This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/09/2020 at 06:04:04 (UTC).

Andalusian Global Designated v. FOMB, et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Andalusian Global Designated filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against FOMB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1065

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellants

OCHER ROSE, L.L.C.

GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, LP

OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.

PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO BOND FUND, INC.

OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P.

PUERTO RICO FIXED INCOME FUND III, INC.

PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND V, INC.

LMA SPC, for an on behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio

PUERTO RICO AAA PORTFOLIO TARGET MATURITY FUND, INC.

REDWOOD MASTER FUND, LTD

PUERTO RICO INVESTORS BOND FUND I, INC.

PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC.

PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND III, INC.

ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY

OAKTREE HUNTINGTON INVESTMENT FUND II, L.P.

CROWN MANAGED ACCOUNTS, for and on behalf of Crown/PW SP

SV CREDIT, L.P.

TAX-FREE PUERTO RICO FUND, INC.

PUERTO RICO INVESTORS TAX-FREE FUND, INC.

Interested Party

PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Geoffrey S. Stewart

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Sparkle Leah Sooknanan

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Interested Party Attorneys

Luis C. Marini-Biaggi

Attorney at Marini Pietrantoni Muniz LLC

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Peter M. Friedman

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye St, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Other Attorneys

Paul V. Possinger

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

70 W Madison, Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60602

Peter D. Doyle

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Jeffrey W. Levitan

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Scott Rutsky

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Matthew J. Morris

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Ricardo Burgos-Vargas

Po Box 8448

San Juan, PR 00910-0488

Timothy W. Mungovan

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

1 International Pl

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Michael A. Firestein

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East, Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Melissa M. Root

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N Clark St

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

Lucia Chapman

Attorney at Luskin Stern & Eisler LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036

Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz

Attorney at PR Department of Justice

Po Box 9020192

San Juan, PR 00902-0192

Gregg M. Mashberg

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Chris Theodoridis

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036-8299

Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira

Attorney at Bennazar Garcia & Milian

Po Box 194000, #212

San Juan, PR 00919-4000

Stephan E. Hornung

Attorney at Luskin Stern & Eisler LLP

11 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036

Carla Garcia-Benitez

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges LLC

250 Munoz Rivera Ave, Ste 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

69 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCASE argued. Panel: Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Benjamin Rosenblum for Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., SV Credit, L.P., Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, LMA SPC, Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd and Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, Martin J. Bienenstock for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Peter M. Friedman for AAFAF and Catherine Steege for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. [20-1065] (AA) [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/12/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Valerie Concepcion-Cintron for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Gregg M. Mashberg for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Hector M. Mayol Kauffmann for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Matthew J. Morris for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Scott Rutsky for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, Carl Wedoff for Official Committee of Retired Employees of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Jared D. Zajac for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, FOMB and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. [20-1065] (CMP) [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6319234-2 ] submitted by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/25/2020 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/27/2020 . [20-1065] (LIM) [Entered: 02/24/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund Holdings, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 02/21/2020 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (GAK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. Upon consideration of debtors-appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and the Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico's motion for leave to file a supplemental appendix, the motion is allowed. Appellees tendered supplemental appendix is accepted for filing on this date. [20-1065] (GAK) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6315945-2 ] submitted by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico and FOMB. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6315943-2 ] submitted by Appellee AAFAF. [20-1065] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPLEADING tendered: Supplemental Appendix filed by Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, and FOMB. Number of Volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 02/07/2020. [20-1065] (DK) [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Beth Heifetz. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BH) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Sparkle L. Sooknanan. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (SLS) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney Benjamin Rosenblum. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BR) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/11/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: After hours on Friday, January 10, 2020, appellants filed a Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and for Expedited Determination of the Appeal. Appellees are ordered to file a response thereto no later than noon on Wednesday, January 15, 2020. [20-1065] (DPO) [Entered: 01/11/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule and for Expedited Determination of the Appeal filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (BB) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P. and Oceana Master Fund Ltd filed by Attorney Bruce Bennett. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065] (BB) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Redwood Master Fund, Ltd and SV Credit, L.P. filed by Attorney David R. Fox. Certificate of service dated 01/10/2020. [20-1065] (DRF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 07:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #9723) filed by Appellants Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts, Glendon Opportunities Fund, LP, LMA SPC, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund II, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel 2), L.P.,, Oaktree Opportunities Fund X (Parallel), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund X, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, L.L.C. (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd, Ocher Rose, L.L.C., PWCM Master Fund Ltd, Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Bond Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico AAA Portfolio Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico GNMA and U.S. Government Target Maturity Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Bond Fund I, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund V, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund VI, Inc., Puerto Rico Investors Tax-Free Fund, Inc., Puerto Rico Mortgage-Backed & U.S. Government Securities Fund, Inc., Redwood Master Fund, Ltd, SV Credit, L.P., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund II, Inc., Tax-Free Puerto Rico Fund, Inc. and Tax-Free Puerto Rico Target Maturity Fund, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 01/24/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 01/24/2020. Appearance form due 01/24/2020. Fee due 01/24/2020. [20-1065] (CMP) [Entered: 01/10/2020 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDWOOD MASTER FUND, LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where PUERTO RICO MORTGAGE-BACKED & U.S. GOVERNMENT SECURITIES FUND, INC. is a litigant