This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/14/2019 at 06:13:10 (UTC).

In re: Rosemary Mergenthaler

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 In re Rosemary Mergenthaler was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2562

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellants

Ruediger Albrecht

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Marc Truong

Jersey City, NJ 106306

Mac Truong

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Debtors

In re: Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler

Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler

Hauppauge, NY 11788

Appellees

United States Trustee

R. Kenneth Barnard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Ruediger Albrecht

875 Bergen Avenue

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Marc Truong

63 Van Reypen Street

Jersey City, NJ 106306

Mac Truong

63 Van Reypen Street

Jersey City, NJ 07306

Debtor Attorney

Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler

1200 Veterans Highway, Suite 310

Hauppauge, NY 11788

Appellee Attorneys

Stan Yuon Yang

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

Long Island Federal Courthouse, 560 Federal Plaza

Central Islip, NY 11722

David Adam Blansky

Attorney at LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

3305 Jerusalem Avenue

Wantagh, NY 11793

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

#36

35 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

35 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#34

#26

#25

#24

#13

#12

#11

#9

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

8 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 12 ], [ # 26 ], [ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, FILED.[2664441] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 11 ], [ # 24 ], [ # 37 ], on behalf of Appellant Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler, FILED.[2664440] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 13 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 36 ], on behalf of Appellant Mac Truong, FILED.[2664439] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail.[2664432] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail.[2664420] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Mac Truong, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail.[2664415] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2660957] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler and Mac Truong, FILED.[2660955] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/20/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/19/2019, to EDNY (Central Islip), ISSUED.[2659742] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER, dated 09/19/2019, staying appeal is hereby lifted. Appellants are directed to comply with the notices of defective filing issued on September 10, 2019, copy to pro se appellants, FILED.[2659717] [19-2562] [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 5 ], on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2636724] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 4 ], on behalf of Appellant Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2636709] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellants, SENT.[2636676] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2636666] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#6) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Marc Truong, FILED. No service date.[2636653] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#5) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, FILED. No service date.[2636645] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • (#4) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler, FILED. No service date.[2636640] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2636634] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2636633] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ruediger Albrecht, Rosemary Ida Mergenthaler and Marc Truong, FILED. [2636624] [19-2562] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant