Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/30/2021 at 06:30:17 (UTC).

In re: THGH Liquidating LLC

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 In re THGH Liquidating LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3291

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ADMINISTRATOR OF CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Debtor / Appellee

In re: THGH LIQUIDATING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ellen W. Slights Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew D. Warner Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

David C. Weiss Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ruth A. Harvey Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 875, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Seth B. Shapiro Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 875, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Jeffrey E. Sandberg Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Tamara K. Mann Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Paige N. Topper Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Daniel B. Butz Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Curtis S. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Workman Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Charles A. Dale Esq. III

Attorney at Gadsby & Hannah

225 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110

Steven Ma Esq.

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

2049 Century Park East, 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew Talmo Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek C. Abbott Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Dennis A. Meloro Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kristen Campana Esq.

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

11 Times Square, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. The briefing and scheduling order shall be stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of this order. The parties may renew the motion for extension of time provided that any subsequent motion sets forth the progress in settlement negotiations. (LMR) [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:51 AM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services and Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:54 AM]

12 #2

Briefing Notice Issued

12 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Butz on behalf of Appellee(s) TH Liquidating Trust f/k/a THG Holdings LLC. [20-3291] (DBB) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:12 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Curtis S. Miller on behalf of Appellee(s) TH Liquidating Trust f/k/a THG Holdings LLC. [20-3291] (CSM) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:10 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of True Health Diagnostics, LLC n/k/a THDL Liquidating LLC. [20-3291] (DCA) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:06 PM]

#7

(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to THGH Liquidating LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/30/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/30/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:09 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:44 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:43 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:42 AM]

1 #5

MEMORANDUM OPINION

1 #4

ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. The briefing and scheduling order shall be stayed for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of this order. The parties may renew the motion for extension of time provided that any subsequent motion sets forth the progress in settlement negotiations. (LMR) [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services and Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services due on or before 02/01/2021. Appendix due on or before 02/01/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Butz on behalf of Appellee(s) TH Liquidating Trust f/k/a THG Holdings LLC. [20-3291] (DBB) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Curtis S. Miller on behalf of Appellee(s) TH Liquidating Trust f/k/a THG Holdings LLC. [20-3291] (CSM) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of True Health Diagnostics, LLC n/k/a THDL Liquidating LLC. [20-3291] (DCA) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek C. Abbott on behalf of Appellee(s) TH Liquidating Trust f/k/a THG Holdings LLC. [20-3291] (DCA) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to THGH Liquidating LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/30/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/30/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey E. Sandberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services; Administrator, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. [20-3291] (JES) [Entered: 12/06/2020 11:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 12/01/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Administrator of Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services in District Court No. 1-19-cv-02215. (LMR) [Entered: 12/01/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Noelle Topper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek C. Abbott