This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 06:08:31 (UTC).

In re: Syngenta AG MIR162

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 In re Syngenta AG MIR162 was filed as an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3284

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHARLES B. LEX

TRIPLE BG PARTNERSHIP

DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Appellees

BYRON STONE, PLLC

TEEL & MARONEY, PLC

CLINE WILLIAMS WRIGHT JOHNSON & OLDFATHER, LLP

MOLLEUR LAW OFFICE

BRIAN FITZWATER LAW OFFICE

HOLLAND LAW FIRM

BRAND & MORELOCK

ELLIS & JUDD LAW OFFICE, LLC

HOSSLEY-EMBRY, LLP

OVERBOE LAW

CALDWELL, BRIERLY, CHALUPA & NUZMAN, PLLC

ABREO & CARTER

NELSON, YOUNG, & BRALAND ATTORNEYS AT LAW

GRAY, RITTER, GRAHAM, P.C.

JENNA LAIRD LEGER

THE JULIAN C. GOMEZ LAW FIRM, PLLC

LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM ENYART

486 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Don Manley Downing

Attorney at Gray Ritter & Graham

701 Market Street, Suite 800

St. Louis, MO 63101

Stephen Six

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Martin John Phipps

Attorney at Phipps Anderson Deacon

102 9Th Street, Suite 1500

San Antonio, TX 78215

Hugh A. Fuller

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew K. York

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Diogenes P. Kekatos Esq.

Attorney at Seeger Weiss

77 Water Street, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Eric Alan Isaacson

Attorney at Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson

6580 Avenida Mirola

La Jolla, CA 92037

Other Attorneys

Gregory G. Holland

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

300 North Greene Street

Greensboro, NC 27401

James R. Olson

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

Chad W. Pekron

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms, Tull & Burrow

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Jason Mark Milne

757 West Meadowside Drive

Saratoga Springs, UT 84045

Stephen L. Thomas

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

188 East Capitol Street, Suite 1000

Jackson, MS 39201

William J. Maiberger Jr.

Attorney at Watts Guerra

4 Dominion Drive, Building 3, Suite 100

San Antonio, TX 78257

Shiran Zohar

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Timothy J. Bomhoff

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 North Robinson Avenue, 10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 10Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John E. Goodman

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael D. Jones

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jodi Wu

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Edwin U

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester

201 South Illinois Street

Belleville, IL 62220

89 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10713264] Notice filed by O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. [19-3284] JD [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:02 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]

Open Document

[10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

[10707496] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:55 PM]

Open Document

[10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]

Open Document

[10707185] Entry of appearance filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Mr. Christopher B. Hood for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:53 PM]

Open Document

[10707159] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:36 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10719045] Reply filed by MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Served on 02/19/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10719041] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting MDL Co-Lead Counsels, Minnesota Lead Counsels & Illinois Mass Action Lead Counsels Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. The joint reply shall be filed as of the date of this order. Served on 02/20/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/20/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718502] Motion filed by Appellant Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3032, Appellee Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3002 for leave to file reply to. Served on: 02/18/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] PJS [Entered: 02/18/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718143] Response filed by Hossley-Embry, LLP and Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC in 19-3178, 19-3280, 19-3284 to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3178, 19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DAH [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718080] Response filed by Gustafson Gluek, PLLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 20-3000, 20-3002, MN Co-Lead Counsel to MDL Co-Lead Counsel's Request to Lift Abatement. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] DEG [Entered: 02/14/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10718056] Response filed by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279 to MDL Co-Lead Counsels' Memorandum Concerning Finality of Fee Allocation Orders. Served on 02/14/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-3278, 20-3002, 20-3000, 19-3284, 19-3280, 19-3279] CBH [Entered: 02/14/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10717184] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. An in-person mediation conference is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 12:00 pm, and 2/28/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 02/11/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714688] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Any party wishing to file a response supporting or opposing MDL Co-Lead Counsels memorandum and request to lift the abatement shall do so on or before 02/14/20. The responses shall be filed only in the appeal(s) corresponding to the filing party. These appeals shall remain abated pending further order of the court. Served on 01/31/2020. [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000, 20-3002] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714672] MDL Co-Lead Counsels Memorandum Concerning Finality. Served on 01/27/2020 by email (copied from 20-3002; entered by clerk's office). [19-3008, 19-3021, 19-3022, 19-3032, 19-3079, 19-3082, 19-3172, 19-3174, 19-3175, 19-3176, 19-3178, 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10713264] Notice filed by O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo and Demerath Law Office. Served on 01/27/2020 by email. [19-3284] JD [Entered: 01/27/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707496] Entry of appearance filed by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket[10707495] Entry of appearance submitted by Bradley T. Wilders for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 19-3280, 19-3284, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Speer Law Firm, PC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Law Offices of James S. Rogers and The Gibbs Law Firm in 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] --[Edited 01/06/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 1/6/20] BW [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket[10707489] Entry of appearance submitted by Patrick J. Stueve and Rachel E. Schwartz for Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3278, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Green Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 19-3280, 19-3284, Not Parties Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Grant Annexstad, Roger Ward, Leroy Edlund, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Todd Niemeyer, Robert Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brooks Pierce, Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Greene Espel PLLP, Mr. Holland Law Firm, Jake W. Brooks Attorney at Law, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, McCulley McCluer PLLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Schirger LLC, Paul LLP, Roth Law Firm, Saeed & Little, LLP, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Scott Poynter (Poynter Law Group), Seeger Weiss LLP, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Sneed Lang PC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Whaley Law Firm, Zimmerman Reed, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, The Gibbs Law Firm and Law Offices of James S. Rogers in 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/06/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/06/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/06/20][19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] PJS [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707185] Entry of appearance filed by William Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Mr. Christopher B. Hood for Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10707159] Entry of appearance filed by Tempe D. Smith for Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, et al. (Kansas Common Benefit Firms). CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email [19-3278, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket[10707126] Entry of appearance submitted by Tempe D. Smith for Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3278, Not Parties Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Peter V. Anderson, Peter V. Anderson, Grant Annexstad, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Bottoms Farms Partnership, CE Cobb Farms, Charles Cobb, Custom Farm Services, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. Bradley DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Mike DaVault, David Polifka Revocable Living Trust, Demmer Farms, Inc., Leroy Edlund, Five Star Farms, Grafel Farms, LLC, JPPL, Inc., Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Kruseman Fertilizer Company, Charles B. Lex, Marvin Miller, NEBCO, Inc., Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Mr. David Polifka, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Mr. David Schwaninger, TRIPLE BG Partnership, Roger Ward and Steven A. Wentworth in 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/06/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SAP [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket[10707125] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott A. Powell and Bruce J. McKee for Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Roger Ward, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw LLP, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3278, 19-3279, Not Parties Mr. Mike DaVault, Mr. David DaVault, Mr. Bradley DaVault, Steven A. Wentworth, Charles B. Lex, Five Star Farms, Beaver Creek Farms, Inc., Al-Corn Clean Fuel, LLC, Demmer Farms, Inc., Grafel Farms, LLC, D & S Grain & Cattle Co. Inc., Mr. David Polifka, Bottoms Farms Partnership, JPPL, Inc., NEBCO, Inc., TRIPLE BG Partnership, Mr. David Schwaninger, Kaffenbarger Farms, Inc., Bieber Farm, Grant Annexstad, Rolling Ridge Ranch, LLC, Roger Ward, Charles Cobb, CE Cobb Farms, Leroy Edlund, Custom Farm Services, LLC, Robert Niemeyer, Todd Niemeyer, Marvin Miller, Kruseman Fertilizer Company and Appellees Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton and Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP in 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. [19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3280, 19-3284, 20-3000]--[Edited 01/07/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/6/2020 in 19-3280 and 19-3284. and filed in 19-3287and 20-3000 on 1/7/2020. Removed from case 19-3279. ] SAP [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket[10707096] Entry of appearance submitted by W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. and Christopher B. Hood for Appellee Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC in 19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/03/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/03/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 01/03/20][19-3278, 19-3279, 19-3284, 20-3000] WLG [Entered: 01/03/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Docket[10705518] Notice of an NDA re-sent to A. Craig Eiland. [19-3284] [Entered: 12/27/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10705286] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/19/2019 Docketing statement due 01/09/2020 for Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. Transcript order form due 01/09/2020 for Demerath Law Office and O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo. Notice of appearance due on 01/09/2020 for Abreo & Carter, Adams, Rizzi & Sween, P.A., David R. Adelman, Alerding Castor Hewitt LLP, Allen Wellman McNew Harvey, LLP, Allen, Stein & Durbin, PC, Anderson, Bottrell, Sanden & Thompson, Angel, Isaacson & Tracy, Attorneys at Law, Anthony O'Hanlon, P.C., Arndt Buswell & Thorn S.C., Michael Ashar, Atlee Hall, LLP, Baker, Bodwell, Appel Attorneys at Law, Bakke Norman, S.C., Barada Law Offices, LLC, Barber, Segatto, Hoffee, Wilke, & Cate, Barrack, Rodos & Bacine, Barrett McNagny LLP, Barrett Wylie, LLC, Barrett, Easterday, Cunningham & Eselgroth, LLP, Bassford Remele, PA, Battle & Winn LLP, Batts, Batts & Bell, LLP, Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C., Beine & Roberts Law Firm, PLC, W. Dean Belk Jr., Benjamin Marshall & Associates, Tom Benson, Bernatz & Van Beek, Bigham Law Firm, Bill J. Milner Law Offices, Bird, Jacobsen & Stevens, PC, George M. Bishop, Blakeman & Schrock, LTD, Bloom Gates & Whiteleather, LLP, Bohrer Brady LLC, Bolen Robinson & Ellis, LLP, Leo Boothe, Boren, Olver and Coffey, LLP, Boring & Boring, PC, Boschma Law Office, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP, Brad Morris Law Firm, PLLC, Bradford Law Firm, Brady Preston Gronlund PC, Brand & Morelock, Brau Law Office, Brennan Steil S.C., Brett Dunn PLLC, Brian Fitzwater Law Office, Brock Law Offices PC LLO, Jake W. Brooks, Brooks & Olson, Brooks Pierce, Brown, DePrez & Johnson, P.A., Broyles Kight & Ricafort, PC, Burke Harvey, LLC, Burns Cronauer & Brown LLP, Butler Snow, LLP, Byron Stone, PLLC, Caldwell, Brierly, Chalupa & Nuzman, PLLC, Thomas P. Calhoun III, Call & Gentry Law Group, Carabin & Shaw, P.C., Carella Byrne Cecchi Olstein Brody & Agnello, P.C., Carpenter & Schumacher, P.C., Cary, Welch, Hickman & Hawk, LLP, Caughey, Legner & Freehill Attorneys at Law, Mitchell C. Chaney, Chapman Law LLC, Charles E. Cronauer & Associates, Charnetski, Lacina & Clower, LLP, Chester Law Office, Church, Church, HIttle & Antrim, Clark & Clark P.C., Clark Love & Hutson, GP, Clendening Johnson & Bohrer, P.C., Cline Farrell Christie & Lee, P.C., Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, LLP, Cockerill & Cockerill Attorneys at Law, Jeremy P. Cohen, Cole Law Office, Cole, Easley, Sciba & Williams, P.C., Colvin, Chaney, Saenz & Rodriguez, LLP, Conmy Feste, Ltd., Connors LLP, Coots, Henke & Wheeler, Copley Roth & Wilson, LLC, Cornell Law Office, Pen Cosby, Cotton, Bolton, Hoychick & Doughty, LLP, Cress Law Group, PC, Critchfield Critchfield & Johson, Ltd., Conrad F. Cropsey, Cross Law Firm, LLC, Cross Pennamped Woolsey & Glazier, P.C., Crumley Roberts, Culbertson & Allen, LLC, Custy Law Firm, LLC, Daniel M. Homolka, P.A., Darling & Darling, Dave O'Brien Law, Davis & Campbell, LLC, DeWald Deaver, P.C., Briana Deane, Deborah Smith McClure, P.C., John R. Delzer, Delzer Law Office, Demerath Law Office, Denney & Barrett, PC, Denton & Keuler, LLP, Dillon Legal Group, Dobbs Legal Group, Doering & Grisell, PA, Drew Young Law, Dunk Law Firm, PLLC, Durrett, Arkema, Gerson & Gill, P.C., Dye Snyder, LLP, Nathan A. East, Edmund A. Weinheimer, Jr., P. C., Eich, Van Dyke, Werdan & Steger P.C., Ellis & Judd Law Office, LLC, Patrick A. Elward, Brent C. Embrey, Emerick, Diggins & Zabona P.C., Emerson Poynter LLP, Emerson Scott LLP, Endurance Law Group PLC, English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley, LLP, Espe Law PLLC, Estes & Kennedy Law Offices, PLLC, Fafinski Mark & Johnson, P.A., Faith Ingle Smith Law Firm, Fearer, Nye, & Chadwick, Fellheimer Law Firm Ltd., Fenchel, Doster & Buck, PLC, Ferrer, Poirot & Wansbrough, FisherBroyles, LLP, Chris W. Fitzgerald, Fitzgerald Law P.A., Flynn & Sullivan PC, Forbes Law Group, LLC, Forde Law Offices LLP, Foreman Watson Holtrey, Frundt & Johnson, Ltd., Michael J. Galanis, Gamble & Russell, P.C., Gary T. Gee Law Office, Gellhaus & Gellhaus, P. C., Spencer Gilland, Gordon & Associates, P.C., Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C., Gray, Ritter, Graham, P.C., Graybill & Witcher, LLP, Greak Law, P.C., Green Espel PLLP, Gregory L. Ceshker, P.C., Grenfell, Sledge and Stevens, Griffin Dietrich & Elliot, LLC, Grosboll, Becker, Tice & Barr, Michael Gross, Gustafson Gluek, PLLC, Habush Habush & Rottier S.C., Hagen & Hagen, P.C., Hajjar Peters, LLP, Hall Hudson, P.C., Hallett, Hallett & Nagel, Hampton & Royce, L.C., Hansen, Howell & Wilkie, PLLC, Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton, Terrie Harman, Hart Bell, LLC, Hawkins Law, PC, Charles Hear, Hecker Law Group, PLC, Hehner & Associates, LLC, Heinisch & Lovegrove Law Office, PC LLP, Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC, Hensley Legal Group PC, Heritage Legal Group PLLC, Hodge Law Firm, Holland Law Firm, Richard M. Holmes, Hossley-Embry, LLP, Hostetter & Associates, Aaron D. Hovan, Hovland & Rasmus, PLLC, W. Calloway Huffaker, Hume, Smith, Geddes, Green & Simmons, LLP, Ingebritson & Associates, P.A., James & Larson Law, James Law, P.C., Janzen Agricultural Law, LLC, Jason Schutte, Koepke & Hiltabrand Attorney at Law, Jefferson & Brewer, LLP, Jeffrey A. Boggess, P.C., John L. Jernigan III, Jinks, Crow & Dickson, P.C., John M. Totten, P.C., Johnson & Mock, PC LLO, Johnson Becker, PLLC, Johnson Law Group, Johnson, Kramer, Mulholland, Cochrane, Driscoll & Cochrane, P.L.C., Johnson, Moody, Schmidt & Kleinhuizen, P.A., Justin Hill, PC, KC Cohen, Lawyer, PC, Katz & Korin, P.C., Keaton & Keaton PC, Kelley Law Firm, PC, Kempton & Russell, LLC, Keuler, Kelly Hutchins & Blankenship, LLP, Kevin W. Liles PC, Kirk Law Firm, Kittelsen, Barry, Wellington, Thompson, & Schluesche, Attorneys at Law, Kizer, Bonds, Hughes & Bowen, PLLC, Knuth Law Office, Koenig Law Firm, Alex Koenigs, Kovarik, Ellison & Mathis, P.C., Kraft Walser Law Office, PLLP, Kramer Law, LLC, Kruml Law Office, P.C., Kruse & Dakin LLP, Kuhlman & Lucas, LLC, Lamkin & Lamkin, P.C., Langdon & Emison Attorneys at Law, Law Office of Adam Crawshaw, Law Office of Brent Gaines, Law Office of Christopher H. Poynor, Law Office of Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., Law Office of Gregory E. Tonore, Law Office of Hammell & Murphy PLLP, Law Office of Jeffrey R. Vaughan, P.C., Law Office of Lester Weinstine, P.C., Law Office of Michael Miller, Law Office of Mike Crane, LLP, Law Office of Thomas A. Noe, III, Law Office of William Enyart, Law Office of William R. Shirk, Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, Law Offices of Hans A. Buehler, LLC, Law Offices of James S. Rogers, Law Offices of Leonel Alejandro PC, Law Offices of Richard Hoffman, Law Offices of Wendell Hoskins, Jenna Laird Leger, Wayne J. Lennington, Lee J. Lewis, Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson P.A., Jeff Link, Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP, Lowe Eklund Wakefield CO., LPA, Lundberg Law Firm PLC, Mailander Law Office, Maloney & Campolo, Joseph F. Manak, March, McMillan, DeJoode & Duvall, P.C., Martin, Browne, Hull & Harper PLL, Martz & Lucas, LLC, Irvin L. Masching, Massie & Quick, LLC, Mauro Archer and Associates PLLC, Maynes Law Office, Mazzanti Law Office, PLLC, McClure, Thomas & Thomas, McCulley McCluer PLLC, McFarland Law, PC, E. Rudolph McIntyre, McNeely Stephenson, Meador & Crump, P.A., Meier, Bragicich & Moore LLP, Mercho Caughey & DeLay, Merkel & Cocke, Mertes & Mertes, P.C., Meyer & Meyer LLP, Michael Smith Law, Midwest AG Solutions LLC, Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP, Miller Pearson Gloe Burns Beatty & Parrish, P.L.C., Miller Schirger LLC, Miltner Law Firm, LLC, Miner & Lemon, LLP, Molleur Law Office, Moore, Susler, McNutt & Wrigley, LLC, Morgan & Meyers, PLC, Morning Law Office LLC, Morris Laing Evans Brock & Kennedy, Morrissey, Morrissey & Dalluge, Muske, Muske, Suhrhoff LTD, Myers Hockemeyer & McNagny LLP, Nathan J. Noble, P.C., Gregg Neal, Nelson, Young, & Braland Attorneys at Law, Nidey Erdahl Tindal & Fischer, PLC, Norman Paloucek & Herman, O'Hanlon, Demerath & Castillo, OKoon Hintermeister, PLLC, Obear, Overholser, Huffer & Rider, LLC, Oldfield, Myers, Apke & Payne, Onder Law, LLC, Orlans, P.C., Osterbauer Law Firm, Otts, Moore, Coale, Godwin, Stearns & Darby, Ouderkirk Law Firm, Overboe Law, Pagel & Weikum, PLLP, Patterson Comer, Patton Brown Law, PLLC, Patton Hoversten & Berg P.A, Paul LLP, Pemberton Law Firm, Pemberton, Sorlie, Rufer, & Kershner, PLLP, Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, L.L.P., Phillippi Law Firm, LLC, Phipps Anderson Deacon, LLP, Pickner Law Office, James M. Pietz, Plews Shadley Racher & Braun LLP, Scott Emory Poynter, Crystal D. Pulley, Daniel Quigley, Quigley Law Office, Quirk & Hunter, PC, Rammelkamp Bradney, P.C., Randle & Sammons, P.C., Ray A. Ferguson & Associates, Ltd., Ray, Winton & Kelley, PLLC, Redenbaugh & Mohr, PC, Reichert Law Office, Reichert Wenner, P.A., Reiling Teder & Schrier, LLC, Rhoades McKee PC, Riccolo, Semelroth, & Henningsen, P.C., Richard D. Larson, P.C., Richard L. Coffman, P.C., Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, Riley-Tanis & Associates PLLC, Rob Tully Law Firm, Roberts Law Office, Robinson, Curphey & OConnel, LLC, Mark A. Roeder, Roth Law Firm, Richard Russell, Ryan Moore & Cook, Saeed & Little, LLP, Sam C. Mitchell & Associates, Satterley and Kelley, PLLC, Schirger, Kirk, McDougall & Winzeler, P.C., Schmittinger & Rodriguez, P.A., Schnelker, Rassi & McConnell PLC, Schultz Law, Schwarz Law Office, Schwebel Goetz & Sieben PA, Seeger Weiss LLP, Sever Storey, Shamberg Johnson & Bergman, Shamberg, Wolf, McDermott & Depue, Shatzman & Associates, P.C., Sherman Hoffman & Hipp, LC, Shimanek, Shimanek, & Bowman, LLC, Barbara J. Simmons, Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC, Simon Herbert & McClelland, LLP, Slaven Law Group, Deborah K. Smith, William F. Smith, Smith Gardner Slusky Lazer Pohren & Rogers LLP, Sneed Lang PC, Sonenberg Law LLC, Soper Leddin Law Firm, PC, Sorling Northrup Attorneys, Sounding Board Legal, S.C., Speer Law Firm, PC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Stockard, Johnston, & Brown, P.C, Stoerzbach Law Office, P.C., Stone Law Office, P.L.L.C., Stout Law Group, Strittmatter Law Firm, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, Swaim Law Firm, PLLC, Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, Tapella & Eberspacher, LLC, John E. Tarburton, Taylor & Ruhnke, PC, Ted B. Lyon & Associates, P.C., Teel & Maroney, PLC, The Cahill Law Offices, The Cantlin Law Firm, The Gibbs Law Firm, The Julian C. Gomez Law Firm, PLLC, The Law Office of George P. Escobedo & Associates, The Law Office of Mark L Eurek, The Law Office of Rob Tully PC, The Law Office of Samuel W. Bearman, L.C., The Law Office of Thomas R. Fields, P.A., The Law Offices of Timothy L. Lapointe, P.C., The McQuades Co. LPA, The Poppe Law Firm, The Pruneda Law Firm, PLLC, The Strom Law Firm, LLC, The Winkie Law Firm, LLC, William Thomas, Thompson, Garrett & Hines, Thrash Law Firm, P.A., Tourkow Crell Rosenblatt & Johnston LLP, Troth Law Office, Trousdale Ryan, P.C., Troyer & Good, PC, Tucker & Tucker, P.C., Tucker Law Practice, Tully Law Office, PC, Underwood Law Firm, PC, Van Kley & Walker, LLC, VanDerGinst Law, Vandervoort Christ & Fisher, P.C., Vaughan Law Firm, P.C., Vela Law Offices PLLC, Virtus Law PLLC, Vriezelaar, Tigges, Edington, Bottaro, Boden, & Ross, L.L.P., Wadler Perches Hundl & Kerlick, Wagner Reese, LLP, Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP, Walk & Murphy, PLC, Wallace Law, Waller Jorgenson Warzynski, PLLC, Kenneth G. Walsh, Walters Bender Strohbehn & Vaughan, P.C., Laurie S. Ward, Warner Norcross & Judd, LLP, Wasker Door Wimmer & Marcouiller, P.C., Watts Guerra LLP, Weeks & Brucker, Ltd, Weld, Riley, Prenn & Ricci S.C., Weller, Green, Toups & Terrell, LLP, Westerfield, Janoush & Bell, P.A., Westervelt, Johnson, Nicoll & Keller, LLC, Wexler Wallace LLP, Whaley Law Firm, White & Allen, P.A., Whitman, Baber, & Siegel, Wickens & Wickens, LLC, Wil Galloway & Associates, PLLC, Willadsen & Neal LLC, Willis & Willis, Winstein, Kavensky & Cunningham, LLC, Wojtalewicz Law Firm, LTD, Wolf Ardis, P.C., Wood & Rue, PLLP, Woodard Law PC., Woods Rogers PLC, Worth Law Firm, Wright & Schulte LLC, Wright Schimmel LLC, Wyland, Humphrey & Clevenger LLP, Yira Law Office, Ltd, Zeilinger Law Office and Zimmerman Reed, LLP [19-3284] [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVID POLIFKA REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Maiberger Jr.