This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:12 (UTC).

In re: Pursuit Holdings (NY)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 In re Pursuit Holdings NY was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2143

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellees

Delphi Capital Management, LLC

Norma Knopf

Deborah J. Piazza, Chapter 7 Trustee

Michael Knopf

Not Yet Classified

Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Eric W. Berry Esq.

Attorney at Berry Law PLLC

745 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10151

Michael Zachery Brownstein Esq.

Attorney at Tarter, Krinsky & Drogin LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Daniel A. Osborn

Attorney at Osborn Law, P.C.

43 West 43Rd Street

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2610213] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:35 PM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617542] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:05 AM]

11 #3

Supporting Document

11 #4

Supporting Document

11 #1

Motion FILED

54 #1

Opposition FILED

54 #3

Supporting Document

54 #2

Supporting Document

59 #14

Supporting Document

59 #1

Reply to Opposition FILED

59 #3

Supporting Document

59 #2

Supporting Document

59 #5

Supporting Document

59 #4

Supporting Document

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 54 ], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 08/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2642141][59] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) CURED DEFECTIVE OPPOSITION TO MOTION, TO DISMISS, [ # 54 ], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED.[2640441] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/26/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [33], to dismiss [31], to dismiss [ # 14 ], to dismiss [12], to dismiss [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED. Service date 08/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2639608] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply to Opposition, [52], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2636707] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/20/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • (#52) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [50], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2636598][52] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Opposition to motion, [50], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED.[2636503] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [33], to dismiss [31], to dismiss [ # 14 ], to dismiss [12], to dismiss [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2635135] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/17/2019 12:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Opposition to motion, [48], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED.[2631562] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to dismiss [33], to dismiss [31], to dismiss [ # 14 ], to dismiss [12], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631516] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/14/2019 12:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Opposition to motion, [46], on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED.[2628175] [19-2143] [Entered: 08/09/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to dismiss, [12], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2617654] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to dismiss, [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED.[2617645] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2617632] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • (#12) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2617545] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2617543] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Delphi Capital Management, LLC, Michael Knopf and Norma Knopf, FILED. Service date 07/26/2019 by CM/ECF.[2617542] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610217] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17246863, FILED.[2610215] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2610213] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pursuit Holdings (NY), LLC, FILED. [2610204] [19-2143] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.