This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/25/2021 at 05:02:44 (UTC).

Robert Duane Rens v. Gerald H. Davis, et alIn re: Robert Duane Rens v. Gerald H. Davis, et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Robert Duane Rens filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Gerald H Davis, In re Robert Duane Rens. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-60057

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

GERALD H. DAVIS

Debtor

In re: ROBERT DUANE RENS

Appellees

CHERI LEE HUBKA SPARHAWK

ROBERT DUANE RENS

RENS CHILDREN, Jennifer, Jeffrey, Jody and Julie (Smith)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Richard C. Norton Esquire

Attorney at Norton Moore & Adams, LLP

525 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Appellee Attorneys

Jon R. Williams Esquire

Attorney at Williams Iagmin LLP

2475 Kettner Blvd.

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeffrey D. Schreiber Esquire

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY D. SCHREIBER

4225 Executive Square

La Jolla, CA 92037

Keith Patrick Banner Esquire

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger, LLP

2049 Century Park, E, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Counsel - General Information

1 #2

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting schedule as follows: Appellant Gerald H. Davis Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/29/2021. Appellant Gerald H. Davis opening brief due 02/28/2022. Appellees Robert Duane Rens, Rens Children and Cheri Lee Hubka Sparhawk answering brief due 03/30/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12294391] (JN) [Entered: 11/22/2021 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith Patrick Banner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon R. Williams Esquire