This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/27/2022 at 07:23:26 (UTC).

In re: Treasury Securities Auc

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 In re Treasury Securities Auc was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-943

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendant / Appellees

Arkansas Teacher Retirement System

Beaver County Employees' Retirement Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Marc Federighi, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated

Inter-Local Pension Fund of the Graphic Communications Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters

Lackawanna County Employees' Retirement Fund

Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company

State-Boston Retirement System, on behalf of itself

United International Insurance Company

United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Pension Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Jonathan Richard Williamson

Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago

City of Omaha Police and Fire Retirement System

Thomas E. Kalaway

Michael J. Smith, individually and on behalf of those similary situated

CNB Bancorp, Inc.

The Police Retirement System of St Louis

M & N Trading

Marina Fouts, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

Michael St. John

Laborers Local 100 and 397 Health and Welfare Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated

79 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel L. Brockett

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Donald R. Hall Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

850 3Rd Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

David Francis Sorensen Esq.

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael B. Eisenkraft Esq.

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

88 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Agnes Dunogue Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Adam Selim Hakki Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Benjamin Klebanoff Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Richard C. Pepperman II

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen S. McArthur Esq.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1700 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jay B. Kasner Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

David G. Januszewski Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

32 Old Slip

New York, NY 10005

Jonathan Sloan Carter

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert Y. Sperling Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Staci Yablon

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Breon S. Peace

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Mark Putnam Gimbel Esq.

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

John E. Schmidtlein

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

680 Maine Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Brad S. Karp Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Paul S. Mishkin Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Melanie L. Katsur Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#118

(#118) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 06/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325301] [22-943] [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:39 AM]

#116

(#116) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF. [3324941] [22-943] [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:14 PM]

#113

(#113) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion to remove appeal from the Court's Expedited Appeals Calendar and setting 08/18/2022 as the opening brief due date [ # 108 ], filed by Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Torus Capital LLC and UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, by JON, FILED. [3323462][113] [22-943] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:05 AM]

#108

(#108) MOTION, to remove appeal from Expedited Appeals Calendar on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Torus Capital LLC and UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 05/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322053] [22-943]--[Edited 05/26/2022 by RW] [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:15 PM]

#107

(#107) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Memorandum Brief, [106], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED.[3321937] [22-943] [Entered: 05/26/2022 11:22 AM]

#105

No Description Available

#101

No Description Available

#99

No Description Available

#97

No Description Available

#96

No Description Available

#94

No Description Available

#91

No Description Available

#86

No Description Available

#85

No Description Available

#84

No Description Available

#82

No Description Available

#81

No Description Available

#80

No Description Available

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#120) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Douglas L. Capdeville, Esq. for Appellant The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, stricken from CM/ECF for failure to file for admission or renew admission, REMOVED.[3337072] [22-943] [Entered: 06/23/2022 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) ATTORNEY, David O. Fisher for Erie County Employees' Retirement System Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund Rock Capital Markets, LLC Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH Boston Retirement System Torus Capital LLC Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd. UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund Alaska Electrical Pension Fund Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, in case 22-943 , [ # 118 ], ADDED.[3325327] [22-943] [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 06/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325301] [22-943] [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) ATTORNEY, Carol V. Gilden for Erie County Employees' Retirement System Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund Rock Capital Markets, LLC Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH Boston Retirement System Torus Capital LLC Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd. UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund Alaska Electrical Pension Fund Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, in case 22-943 , [ # 116 ], ADDED.[3324984] [22-943] [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF. [3324941] [22-943] [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion to remove appeal from the Court's Expedited Appeals Calendar and setting 08/18/2022 as the opening brief due date [ # 108 ], filed by Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Boston Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Torus Capital LLC and UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, by JON, FILED. [3323462][113] [22-943] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, TO REMOVE APPEAL FROM EXPEDITED APPEALS CALENDAR, [ # 108 ], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED.[3322075] [22-943] [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) MOTION, to remove appeal from Expedited Appeals Calendar on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Boston Retirement System, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH, Torus Capital LLC and UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 05/25/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322053] [22-943]--[Edited 05/26/2022 by RW] [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Memorandum Brief, [106], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED.[3321937] [22-943] [Entered: 05/26/2022 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#106) MEMORANDUM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3321905] [22-943] [Entered: 05/26/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by CM/ECF. [3308345] [22-943] [Entered: 05/03/2022 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Staci Yablon for Goldman, Sachs & Co., in case 22-943, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3307592] [22-943] [Entered: 05/02/2022 09:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Goldman, Sachs & Co., FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3307233] [22-943] [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Goldman, Sachs & Co., FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3307226] [22-943] [Entered: 05/02/2022 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY, Robert Y. Sperling, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Elizabeth Petrela Papez, SUBSTITUTED.[3307104] [22-943] [Entered: 05/02/2022 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Goldman, Sachs & Co., FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3307072] [22-943] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26071417, FILED.[3306283] [22-943] [Entered: 04/29/2022 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3306281] [22-943] [Entered: 04/29/2022 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2022, RECEIVED.[3306280] [22-943] [Entered: 04/29/2022 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Bank of Jerusalem, Ltd., Boston Retirement System, City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund, City of Pontiac Police and Fire Retirement System, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Pension Fund, Employees Retirement System of Rhode Island, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Erie County Employees' Retirement System, IBEW Local 640 Arizona Chapter NECA Pension Trust Fund, MASTERINVEST Kapitalanlage GmbH, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Rock Capital Markets, LLC, The Government Employees' Retirement System of the Government of the Virgin Islands, Torus Capital LLC, UFCW Local 1500 Pension Fund, UNIQA Capital Markets GmbH and United Food and Commercial Workers Union and Participating Food Industry Employers Tri-state Pension Fund, FILED. [3306276] [22-943] [Entered: 04/29/2022 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund Of Chicago is a litigant

Latest cases where Rutgers Enhanced Insurance Company is a litigant