This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/01/2020 at 06:26:57 (UTC).

In Re: SSA Bonds Antitrust Lit

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 In Re SSA Bonds Antitrust Lit was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1759

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Northern California

Irving Firemen's Relief and Retirement Fund

City of Riviera Beach Police Officers' Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all otrhers similarly situated

Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 35 Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated

Defendants

John Doe Defendants Nos. 1-100

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated

Merrill Lynch International

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Nomura Holdings, Inc.

Bank of America Merrill Lynch International Limited

Plaintiff / Appellants

Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation

Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division

Defendant / Appellees

Barclays Services Limited

Gary McDonald

Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank

Deutsche Bank AG

Bank of America, N.A.

Citibank, N.A.

Bhardeep Singh Heer

BNP Paribas S.A.

45 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel L. Brockett

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Stephanie Solomon Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Thomas Lepri Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Andrew Love Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Post Montgomery Center, 1 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jeremy Andersen

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Susan Katina Alexander

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Post Montgomery Center, 1 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lisa J. Fried

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Benjamin Fleming

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

390 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

John Francis Terzaken Esq. III

Attorney at Allen & Overy LLP

1101 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Adam Selim Hakki Esq.

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jay B. Kasner Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Karen Hoffman Lent Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Carmine D. Boccuzzi Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Other Attorneys

James H.R. Windels Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Wesley Railey Powell Esq.

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Daniel Lawrence Stein Esq.

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Alexander John Willscher

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Paul S. Mishkin Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Adam Mintz Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Robert Gerard King Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#105

#104

#102

#100

#99

#98

#97

#94

#93

#90

#89

#85

#82

#80

#79

#78

#77

#76

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) ATTORNEY, Benjamin D. Wasserman for The Toronto-Dominion Bank TD Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1759 , [ # 105 ], ADDED.[2889222] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Toronto-Dominion Bank and TD Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2889127] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/21/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) CAPTION, removing appellate designation for Credit Suisse Group AG, AMENDED.[2881611] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/10/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) ATTORNEY, Matthew J. Porpora for RBC Europe Limited RBC Capital Markets LLC Royal Bank of Canada, in case 20-1759 , [ # 102 ], ADDED.[2877381] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Europe Limited and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2877252] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/06/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) ATTORNEY, Eric Lawson for Bhardeep Singh Heer, in case 20-1759 , [ # 100 ], ADDED.[2875810] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bhardeep Singh Heer, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2875795] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bhardeep Singh Heer, FILED. Service date 07/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2875790] [20-1759] [Entered: 07/01/2020 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Credit Suisse Securities (Europe) Ltd. and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in re: requesting to remove appellate designation for Credit Suisse Group AG, RECEIVED. Service date 06/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2873394] [20-1759]--[Edited 06/29/2020 by JW] [Entered: 06/29/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania Brief due date as 09/14/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 09/14/2020, FILED.[2872222] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858528] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee TD Securities (USA) LLC and The Toronto-Dominion Bank, FILED. Service date 06/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858266] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2858201] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED.[2858190] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858014] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/09/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation, Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. Service date 06/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2858010] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/09/2020 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2857047] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20059954., FILED.[2857046] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/08/2020, RECEIVED.[2857045] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alaska Department of Revenue, Treasury Division, Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation and Iron Workers Pension Plan of Western Pennsylvania, FILED. [2857041] [20-1759] [Entered: 06/08/2020 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alaska Permanent Fund Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Nomura Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Painters and Allied Trades District Council No. 82 Health Care Fund, the is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEET METAL WORKERS PENSION PLAN OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ARIZONA AND NEVADA is a litigant