This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 19:12:15 (UTC).

In Re: Terrorist Attacks on Se

Case Summary

On 08/11/2011 In Re Terrorist Attacks on Se was filed as an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    11-3509

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member, Ltd.

Cantor Fitzgerald International

Jin Liu, in her own right as as executrix of the estate of Liming Gu, deceased

Madeleine A. Zuccala, as Personal Representative of the estate of Joseph J. Zuccala, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph J. Zuccala

Defendants

Islamic Investment Company of the Gulf (Sharjah)

Rahman Abdul Siral-Khatim, Minister of Defense

Dar Al Maal Al Islami

Egyptian Islamic Jihad

Abdul Rahim Mohammed Hussein, Interior Minister

Jaish-I-Mohammed, also known as Army of Mohammed

Saif Al Islam El Masry

Mohammad Abdullah Aljomaih

Anwar Hajjaj

Muhammed J. Fakihi

Jamal Ahmed Mohammed Al-Badawi

Mohammadi Rayshahri

Plaintiff / Appellants

Edward Walsh

Dawn Brown

Andrew Braun

Susan Rasweiler, as Administrator of the Estate of Roger Rasweiler, Deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Roger Rasweiler

1,478 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. McCarthy Esq.

Attorney at Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

750 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael K. Kellogg Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James P. Kreindler

Attorney at Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

750 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Justin T. Green Esq.

Attorney at Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

750 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

Robert T. Haefele Esq.

Attorney at Anderson Kill, P.C.

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Andrea Bierstein Esq.

Attorney at Anderson Kill, P.C.

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Timothy John Finn Esq.

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Richard T. Marooney

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Barry Coburn Esq.

Attorney at Coburn & Greenbaum, PLLC

1710 Rhode Island Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

David Simon Kurtzer-Ellenbogen

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Lynne A. Bernabei Esq.

Attorney at Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC

1400 16Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Jerry S. Goldman Esq.

Attorney at Anderson Kill, P.C.

1600 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alan Robert Kabat Esq.

Attorney at Bernabei & Kabat, PLLC

1400 16Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

T. Barry Kingham Esq.

Attorney at Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Martin F. McMahon Esq.

Attorney at Martin F. McMahon and Associates

1150 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20035

David R. Francescani

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Donald Allen Klein Esq.

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

666 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10103

Sean Patrick Carter Esq.

Attorney at Anderson Kill, P.C.

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#141

#120

#114

#113

#102

#98

#76

#66

#64

#48

47 #2

Supporting Document

47 #1

Reply to Opposition FILED

#40

#39

#33

#32

#29

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/30/2014, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 13-318, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1261081] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 07/01/2014 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Docket(#211) ATTORNEY, James J. McGuire, for Daral Maal Al Islami Trust, TERMINATED.[1153829] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 02/10/2014 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • Docket(#210) ATTORNEY, Conor Brendan Dugan, for Yousef Jameel, TERMINATED.[1153002] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 02/07/2014 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 09/11/2013, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 13-318, RECEIVED.[1043718] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 09/17/2013 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/08/2013, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1011643] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 08/08/2013 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Al Rajhi Bank in 12-949, FILED.[1011641] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 08/08/2013 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[977426] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 06/27/2013 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 04/16/2013, by JAC, FILED.[976819] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 06/27/2013 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 04/16/2013, by JAC, FILED.[976401] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 06/26/2013 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 04/16/2013, by JAC, FILED.[976385] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511, 12-949, 12-1457, 12-1458, 12-1459] [Entered: 06/26/2013 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2011
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY, Lynne A. Bernabei for Abdullah Omar Naseef Adnan Basha Addullah Bin Abdul Muhsen Al Turki Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe Saudi Red Crescent, in case 11-3509 Lynne A. Bernabei for Saleh Al-Hussayen Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki Addullah Bin Abdul Muhsen Al Turki Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid Abdulla Al Obaid Saudi Red Crescent Safar Al-Hawali Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, in case 11-3500 Lynne A. Bernabei for Abdullah Omar Naseef Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, in case 11-3502 Lynne A. Bernabei for Adnan Basha Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe Saudi Red Crescent, in case 11-3510 Lynne A. Bernabei for Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, in case 11-3407 Lynne A. Bernabei for Hamad Hussaini, in case 11-3496 Lynne A. Bernabei for Abdul Rahman Al Swailem Saleh Al-Hussayen Talal Mohammed Badkook Mushayt for Trading Company Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid Saudi Red Crescent Hamad Hussaini Safar Al-Hawali Adel Abdul Batterjee Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, in case 11-3495 Lynne A. Bernabei for Abdulla Al Obaidr Saleh Al-Hussayen Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki Abdullah Bin Saleh Al-Obaid Addullah Bin Abdul Muhsen Al Turki Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid Saudi Red Crescent Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee, in case 11-3507 Lynne A. Bernabei for Adnan Basha Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, in case 11-3494 Lynne A. Bernabei for Abdullah Omar Naseef Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe, in case 11-3506 , ADDED.[408139] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3502, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3509, 11-3510] [Entered: 10/04/2011 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee in 11-3407, -- Adnan Basha and Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee in 11-3494, -- Abdul Rahman Al Swailem, Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Hamad Hussaini, Mushayt for Trading Company, Safar Al-Hawali, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Salman Al-Ouda, Saudi Red Crescent, Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe and Talal Mohammed Badkook in 11-3495, Hamad Hussaini in 11-3496, -- Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Salman Al-Ouda and Appellee Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Safar Al-Hawali, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Saudi Red Crescent and Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee in 11-3500, Appellee Abdullah Omar Naseef and Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe in 11-3502, 11-3506, -- Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Safar Al-Hawali, Salman Al-Ouda and Appellee Abdullah Bin Saleh Al Obaid, Mohammed Ali Sayed Mushayt, Mushayt for Trading Company, Saleh Al-Hussayen, Saudi Red Crescent and Shahir Abdulraoof Batterjee in 11-3507, Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki and Appellee Abdullah Omar Naseef, Adnan Basha and Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe in 11-3509, Appellee Abdullah Muhsen Al Turki, Adnan Basha, Saudi Red Crescent and Soliman H.S. Al-Buthe in 11-3510, Saudi Red Crescent in 11-3511, FILED. Service date 10/03/2011 by CM/ECF. [407204] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511] [Entered: 10/03/2011 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[403725] [11-3511] [Entered: 09/28/2011 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/07/2011, Start Time: 3:30 PM, endorsed by Stanley A. Bass, FILED.[401416] [11-3294, 11-3407, 11-3490, 11-3494, 11-3495, 11-3496, 11-3500, 11-3501, 11-3502, 11-3503, 11-3505, 11-3506, 11-3507, 11-3508, 11-3509, 11-3510, 11-3511] [Entered: 09/26/2011 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Docket(#6) NOTE: See lead case, 11-3294, containing complete set of docket entries.[399074] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FORM D, on behalf of Appellants Ashton plaintiffs, FILED. Service date 09/22/2011 by CM/ECF.[399072] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM C, on behalf of Appellants Ashton plaintiffs, FILED. Service date 09/22/2011 by CM/ECF.[399071] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/14/2011, RECEIVED.[399069] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Docket(#2) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Ashton plaintiffs, district court docket entry re: receipt # 465401013642, FILED.[399067] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL (02-cv-6977), with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Abdullah Bin Laden, Aldo Addissi, Joseph Alger, George Andrucki, Mary Andrucki, Angelica Allen, Edward Arancio, Kathleen M. Arancio, Alexander Paul Aranyos, Winifred Aranyos, Margaret Arce, Barbara Ardizzone, Leonard Ardizzone, Margit Arias, Evelyn Aron, Kathleen Ashton, Nancy Badagliacca, Thomas Baez, Christina Baksh, Joanne Barbara, Daniel F. Barkow, Nina Barnes, Jeannine P. Baron, Ernesto Barrera, Jane Bartels, Kimberly Kaipaka Beaven, Sharlene M. Beckwith, Michelle Bedigan, Joseph Beltrani, Susan Berger, Madeline Bergin, Robert Bermingham, Mark Bernheimer, Miriam M. Biegeleisen, Christine Bini, Neil B. Blass, Kris A. Blood, Dorothy Ann Bogdan, Maria Teresa Boisseau, Kathleen Box, James Boyle, David Brace, Andrew Braun, Curtis Fred Brewer, Hillary A. Briley, Ursula Broghammer, Dawn Brown, JoAnne Bruehert, Juan B. Bruno, Susan E. Buhse, Elizabeth R. Burns, James C. Cahill, James W. Cahill, Kathleen Cahill, Deborah Calderon, Janet Calia, Jacqueline Cannizzaro, Cathy A. Carilli, Toni Ann Carroll, Judith Casoria, Santa Catarelli, Gina Cayne, Suk Tan Chin, Edward P. Ciafardini, James Cizikie, Lisa DiLallo Clark, Yuko Clark, Sharon Cobb-Glenn, Maryann Colin, Julia Collins, Benito Colon, Thomas Conroy, Jr., Patricia Coppo, Rubina Cox-Holloway, Gibson Craig, Edith Cruz, Ildefonso A. Cua, Linda Curia, David Edward Cushing, Louisa D'Antonio, Robert D'Elia, Bradley Daly, Beril Sofia DeFeo, Vincent J. Della Bella, Todd Devito, Donald DiDomenico, Maria DiPilato, Milagros Diaz, Andy Dinoo, Stacey Fran Dolan, Thomas Donnelly, Joseph Donovan, Charles Downey, Joseph R. Downey, Rosalie Downey, Jay Charles Dunne, Stanley Eckna, William Ellis, Michael Endrizzi, Denise Esposito, Dennis Euleau, Maryanne Farrell, Melissa Van Ness Fatha, Steven Feidelberg, Wendy Feinberg, Christy Ferer, Julio Cesar Fernandez, Charlene Fiore, Brian Flannery, Thomas Fletcher, Claudia Flyzik, Robert T. Folger, Kurt Foster, Deborah Francke, Carol Francolini, Helen Friedlander, Lisa Friedman, Irene Frolich, Timothy L. Frolich, Anne Gabriel, Monica M. Gabrielle, Kristin Galusha-Wild, Kathleen Ganci, Carmen Garcia, Hector Garcia, Elizabeth Gardner, Diane Genco, Philip Germain, Carol Gies, John J. Gill, Steven M. Gillespie, Serina Gillis, Angela Gitto, Meg Bloom Glasser, Jodie Goldberg, Mark Goldwasser, Mia Gonzalez, Rachel W. Goodrich, Deborah Grazioso, Claudette Greene, Peter Greenleaf, Joanne Gross, Gordon G. Haberman, Patricia Han, Joseph Hands, Renne Bacotti Hannafin, Ron Harding, Jeremiah Harney, Rachel R. Harrell, Sheila Gail Harris, Jennifer L. Harvey, John Hassett, Kelly Hayes, Virginia Hayes, Ann R. Haynes, Theresa Healey, Hashim A. Henderson, Shirley Henderson, Victoria Higley, Karen Hinds, Dennis L. Hobbs, Dixie M. Hobbs, James D. Hodges, Pamela Hohlweck, Kathleen Holland, Joann T. Howard, Bridget Hunter, Kathryn J. Hussa, Yesenia Ielpi, Yesenia Ielpi, Peter Ioveno, Frederick Irby, Margaret P. Iskyan, Netta Issacof, Jennifer Ruth Jacobs, Kazmierz Jakubiak, John F. Jermyn, Danny Ray Johnson, Lelia M. Joseph, Woodly Joseph, Paul Kaufman, Jurgiel Kazimierz, Robert Keane, Elizabeth H. Keller, Patricia Kellett, Emmet P. Kelly, Maureen Kelly, Rosemary Kempton, Donald Francis Kennedy, Theresa King, Richard I. Klein, Marion Knox, Fran LaForte, Edlene C. LaFrance, Collette M. LaFuente, Raymond Lachhman, Carol Laieta, Morris D. Lamonsoff, George Lantay, Laura J. Lassman, Houssain Lazaar, Andrea N. LeBlanc, Vincent LeVien, Arnold Lederman, Phyllis Lederman, Mei Jy Lee, Philip Lee, Joyce Leigh, Elaine Leinung, Donald Leistman, Jeff Lever, Roberta J. Levine, John Lewis, Melvin C. Lewis, Michael J. Lindy, Kathleen Keeler Lozier, Anne MacFarlane, Anne MacFarlane, Lisanne MacKenzie, Andrea Maffeo, Pamela Ann Maggitti, Sandy Amrita Mahabir, Frank Maisano, Natalie Makshanov, Rebecca L. Marchand, John A. Martin, Paul R. Martin, William Martin, Juan Martinez, Lori Mascali, Dorothy Mauro, Meryl Mayo, Kevin McArdle, James McGetrick, Margaret Donoghue McGinley, Iliana McGinnis, Cynthia F. McGinty, Owen McGovern, Theresa McGovern, Jo Ann Meehan, Joann Meehan, Joviana Mercado, Anna Milewski, Fryderyk Milewski, Amber Miller, Diane Miller, Faith Miller, Jamie Miller, Barbara Minervino, Joanne Modafferi, Anna Mojica, Saradha Moorthy, Elizabeth Ann Moss, Emily Motroni, Jerzy Mrozek, Elvira P. Murphy, Kevin G. Murphy, Lauren Murphy, Richard B. Naiman, Edward Navarro, William Nelson, Dana Nooan, William B. Novotny, William O'Connor, Janice O'Dell, James Wallace O'Grady, Sheryl J. Oliver, Lisa Palazzo, Donna Paolillo, Helene Parisi-Gnazzo, Linda Pascuma, Sean Passananti, Helene S. Passaro, Mary Gola Perez, Helen Pfeifer, Linda Pickford, Nancy Picone, Daniel Polatsch, Jean Oslyn Powell, Karen Princiotta, Dominic J. Puopolo, Patricia Quigley, Andrew Quinn, Dennis Quinn, Francine Raggio, Maryann Rand, Sadiq Rasool, Susan Rasweiler, James A. Reed, Theresa Regan, Albert Regenhard, Catherine T. Regenhard, Elizabeth Rego, Armand Reo, Howard Rice, Williams D. Robbins, Evelyn Rodriguez, Kevin Rogers, Carmen Romero, Martin Rosenbaum, Glenna M. Rosenburg, Lauren Rosenzweig, Judi A. Ross, Virginia Lorene Rossiter Valvo, Claudia Ruggiere, Gilbert Ruiz, Jr., Andrea Russin, Diane Ryan, Delphine Saada, Christine Sakoutis, Pedro Saleme, Dhanmatee Sam, Alexander Santoro, Maureen Santoro, Narasimha Sattaluri, Barbara Scaramuzzino, Louis Schaefer, Phyllis Schreier, Scott Schrimpe, Wen Shi, Eileen Simon, Dhanraj Singh, Kemraj Singh, Mark J. Siskopoulos, Donna Smith, Barbara Sohan, Siew Som Yeow, Robert Spadafora, Laurie Spampinato, Theresa A. Stack, Edwards J. Sweeney, Tracy Ann Taback Catalano, Eileen Tallon, Patricia Tarsiewicz, Evelyn Tepedino, Raj Thackurdeen, Sat Thackurdeen, Rosanna Thompson, Scott Ting, Andrija Tomasevic, Radmila Tomasevic, George Luis Torres, Kimberly Trimingham-Aiken, Robert V. Trivingo, Cynthia Tumulty, Marie Twomey, Victor Ugolyn, Feliciana Umanzor, Jasmine Victoria, Richard Villa, Lucy Virgilio, Russell Vomero, Diane Wall, Diane M. Walsh, Edward Walsh, Nancy Walsh, Amy Weaver, Laurie Weinberg, Delia Welty, Gary Wendell, Patricia Wiswall, Susan Wohlforth, Cella Woo-Yeun, Anne M. Woodensheck, Philip J. Zeiss, Yun Yu Zheng, David Ziminski, Erica Zucker and Nancy Lynn Zuckerman, FILED. [399056] [11-3509] [Entered: 09/22/2011 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rahman Abdul Siral-Khatim, Minister of Defense is a litigant

Latest cases where Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant