This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2022 at 05:00:36 (UTC).

Richard Priddis, et al v. Sony Music Publishing (US) LLCIn re: Richard Priddis, et al v. Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 Richard Priddis filed an Other lawsuit against Sony Music Publishing US LLCIn re Richard Priddis. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15457

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

SONY MUSIC PUBLISHING (US) LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, FKA Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC

COLGEMS-EMI MUSIC, INC., a Delaware corporation

COMBINE MUSIC CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

EMI APRIL MUSIC, INC., a Connecticut corporation

EMI BLACKWOOD MUSIC, INC., a Connecticut corporation

EMI FEIST CATALOG, INC., a New York corporation

EMI ROBBINS CATALOG, INC., a New York corporation

EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., a New York corporation

EMI MILLER CATALOG, INC., a New York corporation

EMI U CATALOG, INC., a New York corporation

EMI UNART CATALOG, INC., a New York corporation

JOBETTE MUSIC COMPANY, INC., a Michigan corporation

SCREEN GEMS-EMI MUSIC, INC., a Delaware corporation

STONE DIAMOND MUSIC CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation

Debtor

In the Matter of: RICHARD L. PRIDDIS

Appellee

RICHARD L. PRIDDIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

James B. Ball Esquire

Attorney at Poli & Ball, PLC

2999 N. 44Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Appellee Attorney

Dai Trang Liz Nguyen

Attorney at Law Office of Mark J. Giunta

531 E Thomas Road, Suite 200

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants COLGEMS-EMI MUSIC, INC., Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog, Inc., EMI Miller Catalog, Inc., EMI Robbins Catalog, Inc., EMI U Catalog, Inc., EMI Unart Catalog, Inc., Jobette Music Company, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC and Stone Diamond Music Corporation Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/05/2022. Appellants COLGEMS-EMI MUSIC, INC., Combine Music Corporation, EMI April Music, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., EMI Feist Catalog, Inc., EMI Miller Catalog, Inc., EMI Robbins Catalog, Inc., EMI U Catalog, Inc., EMI Unart Catalog, Inc., Jobette Music Company, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC and Stone Diamond Music Corporation opening brief due 05/31/2022. Appellee Richard L. Priddis answering brief due 07/01/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12407961] (RT) [Entered: 03/29/2022 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMI U Catalog Inc., a New York Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Robbins Catalog Inc. is a litigant