Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2021 at 14:12:30 (UTC).

In re: REV 973 LLC v. USDC-CALA

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 In re REV 973 LLC filed an Other lawsuit against USDC-CALA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-72624

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

WINCUP INC.

JOHN'S AUTO REPAIR, a business of unknown form

YOUR CAR SPECIALIST

NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS, a California corporation

TANAKA AUTO

DAN'S AUTOMOTIVE

MIKE'S MAIN CHANNEL MARINE, a business of unknown form

MAYFAIR GARAGE

PAN PACIFIC SURVEYORS

BILL'S MOBIL SERVICE STATION, a business of unknown form

In re: REV 973 LLC, a California limited liability company

TEB, INC.

SAMUEL LEWIS, DBA Chino Welding & Assembly, AKA S. Lewis, AKA Sam Lewis

ERIC'S VW SERVICE

AMERICAN TRANSMISION

ATCHISON EXPRESS

THE BLOCK AT ORANGE

REYNOLDS METALS CO.

SECURITY AVIATION

ADVANCED ENVIRONMENTAL , INC., a Delaware corporation

782 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Samuel S. Baxter

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP

401 West A Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

Kevin Todd Haroff

Attorney at Marten Law PLLLC

455 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Franklin R. Fraley Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Fraley & Associates

680 E Colorado Blvd, Suite 180

Pasadena, CA 91101

Lawrence P. Riff Esquire

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kathleen H. Wong Esquire

Attorney at THE BOEING CORPORATION

2201 Seal Beach Blvd.

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Daniel E. Park

Attorney at Park & Sylva

3435 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

F. Thomas Hovore

Attorney at HOVORE LAW PLLC

3500 West Olive Ave.

Burbank, CA 91505

James Joseph Dragna

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Barry MacNaughton Esquire

Attorney at Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP

9401 Wilshire Boulevard, Ninth Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Roger Scott

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Laura Jean Carroll

Attorney at Zuber Lawler & Del Duca LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William Watson Funderburk Jr.

Attorney at Castellon & Funderburk LLP

811 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Gary A. Nye Esquire

Attorney at Roxborough Pomerance Nye & Adreani LLP

5820 Canoga Avenue, Suite 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6549

Peter M. Morrisette

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson LLP

50 California Street, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph Alan Schwar

Attorney at Peterson Law Group PC

19800 Macarthur Boulevard

Irvine, CA 92612

Patrick Joseph Cain

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Richard A. Higbie Esquire

108 33Rd Street

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Richard A. Soll Esquire

Attorney at JONES, MAHONEY, BRAYTON & SOLL

150 W. First Street

Claremont, CA 91711

Alexander Rufus-Isaacs

Attorney at Rufus-Isaacs, Acland & Grantham, LLP

232 N. Canon Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Shai Oved

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF SHAI OVED

7445 Topanga Cyn Blvd.

Canoga Park, CA 91303

412 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, EDWARD LEAVY and BARRY G. SILVERMAN): Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. DENIED. [10232935] (AF) [Entered: 12/14/2016 11:46 AM]

1 #2

Writ of Mandamus

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Mail returned on 07/17/2017 addressed to Rey S. Yang for Wally's 76 Station, Inc., re: Court order filed on 12/04/2016 [ # 20 ] Return to sender. Resending to: casefiles-no forwarding address. [10513495] (JFF) [Entered: 07/18/2017 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Mail returned on 01/03/2017 addressed to Elizabeth M. Weaver, Esquire for Monogram Aero and John MacLeod, re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016 and resent on 12/21/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [10256116] (LA) [Entered: 01/05/2017 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mail returned on 12/30/2016 addressed to Joseph Vladimir Macha, Esquire for Southwest Trains Company Inc., re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: "not Oaktree," return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: Foley & Mansfield, 300 S Grand Ave Ste 2800, Los Angeles, CA 90071. [10251174]--[Edited: address updated. 01/03/2017 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/30/2016 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Mail returned on 12/27/2016 addressed to Richard A. Higbie, Esquire for Campbell's Garage, re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: 108 33rd St, Newport Beach, CA 92663-3008. [10250214]--[Edited: address updated. 12/30/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/29/2016 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Mail returned on 12/23/2016 addressed to Jason D. Annigian for B&S Pallets, re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: Law Office of Jason D. Annigian, 114 N Indian Hill Blvd Ste E, Claremont, CA 91711. [10250166]--[Edited: address updated. 12/30/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/29/2016 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Mail returned on 12/23/2016 addressed to Duane H. Zobrist for Abco Hardware & Builder's Supply Inc., re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward. Resending to: Zobrist Law Group, 1900 Arlington Blvd Ste B, PO Box 4724, Charlottesville, VA 2290. [10250163]--[Edited: address updated. 12/30/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/29/2016 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Mail returned on 12/21/2016 addressed to Elizabeth M. Weaver, Esquire for Monogram Aero and John MacLeod, re: Court order filed on 12/14/2016 [ # 20 ] Return to sender-attempted-not known. Resending to: 550 S Hope St # 1100, Los Angeles, CA 90071. [10242820]--[Edited: address updated. 12/21/2016 by SLM] (JFF) [Entered: 12/21/2016 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Mail returned on 12/20/2016 addressed to Christopher Mark Adishian for George's Shell, Jim & Jack and Kevork Texaco, re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward (address does not include suite #). Resending to: Adishian Law Group, P.C., 222 N Sepulveda Blvd Ste 2000, El Segundo, CA 90245. [10240881]--[Edited: address updated. 12/20/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Mail returned on 12/20/2016 addressed to Shanda Yasmin Lowe for Doe and Estate of Andrew Lowe, re: Court order [ # 20 ] filed on 12/14/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, return to sender: 5424 Corteen Pl, Apt 2, Valley Vlg, CA 91607-2067. Resending to: 5424 Corteen Place, Apt 2, Valley Village, CA 91607-2067. [10240835]--[Edited: address updated. 12/20/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 12/20/2016 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, EDWARD LEAVY and BARRY G. SILVERMAN): Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. DENIED. [10232935] (AF) [Entered: 12/14/2016 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • Docket(#10) Mail returned on 08/24/2016 addressed to Miguel Montes, Jr. for Mike's Texaco Service, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward. Resending to: 1930 Wilshire Blvd Ste 200, Los Angeles, CA 90057. [10101215]--[Edited: address updated. 08/25/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/25/2016 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#9) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Robert D. Daniels, Esquire for Nick Alexander Imports, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward. Resending to: The Scali Law Firm, 800 Wilshire Blvd Ste 400, Los Angeles, CA 90017. [10098088]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#8) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Barbara Velasco for American Racing Equipment, Inc., re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: return to sender; not deliverable as addressed; unable to forward. Resending to: Platinum Equity, LLC, 360 N Crescent Dr, Beverly Hills, CA 90210. [10098081]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#7) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Paul Jin Lee for Oh's Mobil, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, rtn to send; Law Offices of Paul J Lee, 2161 W 182nd St Ste 204 Torrance, CA 90504-4300. Resending to: Law Offices of Paul J. Lee, 2161 W 182nd St, Ste 204, Torrance, CA 90504-4300. [10098067]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#6) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Dale J. Park for Venice Transmission, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, rtn to send; Dale Park, 3333 Wilshire Blvd Ste 320, Los Angeles, CA 90010-4104. Resending to: 3333 Wilshire Blvd Ste 320, Los Angeles, CA 90010-4104. [10098055]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#5) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Kevin Gerald McCluskey for Captive Plastics, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, rtn to send; Waters McCluskey & Boehle, 6242 Westchester Pkwy Ste 200, Los Angeles CA 90045-4853. Resending to: McCluskey & Montgomery LLP, 6242 Westchester Pkwy Ste 200, Los Angeles, CA 90045. [10098040]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#4) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to Allen L. Michel, Esquire for Gans Ink & Supply Co, Inc., re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, rtn to send; Gladstone Michel Weisberg Willner &, 1901 Avenue of the Stars Ste 1100, Los Angeles CA 90067-6002. Resending to: Gipson Hoffman & Pancione, 1901 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067 (per state bar website). [10098030]--[Edited: address updated. 08/24/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Docket(#3) Mail returned on 08/22/2016 addressed to James Michael Ganion, Esquire for Anaheim Union 76, re: case opening letter [ # 1 ] sent on 08/05/2016. Returned envelope reads: forward time exp, rtn to send: Ulich Ganion Balmuth Fisher & Feld L, 4041 MacArthur Blvd Ste 300, Newport Beach, CA 92660-2511. Resending to: Ulich, Ganion, Balmuth, Fisher & Feld LLP, 4041 MacArthur Blvd Ste 300, Newport Beach, CA 92660-2511. [10098003]--[Edited: address updated. 08/23/2016 by SLM] (LA) [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Docket(#2) This petition for writ of mandamus was filed electronically on 8/4/16 at 11:54 pm; please refer to pay.gov receipt # 809-793-15-714 (for timeliness) [10088572] (EU) [Entered: 08/16/2016 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST OF FILING. [10087893] (HC) [Entered: 08/15/2016 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATCHISON EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BLOCK AT ORANGE is a litigant

Latest cases where REYNOLDS METALS CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant