This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/03/2021 at 06:34:08 (UTC).

In re: Resolute Energy Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 In re Resolute Energy Corp was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1412

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

RESOLUTE ENERGY CORP

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM A. LANGDON, JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David J. Teklits Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Thomas P. Will Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

James E. Tysse Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Erin M. Brewer Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld

580 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michelle A. Reed Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld

2300 North Field Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Michael Van Gorder Esq.

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi

3828 Kennett Pike, Suite 201

Wilmington, DE 19807

James M. Wilson Esq. Jr.

395 South End Avenue

New York City, NY 10280

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

12 #1

Briefing Notice Issued

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Notice of Appeal

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX Volume II on behalf of Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/28/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 04/29/2021 by EAF - text edited to specify volume] [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 04/28/2021 09:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Appendix Volume I attached on behalf of Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr.. Certificate of Service dated 04/28/2021 by ECF. --[Edited 04/29/2021 by EAF - Text edited to reflect Appendix attached] [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 04/28/2021 09:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erin M. Brewer on behalf of Appellee(s) Resolute Energy Corporation; Nicholas J. Sutton; James E. Duffy; William K. White; Gary L. Hultquist; Tod C. Benton; Thomas O. Hicks, Jr.; Robert J. Raymond; Janet W. Pasque; Richard F. Betz; Joseph Citarrella; Wilkie S. Colyer, Jr.. [21-1412] (EMB) [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant William A. Langdon Jr. due on or before 04/28/2021. Appendix due on or before 04/28/2021. (SB) [Entered: 03/19/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Resolute Energy Corp. [21-1412] (JET) [Entered: 03/18/2021 09:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr. advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr.. [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr.. [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr.. [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Wilson, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) William A. Langdon, Jr.. [21-1412] (JMW) [Entered: 03/18/2021 06:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michelle A. Reed on behalf of Appellee(s) Resolute Energy Corporation; Nicholas J. Sutton; James E. Duffy; William K. White; Gary L. Hultquist; Tod C. Benton; Thomas O. Hicks, Jr.; Robert J. Raymond; Janet W. Pasque; Richard F. Betz; Joseph Citarrella; Wilkie S. Colyer, Jr.. [21-1412] (MAR) [Entered: 03/18/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Tysse on behalf of Appellee(s) Resolute Energy Corporation; Nicholas J. Sutton; James E. Duffy; William K. White; Gary L. Hultquist; Tod C. Benton; Thomas O. Hicks, Jr.; Robert J. Raymond; Janet W. Pasque; Richard F. Betz; Joseph Citarrella; Wilkie S. Colyer, Jr.. [21-1412] (JET) [Entered: 03/18/2021 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by David John Teklits, Esq. or any other attorney from Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, the designated filer shall be Resolute Energy Corporation. (AMR) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant William A. Langdon, Jr. in District Court No. 1-19-cv-00077. (AMR) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Resolute Energy Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Milligan Wilson, Jr.