This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/14/2019 at 05:47:37 (UTC).

In re: TTEC Healthcare, et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 In re TTEC Healthcare was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1339

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TTEC HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC.

TTEC HOLDINGS, INC.

Respondents

FRANCIS HOUSTON, JR., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

SONDRA BEATTIE, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Arthur J. Rooney

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie

300 East Randolph Street, Suite 5000

Chicago, IL 60601

Jessica E. Whelan

Attorney at Holland & Hart

9555 Hillwood Drive, 2Nd Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89134

Marcy Geoffrey Glenn Esq.

Attorney at Holland & Hart

555 17Th Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Jay Stoops

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz

One Town Center, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Rod M. Johnston

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz

One Town Center, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Matthew L. Turner

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz

One Town Center, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

OP Dkt Letter

Open Document

Open Document #1

Petitioners' Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 1 of 3 (Exhibit N

Open Document #2

Petitioners' Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 2 of 3 (Exhibit N

Open Document #3

Petitioners' Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 3 of 3 (Exhibit N

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678089] Order filed by Judges Bacharach, Kelly, and McHugh granting a temporary stay to facilitate the court's consideration of responses to the petition for writ of mandamus and motion for stay. Responses due no later than 3:00 p.m. MST on 09/17/2019 for Sondra Beattie and Francis Houston Jr. The portions of the district court's 07/03/2019 and 09/06/2019 orders that require production of the employees' names and contact information are stayed until further order of this court. Served on 09/12/2019. [19-1339] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10678076] Petitioners' appendix to petition for writ of mandamus filed by TTEC Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and TTEC Holdings, Inc.. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 09/12/2019 by LAB to correct text of documents filed.] [19-1339] MGG [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677776] Appellant's motion filed by TTEC Healthcare Solutions, Inc. and TTEC Holdings, Inc. for stay of Judge Moore's 7/3/2019 ruling. Served on 09/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1339] [Entered: 09/12/2019 06:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10677775] Case docketed. Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed. Fee paid. ; Receipt # A10-46452-920; Amount $500.00. DATE RECEIVED: 09/11/2019. [19-1339] [Entered: 09/12/2019 06:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TTEC HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Turner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rod M Johnston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Stoops