This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 05:10:25 (UTC).

PignatelliIn re: Pignatelli

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 PignatelliIn re Pignatelli was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1851

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants

In re: MASSIMO PIGNATELLI

STEPHANE PIRE

Appellee

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Erik Joseph Osterrieder

Attorney at Rao DeBoer Osterrieder, PLLC

2550 Gray Falls Drive

Houston, TX 77077

Appellee Attorney

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) REMINDER : Counsel is reminded that, per Fed. Cir. R. 47.3(c)(2), all filings must identify all represented parties by name; the use of "et al." is not permitted. [697449] [LMN] [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/22/2020. [697445] Entry of Appearance is due 06/11/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/11/2020. Docketing Statement is due 06/29/2020. Certified List is due on 07/07/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.