This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/21/2022 at 06:20:09 (UTC).

In re: Vehicle Carrier Service

Case Summary

On 10/09/2015 In re Vehicle Carrier Service was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-3354

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARTENS CARS OF WASHINGTON INC

Defendant / Appellees

EUKOR CAR CARRIERS INC

MITSUI OSK LINES

K LINE AMERICA INC

NISSAN MOTOR CAR CARRIER CO

NIPPON YUSEN KABUSHIKI KAISHA

HOEGH AUTOLINERS AS

CSAV AGENCY NORTH AMERICA LLC

WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AMERICAS LLC

COMPANIA SUD AMERICANA DE VAPORES SA

WALLENIUS WILHELMSEN LOGISTICS AS

WORLD LOGISTIC SERVICE USA INC

MITSUI OSK BULK SHIPPING USA INC

KAWASAKI KISEN KAISHA

HOEGH AUTOLINERS INC

NYK LINE NORTH AMERICA INC

Amicus Curiae

FEDERAL MARITIME COMMISSION

Washington, DC 20573

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan W. Cuneo Esq.

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca

4725 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Benjamin D. Elga Esq.

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca

16 Court Street, Suite 1012

Brooklyn, NY 11241

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roberto A. Rivera-Soto Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Jason A. Leckerman Esq.

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Benjamin F. Holt Esq.

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US

555 Thirteenth Street, N.W., Columbia Square

Washington, DC 20004

Adam M. Pergament Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Robert B. Yoshitomi Esq.

Attorney at Nixon Peabody

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Danielle M. Garten Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Jeremy J. Calsyn Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton

2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Mark W. Nelson Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton

2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Steven J. Kaiser Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton

2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Robert M. Disch Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Jeffrey F. Lawrence Esq.

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 19Th Street, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036

Melissa H. Maxman Esq.

Attorney at Cohen & Gresser

2001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Steven F. Cherry Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Maxim M.L. Nowak Esq.

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Secretary Federal Maritime Commission

Attorney at Federal Maritime Commission

1100 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20573

Tyler J. Wood Esq.

Attorney at Federal Maritime Commission

800 North Capitol Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20573

James J. Fredricks Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Sean Sandoloski Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Mandate Letter

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

Mandate Issued

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

Exhibit C Brief for the Federal Maritime Commision and U.S. as Amici Curiae

Open Document #3

Exhibit B Precedential Opinion

Open Document #2

Exhibit A Judgment

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Order

Open Document #2

District Court Opinion

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE of U.S. Supreme Court disposition at No. 16-1415. Petition for Writ of Ceriorari filed by Jill M. Alban, et al. denied on 10/02/2017. [15-3355, 15-3353, 15-3354] (LML) [Entered: 10/04/2017 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Jill M. Alban on 05/23/2017 and placed on the Supreme Court docket on 5/26/17. Supreme Court Case No. 16-1415. [15-3355, 15-3353, 15-3354] (CRG) [Entered: 05/31/2017 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED, filed. [15-3354, 15-3355] (MLR) [Entered: 03/02/2017 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (SMITH, Chief Judge, AMBRO, CHAGARES, JORDAN, HARDIMAN, VANASKIE, SHWARTZ, KRAUSE, RESTREPO and *FUENTES, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel and En Banc Rehearing filed by Appellants End Payor Plaintiffs and Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs, filed. Shwartz, Authoring Judge. [15-3354, 15-3355] *Judge Fuentes voted as to Panel rehearing only. (TYW) [Entered: 02/22/2017 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (SHWARTZ, Circuit Judge) granting Motion to lodge rehearing exhibits filed by Appellants End Payor Plaintiffs, Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs and Martens Cars of Washington Inc, filed. SHWARTZ, Authoring Judge. [15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 02/03/2017 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants End Payor Plaintiffs, Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs and Martens Cars of Washington Inc. to lodge exhibits to Petition for En Banc and Panel Rehearing. Certificate of Service dated 02/01/2017. Service made by ECF. [15-3355, 15-3354]--[Edited 02/02/2017 by JK] (WTB) [Entered: 02/01/2017 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellants End Payor Plaintiffs, Truck and Equipment Dealer Plaintiffs and Martens Cars of Washington Inc. for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 02/01/2017. Service made by ECF. [15-3355, 15-3354]--[Edited 02/02/2017 by JK] (WTB) [Entered: 02/01/2017 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, SHWARTZ and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 36. Judge: SHWARTZ Authoring. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 01/26/2017 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AMENDING OPINION (Coram: AMBRO, SHWARTZ and FUENTES, Circuit Judges) The motion to amend opinion dated 1/18/2017 is granted. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE TEXT. SHWARTZ, Authoring Judge. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 01/26/2017 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Motion filed by Amicus Curiae USA in 15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355 to amend opinion dated 01/18/2017. Certificate of Service dated 01/24/2017. Service made by ECF. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (SS) [Entered: 01/24/2017 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Steven F. Cherry, Esq. for Appellees Compania Sud Americana De Vapores SA and CSAV Agency North America LLC in 15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355.. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 10/22/2015 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Martens Cars of Washington Inc in 15-3354 advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Lynne Johnson. --[Edited 10/22/2015 by JK] (PSP) [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Martens Cars of Washington Inc in 15-3354, filed. --[Edited 10/22/2015 by JK] (PSP) [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Scotland Car Yard Enterprises d/b/a San Rafael Mitsubishi;Panama City Automotive Group, Inc. d/b/a John Lee Nissan; Hodges Imported Cars, Inc. d/b/a Hodges Subaru;Hartley Buick/GMC Truck, Inc. d/b/a Hartley Honda;EmpireNissan of Santa Rosa, LLC; etc., filed. on behalf of Appellant Martens Cars of Washington Inc in 15-3354, filed.--[Edited 10/22/2015 by JK] (PSP) [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Martens Cars of Washington Inc, received. (PSP) [Entered: 10/22/2015 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 10/09/2015 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 10/09/2015 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER, The appeals at Nos. 15-3353, 15-3354, and 15-3355 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, and disposition. See order for complete text, filed. [15-3353, 15-3354, 15-3355] (JK) [Entered: 10/09/2015 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (Clerk) For all parties represented by Peter S. Pearlman, Esq., or any other attorney from the law firm of Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann & Knopf LLP, the designated filer shall be Martens Cars of Washington, Inc.. Counsel is directed to choose this party designation when filing electronically, filed. (JK) [Entered: 10/09/2015 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Martens Cars of Washington Inc in District Court No. 2-13-cv-3306,MDL 2471. (JK) [Entered: 10/09/2015 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITSUI O.S.K. BULK SHIPPING (USA), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Martens Cars of Washington, Inc. is a litigant