This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:05:40 (UTC).

In re: Syngenta AG MIR162

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 In re Syngenta AG MIR162 was filed as an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3000

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES B. LEX

TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP

Appellants

HAGEN & HAGEN, P.C.

CHAPMAN LAW LLC

DENNEY & BARRETT, PC

DANIEL QUIGLEY

MCFARLAND LAW, PC

LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY R. VAUGHAN, P.C.

TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

BARADA LAW OFFICES, LLC

RYAN MOORE & COOK

WICKENS & WICKENS, LLC

RHOADES MCKEE PC

Appellees

TEEL & MARONEY, PLC

ABREO & CARTER

SLAVEN LAW GROUP

RICHARD L. COFFMAN, P.C.

Beaumont, TX 77701

MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE

HOLLAND LAW FIRM

DEMERATH LAW OFFICE

484 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Six

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Martin John Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Anderson Deacon

102 9Th Street, Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78215

Don Manley Downing

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Andrew K. York

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.

Attorney at Seeger Weiss

77 Water Street, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Other Attorneys

Gregory G. Holland

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

300 North Greene Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

James R. Olson

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

Chad W. Pekron

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms, Tull & Burrow

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

James G. Onder

Attorney at Onder, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson

110 East Lockwood, Second Floor

St. Louis, MO 63119

Jason Mark Milne

757 West Meadowside Drive

Saratoga Springs, UT 84045

Stephen L. Thomas

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1000

Jackson, MS 39201

William J. Maiberger Jr.

Attorney at Watts Guerra

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3, Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Shiran Zohar

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Barry Deacon

Attorney at Phipps Anderson Deacon

102 9Th Street, Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78215

Timothy J. Bomhoff

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 North Robinson Avenue, 10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John E. Goodman

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael D. Jones

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jodi Wu

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Edwin U

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester

201 South Illinois Street

Belleville, IL 62220

85 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]

Open Document

[10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document

[10718143] Response filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DAH [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]

Open Document

[10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10707044] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/03/2020. [20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:15 PM]

Open Document

[10706707] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3000] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:48 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718143] Response filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DAH [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713193] Response filed by Watts Guerra LLP to 01/13/2020 order. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. [20-3000] --[Edited docket event and text 01/27/2020 by SLS.] JAL [Entered: 01/27/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket[10707096] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/03/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/03/20][19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] WLG [Entered: 01/03/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707044] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/03/2020. [20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10706715] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffrey A. Lamken and Mr. Eric R. Nitz for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3000] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10706707] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Thomas Wiegand for Watts Guerra LLP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-3000] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • [10706689] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 01/09/2020 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KSkc), Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-3000] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • [10706686] Entry of appearance submitted by Thomas Wiegand for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/02/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/02/20][20-3000] TW [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10706685] Docketing statement filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3000] JAL [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10706684] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Watts Guerra LLP. Served on: 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3000] JAL [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • [10706681] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffrey A. Lamken and Eric R. Nitz for Appellant Watts Guerra LLP for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/02/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-3000]--[Edited 01/02/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/2/20.] JAL [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • [10706576] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/27/2019. Transcript order form and docketing statement due 01/16/2020 for Appellants Watts Guerra LLP, et al. Notice of appearance due on 01/16/2020 for Appellants & Appellees. [20-3000] [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLAND LAW FIRM is a litigant