This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2021 at 05:11:08 (UTC).

TCO ASIn re: TCO AS

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 TCO ASIn re TCO AS was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-158

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: TCO AS

Respondents

NCS MULTISTAGE LLC

NCS MULTISTAGE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Randal S. Alexander

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

227 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60606

LaTasha Mabry Snipes

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Jonathan R. Spivey

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Respondent Attorney

Megan R. Wood

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#2

Non-Confidential Appendix

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jonathan R. Spivey; LaTasha M. Snipes; Randal S. Alexander as counsel for Petitioner TCO AS. Service: 06/25/2021 by email. [782788] [21-158] [Jonathan Spivey] [Entered: 06/25/2021 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner TCO AS, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 07/01/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [782398] [LMN] [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner TCO AS. Service: 06/24/2021 by email. [782394] [LMN] [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Jonathan R. Spivey; LaTasha M. Snipes; Randal S. Alexander as counsel for Petitioner TCO AS. Service: 06/24/2021 by email. [782392] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ] [LMN] [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner TCO AS for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 06/24/2021 by email. [782391] [LMN] [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 06/24/2021. [782389] Entry of Appearance is due 07/08/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/08/2021. [LMN] [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan R. Wood