This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/07/2022 at 05:00:43 (UTC).

Waze Mobile LimitedIn re: Waze Mobile Limited

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Waze Mobile LimitedIn re Waze Mobile Limited was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-141

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: WAZE MOBILE LIMITED

Respondent

AGIS SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ginger Anders

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Evan Jennings Mann

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jordan Dentler Segall

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorney

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Avenue

Rye, NY 10580

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER consolidating appeals (22- 140, 22-141, 22-142); The appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing and resolution. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in the order. AGIS Software Development LLC is directed to file a single, consolidated response to the petitions no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Petitioners' single, consolidated reply is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [840885] [22-140, 22-141, 22-142] [NL] [Entered: 04/04/2022 05:06 PM]

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 04/01/2022. [840678] Fee/IFP is due on 04/18/2022. Entry of Appearance is due on 04/18/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/18/2022. [EKD] [Entered: 04/04/2022 12:55 PM]

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#2

Non-Confidential Appendix

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Ginger Anders; Evan Jennings Mann; Jordan Dentler Segall as counsel for Petitioner Waze Mobile Limited. Service: 04/04/2022 by clerk. [840682] [EKD] [Entered: 04/04/2022 01:00 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22- 140, 22-141, and 22-142. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [840956] [22-140, 22-141, 22-142] [EKD] [Entered: 04/05/2022 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER consolidating appeals (22- 140, 22-141, 22-142); The appeals are consolidated for purposes of briefing and resolution. The revised official caption and short caption are reflected in the order. AGIS Software Development LLC is directed to file a single, consolidated response to the petitions no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Petitioners' single, consolidated reply is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [840885] [22-140, 22-141, 22-142] [NL] [Entered: 04/04/2022 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Ginger Anders; Evan Jennings Mann; Jordan Dentler Segall as counsel for Petitioner Waze Mobile Limited. Service: 04/04/2022 by clerk. [840682] [EKD] [Entered: 04/04/2022 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Waze Mobile Limited for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 04/01/2022 by email. [840681] [EKD] [Entered: 04/04/2022 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 04/01/2022. [840678] Fee/IFP is due on 04/18/2022. Entry of Appearance is due on 04/18/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/18/2022. [EKD] [Entered: 04/04/2022 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGIS Software Development LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Ross Fabricant