This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2020 at 06:31:46 (UTC).

In Re: Sears Holdings Corporat

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 In Re Sears Holdings Corporat was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3346

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellees

Kmart Holding Corporation

Sears Roebuck Acceptance Corp.

Florida Building Appliances, Inc.

Big Beaver of Florida Development, LLC.

Sears Buying Services, Inc.

Sears Protection Company (Florida), L.L.C.

SHC Promotions LLC

SYW Relay LLC

BlueLight.com, Inc.

A&E Home Delivery, LLC

ServiceLive Inc.

A&E Factory Service LLC

SRe Holding Corporation

Sears Protection Company

Kmart Corporation

Kmart Stores of Texas LLC

A&E Signature Service, LLC

Sears Insurance Services, L.L.C.

KLC, Inc.

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

David Jason Lender

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Gregory Silbert

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Paul R. Genender Esq.

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

200 Crescent Court Circle

Dallas, TX 75201

Joseph L. Sorkin Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

1 Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Z.W. Julius Chen Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Philip D. Anker

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Noah A. Levine

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Andrew W. Weaver

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Edward M. Fox

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Owen Richard Wolfe Esq.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Robert J. Liubicic Esq.

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2953462] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:05 PM]

#18

(#19) ATTORNEY, Noah A. Levine for Appellant JPP, LLC, JPP II, LLC, and ESL Investments, Inc., in case 20-3346, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2948418] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:18 PM]

#17

(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2947487] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:23 PM]

#74

(#54) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, FILED.[2968785] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:32 PM]

#73

(#53) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Wilmington Trust, National Association in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, and Joint Appendix due date as 01/21/2021, FILED.[2968729] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:59 PM]

#72

(#52) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Cyrus Capital Partners, L.P. in 20-3343, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, FILED.[2968402] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:23 AM]

65 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

65 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#64

(#44) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC in 20-3343, 20-3346, informing Court of proposed due date 01/13/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2962469] [20-3343, 20-3346] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:59 PM]

#63

(#43) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Trust, National Association in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349, informing Court of proposed due date 01/13/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2962456] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:45 PM]

#61

(#42) NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[2955128] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:44 PM]

#58

(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2953465] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:10 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/01/2020, RECEIVED.[2943214] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:00 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/01/2020, RECEIVED.[2943211] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:59 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, FILED.[2968785] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Wilmington Trust, National Association in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, and Joint Appendix due date as 01/21/2021, FILED.[2968729] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Cyrus Capital Partners, L.P. in 20-3343, 20-3349 Brief due date as 01/13/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/13/2021, FILED.[2968402] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2963885] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/29/2020 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC in 20-3343, 20-3346, informing Court of proposed due date 01/13/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2962469] [20-3343, 20-3346] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Trust, National Association in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349, informing Court of proposed due date 01/13/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2962456] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[2955128] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al in 20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2953465] [20-3343, 20-3346, 20-3349] [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2953462] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/15/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY, David Jason Lender, Paul R. Genender for A&E Home Delivery, LLC California Builder Appliances, Inc. Sears Brands Management Corporation SHC Licensed Business LLC A&E Factory Service LLC Private Brands, Ltd. StarWest, LLC Sears Buying Services, Inc. A&E Signature Service, LLC Sears Development Co. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Sears Holdings Corporation, et al KBL Holding Inc. Sears Insurance Services, L.L.C. Sears Home Improvement Products, Inc. Florida Builder Appliances, Inc. Kmart Stores of Illinois LLC Kmart.com LLC Sears Procurement Services, Inc. A&E Lawn & Garden, LLC Kmart Holding Corporation Sears Holdings Management Corporation SYW Relay LLC Sears, Roebuck and Co. Sears Operations LLC SRe Holding Corporation Wally Labs LLC Sears Protection Company (PR) Inc. Sears Protection Company (Florida), L.L.C. SOE, Inc. Sears Protection Company SHC Promotions LLC Kmart of Washington LLC KLC, Inc. Sears Holdings Corporation Kmart Stores of Texas LLC Troy Coolidge No. 13, LLC BlueLight.com, Inc. Kmart of Michigan, Inc. Sears Roebuck Acceptance Corp. Big Beaver of Florida Development, LLC. Kmart Corporation Sears Home & Business Franchises, Inc. Sears Holdings Publishing Company, LLC SHC Desert Springs, LLC Sears Brands, L.L.C. Florida Building Appliances, Inc. SR-Rover de Puerto Rico, LLC FBA Holdings Inc. MaxServ, Inc STI Merchandising, Inc. Sears Brands Business Unit Corporation Kmart Operations LLC Innovel Solutions, Inc. ServiceLive Inc. Sears, Roebuck de Puerto Rico, Inc. MyGofer LLC, in case 20-3346, [ # 31 ], [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2952703] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/15/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY, Noah A. Levine for Appellant JPP, LLC, JPP II, LLC, and ESL Investments, Inc., in case 20-3346, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2948418] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2947502] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2947487] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#15) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Thomas Kreller, Esq. for Appellant Cyrus Capital Partners, L.P., informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943362] [20-3349] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3343, containing complete set of docket entries.[2943227] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2943219] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-21921053, FILED.[2943216] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/01/2020, RECEIVED.[2943214] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/01/2020, RECEIVED.[2943211] [20-3346] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant ESL Investments, Inc., JPP II, LLC and JPP, LLC in 20-3346, FILED. [2943202] [20-3346, 20-3343] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SRe Holding Corporation is a litigant