This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/22/2021 at 06:15:44 (UTC).

In re: Syngenta Hossley Gr II

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 In re Syngenta Hossley Gr II was filed as an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3110

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES B. LEX

TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP

DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

BIEBER FARM

Appellees

BYRON STONE, PLLC

TEEL & MARONEY, PLC

ABREO & CARTER

MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE

BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE

HOLLAND LAW FIRM

SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC

OVERBOE LAW

CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC

CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP

NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW

GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.

JENNA LAIRD LEGER

THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC

LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART

470 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Don Manley Downing

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.

Attorney at Seeger Weiss

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

Hugh A. Fuller

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600, Thanksgiving Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Martin John Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Anderson Deacon

102 9Th Street, Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78215

Stephen Six

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Andrew K. York

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600, Thanksgiving Tower

Dallas, TX 75201

Eric Alan Isaacson

Attorney at Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson

6580 Avenida Mirola

La Jolla, CA 92037

Other Attorneys

Gregory G. Holland

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

300 North Greene Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

James R. Olson

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

Chad W. Pekron

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms, Tull & Burrow

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

John E. Goodman

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen L. Thomas

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1000

Jackson, MS 39201

William J. Maiberger Jr.

Attorney at Watts Guerra

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3, Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Shiran Zohar

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Michael F. Smith

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

Williams Tower Ii, 2 West 2Nd Street, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Timothy J. Bomhoff

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 North Robinson, Eighth Floor, Two Leadership Square

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Daniel Allen Hossley

Attorney at Hossley Embry

515 South Vine Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Michael D. Jones

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jodi Wu

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Edwin U

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

83 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10845941] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/26/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111, 21-3121] [Entered: 07/26/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket[10845920] Entry of appearance submitted by William B. Chaney and Andrew K. York for Appellees Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Charles B. Lex, Steven A. Wentworth, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Bottoms Farms Partnership, Mr. David Polifka, NEBCO, Inc., JPPL, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Not Party Grant Annexstad in 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3121, 21-3111, 21-3110] PDF removed filed by the court on 7/26/21.--[Edited 07/26/2021 by JM] WBC [Entered: 07/26/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10845465] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Clayton A Clark and Mr. Scott A. Love for Clark Love & Hutson, GP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111, 21-3121] [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket[10845446] Entry of appearance submitted by Clayton A. Clark; Scott A. Love for Appellee Clark Love & Hutson, GP in 21-3121, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3121, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 07/22/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAC [Entered: 07/22/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10845346] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick Joseph Stueve and Bradley Wilders for Representative Plaintiffs (see attachment) and Kansas Common Benefit Firms (Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Gray Reed & McGraw, LLP and Hare Wynn Newell & Newton) (Kansas MDL Co-Lead Counsel) (see attachment with listing). Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111, 21-3121] [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket[10845324] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Bradley T. Wilders for Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 21-3121 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/22/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/22/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 07/22/21][21-3121, 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] PJS [Entered: 07/22/2021 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10842882] Order filed by Judges Holmes, Bacharach and McHugh abating these appeals pending further order of the court. Served on 07/12/2021. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111, 21-3121] [Entered: 07/12/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10842696] Entry of appearance filed by Gretchen Garrison and Don M. Downing for Representative Plaintiffs and Kansas Common Benefit Firms. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/09/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] [Entered: 07/09/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket[10842664] Entry of appearance submitted by Don M. Downing, Gretchen Garrison for Appellee Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C. in 21-3106 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 07/09/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/9/21] DMD [Entered: 07/09/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10842361] Entry of appearance filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Christopher B. Hood for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC . CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 07/08/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3110, 21-3111] [Entered: 07/08/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket[10840107] Entry of appearance submitted by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellee Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/29/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 06/29/2021 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 6/29/21] DEG [Entered: 06/29/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10839972] Motion filed by Appellee Watts Guerra LLP in 21-3110, 21-3111 to dismiss case. Served on: 06/28/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-3110, 21-3111] JAL [Entered: 06/28/2021 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10839971] Motion filed by Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 to dismiss case. Served on: 06/28/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] BW [Entered: 06/28/2021 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10839936] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric R. Nitz and Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 06/28/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3111, 21-3106, 21-3110] [Entered: 06/28/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10839911] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Diogenes P. Kekatos and Mr. Stephen A. Weiss for Seeger Weiss LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. 2,400 pages. Served on 06/25/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-3111, 21-3106, 21-3110] [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket[10839888] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey Alan Lamken, Eric Richard Nitz for Appellee Watts Guerra LLP in 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 06/28/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 6/28/21.] JAL [Entered: 06/28/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10839840] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Christopher Adam Seeger for Seeger Weiss LLP in 21-3106, 21-3110 and 21-3111. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (none listed). Served on 06/28/2001. Manner of Service: email [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111] [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket[10839810] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen A. Weiss and Diogenes P. Kekatos for Appellee Seeger Weiss LLP in 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 06/28/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 6/28/21.] CAS [Entered: 06/28/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket[10839805] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher A. Seeger for Appellee Seeger Weiss LLP in 21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3106, 21-3110, 21-3111]--[Edited 06/28/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CAS [Entered: 06/28/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10838787] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/21/2021. Notice of appearance, transcript order form and docketing statement due 07/07/2021 for Appellant Hossley-Embry, LLP. Notice of appearance due on 07/07/2021 for Appellees Abreo & Carter, et al. [21-3110] [Entered: 06/23/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHATZMAN & ASSOCIATES, P.C. is a litigant