This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/09/2019 at 06:00:36 (UTC).

In re: Sandra Rumanek

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 In re Sandra Rumanek was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1341

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: SANDRA RUMANEK

Vancouver, WA 98661

Respondents

SPILLAN, Delaware State Police Officer Spillan, IBM 770

PATRICK J. O'HARE

DAVID G. CULLEY

LISA AMATUCCI

MATT DENN

INDEPENDENT SCHOOL MANAGEMENT INC

NICHOLAS WOODFIELD

LOUIS J. RIZZO, JR.

Wilmington, DE 19801

ROBERT CRUIKSHANK

JOSEPH J. RHOADES

RICHARD R. COOCH

SUSAN JUDGE

R. SCOTT OSWALD

TIMOTHY M. HOLLY

ANNETTE FURMAN

MARY I. AKHIMIEN

BERNARD G. CONAWAY

Wilmington, DE 19801

CHRISTOPHER C. CONNER

SANDRA F. CLARK

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sandra Rumanek

4801 East 5Th Street

Vancouver, WA 98661

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph C. Handlon Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael F. McTaggart Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jessica L. Tyler Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

1007 North Orange Street, Nemours Building, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Timothy M. Holly Esq.

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew F. Boyer Esq.

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mary I. Akhimien Esq.

Attorney at Connolly Gallagher

1201 North Market Street, 20Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Herbert W. Mondros Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Diane M. Coffey Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Arthur D. Kuhl Esq.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall

1523 Concord Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Louis J. Rizzo Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall

1523 Concord Pike, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Laura D. Hatcher Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jennifer L. Hall Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

John A. Elzufon Esq.

Attorney at Elzufon Austin & Mondell

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

Loren R. Barron Esq.

Attorney at Elzufon Austin & Mondell

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

John D. Balaguer Esq.

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Bernard G. Conaway Esq.

Attorney at Conaway-Legal

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Other Attorneys

Laura S. Irwin Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

700 Grant Street, Suite 4000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Mandamus Denied Letter to District Court

Open Document #1

Judgment Entered

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #2

motion and affidavit in forma pauperis

Open Restricted Document #1

In Forma Pauperis Motion

Open Document

Open Document #3

Case Opening Letter

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Petition filed by Petitioner Ms. Sandra Rumanek for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1341] (SR) [Entered: 03/18/2019 07:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Attorney Bar status modified for Arthur D. Kuhl, Esq. for Sandra F. Clark and Louis J. Rizzo, Jr. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT, Denied. (CJG) [Entered: 03/13/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: CHAGARES, RESTREPO and SCIRICA, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 3. CLD-107 (CJG) [Entered: 03/13/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Loren R. Barron, Esquire on behalf of Respondent(s) Joseph J. Rhoades. [19-1341] (LRB) [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Arthur D. Kuhl, Esq. for Respondents Sandra F. Clark and Louis J. Rizzo, Jr.. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 03/26/2019. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 03/12/2019 07:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Balaguer on behalf of Respondent(s) Timothy M. Holly, Mary I. Akhimien, Matthew F. Boyer. [19-1341] (JDB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Arthur D. Kuhl on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis J. Rizzo, Jr. and Sandra F. Clark. [19-1341] (ADK) [Entered: 03/07/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael F. McTaggart on behalf of Appellee(s) Matthew Denn, Susan Judge, Patrick O'Hare, Annette Furman, Lisa Amatucci, Dennis Spillan, Richard Cooch and Charles Butler. [19-1341] (MFM) [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy Michael Holly on behalf of Respondent(s) Independent School Management Inc.. [19-1341] (TMH) [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura Schleich Irwin on behalf of Respondent(s) Sherry R. Fallon. [19-1341] (LSI) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John A. Elzufon, Esquire on behalf of Respondent(s) Joseph J. Rhoades. [19-1341] (JAE) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mary I. Akhimien, Esq. for Independent School Management Inc, John D. Balaguer, Esq. for Timothy M. Holly and Mary I. Akhimien, Matthew F. Boyer, Esq. for Independent School Management Inc, Diane M. Coffey, Esq. for Nicholas Woodfield and R. Scott Oswald, Bernard G. Conaway, Esq. for Bernard G. Conaway, Jennifer L. Hall, Esq. for Robert Cruikshank, Joseph C. Handlon, Esq. for Richard R. Cooch, Patrick J. O'Hare, Matt Denn, Charles E. Butler, Spillan, Susan Judge, Annette Furman and Lisa Amatucci, Laura D. Hatcher, Esq. for Robert Cruikshank, Timothy M. Holly, Esq. for Independent School Management Inc, Arthur D. Kuhl, Esq. for Sandra F. Clark and Louis J. Rizzo, Jr., Herbert W. Mondros, Esq. for Nicholas Woodfield and R. Scott Oswald and Louis J. Rizzo, Jr., Esq. for Sandra F. Clark and Louis J. Rizzo, Jr. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/15/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John A. Elzufon, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph J. Rhoades, Esquire. [19-1341] (JAE) [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 02/12/2019 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen on behalf of Appellee(s) David G. Culley. [19-1341] (KAB) [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioner Ms. Sandra Rumanek. Certificate of Service dated 02/08/2019. Service made by US mail. (Removed from the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis entry.) (CJG) [Entered: 02/12/2019 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: MOTION filed by Petitioner Ms. Sandra Rumanek for leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 02/08/2019. Service made by ECF, US mail. [-Corrected Petition for Writ of Mandamus was attached to this event. It has been removed and separately placed on the docket] [19-1341]--[Edited 02/12/2019 by CJG] (SR) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Petitioner Ms. Sandra Rumanek. Action on the petition for writ of mandamus is hereby deferred. Petitioner did not submit the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with the mandamus petition. It is noted that Petitioner states in her petition that her financial condition has not changed from when she filed her last mandamus petition however, Petition is required to file a separate motion for each petition she files. Therefore, within 14) days of the date of this order, Petitioner must either file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit or remit payment of the filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid or the motion is not filed, the petition may be dismissed without further notice. In addition, a copy of the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis must be served on each party to the proceeding, to include the District Court judge. A certificate of service reflecting that the motion has been served must also be submitted to the Court of Appeals within 14 days of the date of this order. (CJG) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS DOCKETED. Notice filed by Petitioner Ms. Sandra Rumanek. (CJG) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura S. Irwin Esq.