This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/06/2021 at 00:21:10 (UTC).

In Re: Terrorist Attacks on Se

Case Summary

On 04/12/2012 In Re Terrorist Attacks on Se was filed as an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    12-1476

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emily Motroni, as Administrator of the estate of Marco Motroni, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Marco Motroni

Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member, Ltd.

Andy Dinoo, as co-Administrator of the Estate of Rena Sam-Dinnoo ,deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Rena Sam-Dinnoo

Shirley Henderson, as co-Administrator of the estate of Ronnie Lee Henderson, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Ronnie Lee Henderson

Cantor Fitzgerald International

Jin Liu, in her own right as as executrix of the estate of Liming Gu, deceased

Collette M. LaFuente, as Administrator of the estate of Alan Charles LaFrance, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Alan Charles LaFrance

Andrea Maffeo, as Administrator of the estate of Jennieann Maffeo, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Jennieann Maffeo

Madeleine A. Zuccala, as Personal Representative of the estate of Joseph J. Zuccala, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Joseph J. Zuccala

James Cizikie

Diane Ryan, as Administrator of the Estate of Edward Ryan, Deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Edward Ryan

Defendants

Islamic Investment Company of the Gulf (Sharjah)

Rahman Abdul Siral-Khatim, Minister of Defense

Dar Al Maal Al Islami

Egyptian Islamic Jihad

Tadamon Islamic Bank

Jaish-I-Mohammed, also known as Army of Mohammed

Saif Al Islam El Masry

Plaintiff / Appellants

Karium Ali, in his own right as an injured party

Yvonne V. Abdool, in her own right as an Injured Party

1,451 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrea Bierstein Esq.

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Boulevard, P.O. Box 1792

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Other Attorneys

Mark Charles Hansen Esq.

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #2

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

12 #1

Case FILED

7 #10

Notice of Appeal

7 #9

Exhibit H to Form C

7 #6

Exhibit E to Form C

7 #5

Exhibit D to Form C

7 #4

Exhibit C to Form C

7 #2

Exhibit A to Form C

7 #1

Form C FILED

#93

#92

91 #2

Supporting Document

91 #1

Judgment Mandate ISSUED

#86

83 #3

83 #2

#82

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/30/2014, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 13-1146, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1261105] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 07/01/2014 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 03/21/2014, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 13-1146, RECEIVED.[1187122] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 03/26/2014 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1133927] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 01/14/2014 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) JUDGMENT, FILED.[1119389] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 12/19/2013 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Docket(#102) CAPTION, in light of opinion filed 12/19/2013, AMENDED.[1118958] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 12/19/2013 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 12/19/2013, to SDNY, ISSUED.[1118952] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 12/19/2013 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) OPINION, reverse the order denying the Rule 60(b) motion and remand to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, by RKW, JAC, CJS, FILED.[1118895] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 12/19/2013 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1118861] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 12/19/2013 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Docket(#95) ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[894871] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 04/02/2013 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Docket(#93) ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[894857] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 04/02/2013 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., Carol O'Neill, Christine Irene O'Neill, Dorothy A. O'Neill and John Patrick O'Neill, Jr. in 12-1350, FILED. Service date 04/24/2012 by CM/ECF.[589550] [12-1350, 12-1318, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519] [Entered: 04/24/2012 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/16/2012, RECEIVED.[590374] [12-1519, 12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/25/2012 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Continental Casualty Company, National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transcontinental Insurance Company, Transportation Insurance Company and Valley Forge Insurance Company in 12-1519, FILED. [590361] [12-1519, 12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/25/2012 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Federal Insurance Compnay, Pacific Indemnity Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, Chubb Insurance Company of New Jersey, Great Northern Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company, One Beacon Insurance Company, One Beacon America Insurance Company, American Employers' Insurance Company, The Camden Fire Insurance Association, Homeland Insurance Company of New York, American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, The Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Commercial Insurance Company of Newark, N.J., CNA Casualty of California, Continental Insurance Company of New Jersey, Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York, Glens Falls Insurance Company, National Ben Franklin Insurance Company of Illinois, Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member, Ltd., Ace American Insurance Company, ACE Capital V Ltd, for itself and as representative of all subscribing underwriters for ACE Global Markets Syndicate 2488, ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd, ACE INA (Canada), ACE Indemnity Insurance Company, ACE Insurance SA-NV, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Atlantic Employers Insurance Company, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Insurance Company of North America, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Woburn Insurance Ltd., AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance, AXA Corporate Solutions Insurance Company, AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance UK Branch, AXA Corporate Solutions Assurance (Canada), AXA RE Asia Pacific Pte. Limited, AXA RE, AXA RE Canadian Branch, AXA RE UK Plc., AXA Corporate Solutions Reinsurance Company, AXA Art Insurance Corporation, SPS Reassurance, AXA RE Madeira Branch, Compagnie Gererale de Reinsurance de Monte Carlo, AXA Versicherung AG, AXA Cessions, AXA Global Risks UK Ltd., Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., on behalf of Joh P. O'Neill, Sr., deceased, and on behalf of decedent's heirs-at-law, John Patrick O'Neill, Jr., Christine Irene O'Neill, Carol O'Neill, Dorothy A. O'Neill, The Estate of John Patrick O'Neill, Sr., on behalf of John Patrick O'Neill, Sr., deceased and on behalf of all decedent's heirs-at-law, Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., WTC Retail LLC, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, in 12-1318, informing Court of proposed due date 07/16/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2012 by CM/ECF, email.[585782] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477, 12-1519]--[Edited 04/20/2012 by HT] [Entered: 04/19/2012 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., Carol O'Neill, Christine Irene O'Neill, Dorothy A. O'Neill and John Patrick O'Neill, Jr. in 12-1350, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF.[581645] [12-1350, 12-1318, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/16/2012 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., Carol O'Neill, Christine Irene O'Neill, Dorothy A. O'Neill and John Patrick O'Neill, Jr. in 12-1350, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF.[581644] [12-1350, 12-1318, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/16/2012 06:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company and Vigilant Insurance Company in 12-1318, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF.[581607] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/16/2012 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company and Vigilant Insurance Company in 12-1318, FILED. Service date 04/16/2012 by CM/ECF.[581602] [12-1318, 12-1350, 12-1441, 12-1476, 12-1477] [Entered: 04/16/2012 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/16/2012, RECEIVED.[584225] [12-1476] [Entered: 04/18/2012 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yvonne V. Abdool, Alfred Acquaviva, Joseph Acquaviva, Jean Adams, Judith Aiken, James Alario, Elizabeth Alderman, Jane Alderman, Stephen Alderman, Karium Ali, Luke C. Allen, Lynn Allen, Madelyn Conroy Allen, Michael J. Allen, Richard D. Allen, Leonor Alvarez, Jocelyne Ambroise, Thomas Arias, Andrew Aris, Donald Aris, Cynthia Arnold, Banjamin Arroyo, Philipson Azenabor, John P. Baeszler, Carol Barbaro, Kim Barbaro, Nicholas Barbaro, Mark Barbieri, Armando Bardales, Brian Barry, Edmund Barry, Kevin Barry, Kevin W. Barry, Maureen Barry, Gila Barzvi, Lorraine Arias Beliveau, John Benedetto, Ondina Bennett, Frances Berden, Suzanne J. Berger, David M. Bernstein, Murray Bernstein, Norma Bernstein, Robert J. Bernstein, Joanne F. Betterly, Prakash Bhatt, Irene Bilcher, Miles Bilcher, Boris Bililovsky, Lillian Bini, Basmattie Bishundat, Bhola P. Bishundat, George Bonomo, John Bonomo, Sonia Bonomo, Sharon Booker, Julia Boryczewski, Krystyna Boryczewski, Michael Boryczewski, Michele Boryczewski, Susan Brady, Rose Brooker, John C. Buckley, Kathleen M. Buckley, Javier Burgos, Thomas Burnett, Thomas Burnett, Sr., Beverly Burnette, Deena Burnette, Rosemarie Corvino, Jennifer D'Auria, Camille Doyle, William Doyle, Sr., William Doyle, Sr., Desiree A. Gerasimovich, Maria Giordano, Michael Girdano, Anna M. Granville, Kara Hadfield, Catherine Jezycki, Michael Jezycki, Stephen Jezycki, Mary Margaret Jurgens, Lauren Arias Lucchini, Doreen Lutter, Daryl Joseph Meehan, Joann Meehan, Thomas J. Meehan, III, Jessica Murrow-Adams, Martha Burnett O'Brien, Rina Rabinowitz, Jane M. Smithwick, Emma Tisnovskiy, Leonid Tisnovskiy, Rostyslav Tisnovskiy and eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., FILED. [584206] [12-1476] [Entered: 04/18/2012 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hiscox Dedicated Corporate Member Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. is a litigant