This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:29 (UTC).

In re: Pursuit Holdings (NY)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 In re Pursuit Holdings NY was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2149

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

Michael Hayden Sanford

Montauk, NY 11954

Appellees

Delphi Capital Management, LLC

Norma Knopf

Deborah J. Piazza, Chapter 7 Trustee

Michael Knopf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael Hayden Sanford

Attorney at C/O Sanford Partners

P.O. Box 1328

Montauk, NY 11954

Appellee Attorneys

Todd E. Duffy Esq.

Attorney at DuffyAmedeo LLP

275 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10001

Eric W. Berry Esq.

Attorney at Berry Law PLLC

745 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10151

Michael Zachery Brownstein Esq.

Attorney at Tarter, Krinsky & Drogin LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2610629] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:44 AM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610634] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:48 AM]

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617544] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:20 AM]

10 #4

Supporting Document

10 #3

Supporting Document

51 #5

Supporting Document

51 #6

Supporting Document

51 #7

Supporting Document

51 #8

Supporting Document

51 #9

Supporting Document

51 #10

Supporting Document

51 #11

Supporting Document

51 #12

Supporting Document

51 #13

Supporting Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) CURED DEFECTIVE REPLY TO OPPOSITION, [ # 51 ], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2643192] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply to Opposition, [50], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2643185] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2642110][51] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2642082][50] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) CURED DEFECTIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION, TO DISMISS, [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED.[2640427] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [23], to dismiss [22], to dismiss [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED. Service date 08/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2639606] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply to Opposition, [42], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2636695] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • (#42) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [39], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2636630][42] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Opposition to motion, [39], on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED.[2636499] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [23], to dismiss [22], to dismiss [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED. Service date 08/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2635134] [19-2149] [Entered: 08/17/2019 12:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2619300] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, requesting that Point I of the motion to dismiss be deemed withdrawn, RECEIVED. Service date 07/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2618626] [19-2149]--[Edited 07/29/2019 by RW] [Entered: 07/27/2019 12:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deborah J. Piazza, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617907] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2617547] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617544] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#8) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, district court receipt # 465401240486, FILED.[2615693] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/24/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610634] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610630] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2610629] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Hayden Sanford, FILED. [2610605] [19-2149] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.