to SUMMARY ORDER, AMENDED.[2939336] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the judgment of the district court, by GEL, RJS, MHP, FILED.[2939328] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/28/2020 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#106) CASE, before GEL, RJS, MHP, HEARD.[2929866] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali, Gloria Alvarez, Maria Alvarez, Jose Alvarracin, Santiago Alvear, Rossina Angulo, Betsy Arruda-Loor, Carlos Asmal, Freddy Astudillo, Wilmer Astudillo, Nolberto Avila, Richard Avila, Rodrigo Barros, Julio Bastidas, Luis Bermeo, Jacek Bogacki, Johnathan Buckley, Hector Buestan, Flor Bunay, Teresa Bunay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Juan Caivinagua, Martha Caiza, Gil Calle, Rodrigo Campozano, Consuelo Campuzano, James Carr, Carlos Castano, Nancy Castillo, Piedad Castillo, Aida Chalco, Manuel Chique, Andrzej Chojnowski, Yolanda Cintron, Freddy Cordero, Jose Coronel, Manuel Cosme, Nancy Criollo, Peter Curley, Mieczyslaw Dabrowski, Flora Davila, Maria DeJesus, Leo DiRubbo, Clara Dota, Glenn Dowd, Stanislaw Drozdz, Angel Duchitanga, Manuel Duchitanga, Maria Duchitanga, Alex Espinoza, Manuel Fares, Aldo Feliciano, Lazaro Fuentes, Rebeca Gallegos, Walter Gallegos, Diana Galli, Edir Giraldo, Malgorzata Grabowska, Samuel Guiracocha, Isaac Hernandez, Jose Herrera, Luis Inga, John Kear, John Kearney, Andrzej Korzep, Segundo Leon, Manuel Lituma, Maria Lluguay, Raul Loja, Wilber Lopez, Walter Marin, Sandra McKay, Carlos Merchan, Richard Miranda, Eugenio Mora, Fabio Morales, Segundo Morales, Como Mordente, Simon Morocho, Jacek Mrozek, Angel Naranjo, Leonardo Naranjo, Luis Naranjo, Miguel Naula, Segundo Naula, Emil Onzo, Felix Parra, Leydi Parra, Michael Paternostro, Jacqueline Perez, Kazimierz Perkowski, Hernan Pineda, Maria Puma, Manuel Pumacuri, Segundo Quizhpi, Luis Rodriguez, William Rodriguez, Mario Rojas, Jorge Saavedra, Maria Salazar, Lorraine Salgado, Edilberto Sanchez, Jose Sanchez, Juan Sanchez, Wilson Sanchez, Henry Sandoya, Miquel Santana, Fernanda Santos, Edwin Sarmiento, Raul Siguencia, Norma Suco, Mauricio Tabares, Bertha Tache, Stephen Tighe, Aida Torres, Rommel Vasquez, Julio Villafuerte, Segundo Villarroel, Rosalia Vintimilla, Pedro Viscaino, Jan Wolkowicz, Bolivar Zamora, Lawrence Zenteno and Iris Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 09/11/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2928534] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/11/2020 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2925262] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/08/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#103) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2925040] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/08/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali, Gloria Alvarez, Maria Alvarez, Jose Alvarracin, Santiago Alvear, Rossina Angulo, Betsy Arruda-Loor, Carlos Asmal, Freddy Astudillo, Wilmer Astudillo, Nolberto Avila, Richard Avila, Rodrigo Barros, Julio Bastidas, Luis Bermeo, Jacek Bogacki, Johnathan Buckley, Hector Buestan, Flor Bunay, Teresa Bunay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Juan Caivinagua, Martha Caiza, Gil Calle, Rodrigo Campozano, Consuelo Campuzano, James Carr, Carlos Castano, Nancy Castillo, Piedad Castillo, Aida Chalco, Manuel Chique, Andrzej Chojnowski, Yolanda Cintron, Freddy Cordero, Jose Coronel, Manuel Cosme, Nancy Criollo, Peter Curley, Mieczyslaw Dabrowski, Flora Davila, Maria DeJesus, Leo DiRubbo, Clara Dota, Glenn Dowd, Stanislaw Drozdz, Angel Duchitanga, Manuel Duchitanga, Maria Duchitanga, Alex Espinoza, Manuel Fares, Aldo Feliciano, Lazaro Fuentes, Rebeca Gallegos, Walter Gallegos, Diana Galli, Edir Giraldo, Malgorzata Grabowska, Samuel Guiracocha, Isaac Hernandez, Jose Herrera, Luis Inga, John Kear, John Kearney, Andrzej Korzep, Segundo Leon, Manuel Lituma, Maria Lluguay, Raul Loja, Wilber Lopez, Walter Marin, Sandra McKay, Carlos Merchan, Richard Miranda, Eugenio Mora, Fabio Morales, Segundo Morales, Como Mordente, Simon Morocho, Jacek Mrozek, Angel Naranjo, Leonardo Naranjo, Luis Naranjo, Miguel Naula, Segundo Naula, Emil Onzo, Felix Parra, Leydi Parra, Michael Paternostro, Jacqueline Perez, Kazimierz Perkowski, Hernan Pineda, Maria Puma, Manuel Pumacuri, Segundo Quizhpi, Luis Rodriguez, William Rodriguez, Mario Rojas, Jorge Saavedra, Maria Salazar, Lorraine Salgado, Edilberto Sanchez, Jose Sanchez, Juan Sanchez, Wilson Sanchez, Henry Sandoya, Miquel Santana, Fernanda Santos, Edwin Sarmiento, Raul Siguencia, Norma Suco, Mauricio Tabares, Bertha Tache, Stephen Tighe, Aida Torres, Rommel Vasquez, Julio Villafuerte, Segundo Villarroel, Rosalia Vintimilla, Pedro Viscaino, Jan Wolkowicz, Bolivar Zamora, Lawrence Zenteno and Iris Zimmerman, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2910292] [19-2934] [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee WTC Captive Insurance Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2909932] [19-2934] [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali and Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, FILED. Service date 09/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2664292] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/25/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [10], on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali, FILED.[2664143] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [9], on behalf of Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, FILED.[2664118] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/25/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali, FILED. Service date 09/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2663618] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/24/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, FILED. Service date 09/24/2019 by CM/ECF. [2663518] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/24/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2659549] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Carlos Ali, Gloria Alvarez, Maria Alvarez, Jose Alvarracin, Santiago Alvear, Rossina Angulo, Betsy Arruda-Loor, Carlos Asmal, Freddy Astudillo, Wilmer Astudillo, Nolberto Avila, Richard Avila, Rodrigo Barros, Julio Bastidas, Luis Bermeo, Jacek Bogacki, Johnathan Buckley, Hector Buestan, Flor Bunay, Teresa Bunay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Juan Caivinagua, Martha Caiza, Gil Calle, Rodrigo Campozano, Consuelo Campuzano, James Carr, Carlos Castano, Nancy Castillo, Piedad Castillo, Aida Chalco, Manuel Chique, Andrzej Chojnowski, Yolanda Cintron, Freddy Cordero, Jose Coronel, Manuel Cosme, Nancy Criollo, Mieczyslaw Dabrowski, Flora Davila, Maria DeJesus, Leo DiRubbo, Clara Dota, Glenn Dowd, Stanislaw Drozdz, Angel Duchitanga, Manuel Duchitanga, Maria Duchitanga, Alex Espinoza, Manuel Fares, Aldo Feliciano, Lazaro Fuentes, Rebeca Gallegos, Walter Gallegos, Diana Galli, Edir Giraldo, Malgorzata Grabowska, Samuel Guiracocha, Isaac Hernandez, Jose Herrera, Luis Inga, John Kear, John Kearney, Andrzej Korzep, Segundo Leon, Manuel Lituma, Raul Loja, Wilber Lopez, Walter Marin, Sandra McKay, Carlos Merchan, Richard Miranda, Eugenio Mora, Fabio Morales, Segundo Morales, Como Mordente, Simon Morocho, Jacek Mrozek, Angel Naranjo, Leonardo Naranjo, Luis Naranjo, Miguel Naula, Segundo Naula, Emil Onzo, Felix Parra, Leydi Parra, Michael Paternostro, Jacqueline Perez, Kazimierz Perkowski, Hernan Pineda, Maria Puma, Manuel Pumacuri, Segundo Quizhpi, Luis Rodriguez, William Rodriguez, Mario Rojas, Jorge Saavedra, Maria Salazar, Lorraine Salgado, Edilberto Sanchez, Jose Sanchez, Juan Sanchez, Wilson Sanchez, Henry Sandoya, Miquel Santana, Fernanda Santos, Edwin Sarmiento, Norma Suco, Mauricio Tabares, Bertha Tache, Stephen Tighe, Aida Torres, Rommel Vasquez, Julio Villafuerte, Segundo Villarroel, Rosalia Vintimilla, Pedro Viscaino, Jan Wolkowicz, Bolivar Zamora, Lawrence Zenteno and Iris Zimmerman, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17581431, FILED.[2659536] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2659529] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2659526] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Leo DiRubbo, Carlos Ali, Gloria Alvarez, Maria Alvarez, Jose Alvarracin, Santiago Alvear, Rossina Angulo, Betsy Arruda-Loor, Carlos Asmal, Freddy Astudillo, Wilmer Astudillo, Nolberto Avila, Richard Avila, Rodrigo Barros, Julio Bastidas, Luis Bermeo, Jacek Bogacki, Johnathan Buckley, Hector Buestan, Flor Bunay, Teresa Bunay, Bolivar Caivinagua, Juan Caivinagua, Martha Caiza, Gil Calle, Rodrigo Campozano, Consuelo Campuzano, James Carr, Carlos Castano, Nancy Castillo, Piedad Castillo, Aida Chalco, Manuel Chique, Andrzej Chojnowski, Yolanda Cintron, Freddy Cordero, Jose Coronel, Manuel Cosme, Nancy Criollo, Peter Curley, Mieczyslaw Dabrowski, Flora Davila, Maria DeJesus, Clara Dota, Glenn Dowd, Stanislaw Drozdz, Angel Duchitanga, Manuel Duchitanga, Maria Duchitanga, Alex Espinoza, Manuel Fares, Aldo Feliciano, Lazaro Fuentes, Rebeca Gallegos, Walter Gallegos, Diana Galli, Edir Giraldo, Malgorzata Grabowska, Samuel Guiracocha, Isaac Hernandez, Jose Herrera, Luis Inga, John Kear, John Kearney, Andrzej Korzep, Segundo Leon, Manuel Lituma, Maria Lluguay, Raul Loja, Wilber Lopez, Walter Marin, Sandra McKay, Carlos Merchan, Richard Miranda, Eugenio Mora, Fabio Morales, Segundo Morales, Como Mordente, Simon Morocho, Jacek Mrozek, Angel Naranjo, Leonardo Naranjo, Luis Naranjo, Miguel Naula, Segundo Naula, Emil Onzo, Felix Parra, Leydi Parra, Michael Paternostro, Jacqueline Perez, Kazimierz Perkowski, Hernan Pineda, Maria Puma, Manuel Pumacuri, Segundo Quizhpi, Luis Rodriguez, William Rodriguez, Mario Rojas, Jorge Saavedra, Maria Salazar, Lorraine Salgado, Edilberto Sanchez, Jose Sanchez, Juan Sanchez, Wilson Sanchez, Henry Sandoya, Miquel Santana, Fernanda Santos, Edwin Sarmiento, Raul Siguencia, Norma Suco, Mauricio Tabares, Bertha Tache, Stephen Tighe, Aida Torres, Rommel Vasquez, Julio Villafuerte, Segundo Villarroel, Rosalia Vintimilla, Pedro Viscaino, Jan Wolkowicz, Bolivar Zamora, Lawrence Zenteno, Iris Zimmerman, FILED. [2659511] [19-2934] [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel S. Connolly